In Re: Webloyalty.com, Inc., Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that defendants WebLoyalty.com Inc. and Fandango, Inc. d/b/a fandango.com engaged in a "Coupon Click Fraud" scheme involving the fraudulent and deceptive sale of "Reservation Rewards" discount products to unwitting consumers who make legitimate online purchases from various web retailers, and the unauthorized of private credit and debit card account information by the web retailer to Webloyalty.

Defendant: Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Priceline.com, Inc., Nelson Garrett, Maxim O. Khokhlov, Valueclick Inc. and E-Babylon Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Joe W. Kuefler, Kim Crouse, Monica S. Staaf and Alcides Melo
Special Master: Gael Mahony
Case Number: 1:2007md01820
Filed: February 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Joseph L. Tauro
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2007 Filing 80
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants (Consolidated), filed by Joe W. Kuefler, Kim Crouse, Monica S. Staaf, Alcides Melo.(George, David)
October 30, 2007 Filing 76
NOTICE by Gael Mahony SCHEDULING ORDER (Mahony, Gael)
October 12, 2007 Filing 75
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Mark J. Tamblyn (Tamblyn, Mark)
October 11, 2007 Filing 74
Letter/request (non-motion) from Gabrielle Wolohojian to Special Master Mahony. (Wolohojian, Gabrielle)
September 20, 2007 Filing 72
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(D)(3). (George, David)
August 21, 2007 Filing 67
NOTICE by Gael Mahony of Scheduling Order for Rule 16 Conference (Mahony, Gael)
August 1, 2007 Filing 65
DECLARATION re 64 MOTION for Discovery DECLARATION OF DAVID J. GEORGE MADE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RULE 56(F) DISCOVERY by Joe W. Kuefler, Kim Crouse, Monica S. Staaf, Alcides Melo. (George, David) Modified on 8/9/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly).
July 16, 2007 Filing 54
NOTICE by Gael Mahony Scheduling Notice for 8/21/07 (Mahony, Gael)
June 22, 2007 Filing 53
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants Consolidated Amended Complaint, filed by Joe W. Kuefler, Kim Crouse, Monica S. Staaf, Alcides Melo.(George, David)
June 18, 2007 Filing 52
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. 48 Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Complaint is ALLOWED WITHOUT OPPOSITION. Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated amended complaint no later than June 22, 2007. It is hereby ordered that Gael Mahony of the firm, Holland and Knight, LLP of Boston is appointed Special Master for the above captioned action. (Abaid, Kimberly)
June 15, 2007 Filing 51
RESPONSE to Motion re 48 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Priceline.com, Inc., Nelson Garrett, Maxim O. Khokhlov, Valueclick Inc., E-Babylon Inc., Webloyalty.com, Inc., Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation. (Wolohojian, Gabrielle)
May 29, 2007 Filing 50
MEMORANDUM in Support re 48 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Joe W. Kuefler, Kim Crouse, Monica S. Staaf, Alcides Melo. (George, David)
May 24, 2007 Filing 49
EXHIBIT re 48 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Complaint by Joe W. Kuefler, Kim Crouse, Monica S. Staaf, Alcides Melo. (George, David)
April 24, 2007 Filing 44
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered 30 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. By May 25, 2007, Plaintiffs shall file a Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Defendants shall respond by June 15, 2007. (Abaid, Kim)
April 17, 2007 Filing 42
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Priceline.com, Inc., Nelson Garrett, Maxim O. Khokhlov, Valueclick Inc., E-Babylon Inc.. Document received: Defendants' Proposed Agenda Submitted in Response to the Court's Order Dated April 10, 2007. (Mitrou, Joan)
April 10, 2007 Filing 40
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. Status Conference set for 4/24/2007 02:15 PM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro.(Abaid, Kim)
March 21, 2007 Filing 38
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. ORDER consolidating cases(Abaid, Kim)
February 23, 2007 Filing 34
Response by Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc. to 33 Notice (Other) of Filing Transfer Order of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Request for Status Conference. (Abaid, Kim)
February 16, 2007 Filing 39
Certified copy of MDL Transfer Order in MDL Case 07-1820 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation requesting transfer of cases in Webloyalty.com, Inc., Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation for consolidated pretrial proceedings. MDL cases assigned to Judge Tauro. (Abaid, Kim)
December 27, 2006 Filing 28
NOTICE issued to Attorney Michael L. Greenwald regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Abaid, Kim)
December 26, 2006 Filing 27
NOTICE - Reply filed with the MDL Panel - by Joe W. Kuefler (Abaid, Kim)
December 22, 2006 Filing 26
Opposition re 24 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(f) & Memorandum of Law filed by Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
December 13, 2006 Filing 25
MOTION for Extension of Time to December 22, 2006 to File Response/Reply by Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc..(Abaid, Kim)
November 20, 2006 Filing 22
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Joe W. Kuefler. Document received: Order re: Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Sumamry Judgment. (Abaid, Kim)
November 17, 2006 Filing 23
NOTICE to The MDL PANEL - Revised Schedule of Actions in Support of Motion to Transfer and Coordinate or Consolidate Actions by Joe W. Kuefler (Abaid, Kim)
October 31, 2006 Filing 9
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of C. Nichole Gifford by Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc..(Abaid, Kim)
October 30, 2006 Filing 8
NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew J. Garcia on behalf of Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP (Abaid, Kim)
October 6, 2006 Filing 7
SUMMONS Returned Executed Webloyalty.com, Inc. served on 9/20/2006, answer due 10/10/2006. (Abaid, Kim)
October 4, 2006 Filing 2
MOTION for Extension of Time to November 13, 2006 to Respond to the Complaint by Webloyalty.com, Inc., Fandango, Inc..(Abaid, Kim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Webloyalty.com, Inc., Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joe W. Kuefler
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kim Crouse
Represented By: Charles D. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Monica S. Staaf
Represented By: Charles D. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alcides Melo
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webloyalty.com, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle R. Wolohojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fandango, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle R. Wolohojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priceline.com, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle R. Wolohojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Garrett
Represented By: Gabrielle R. Wolohojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim O. Khokhlov
Represented By: Gabrielle R. Wolohojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valueclick Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle R. Wolohojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Babylon Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle R. Wolohojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Gael Mahony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?