Diaz v. Amand
Petitioner: Juan Diaz
Respondent: Peter St. Amand
Case Number: 1:2009cv10298
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Leo T. Sorokin
Presiding Judge: Joseph L. Tauro
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. On April 6, 2012, Petitioner filed Petitioner's Notice of Appeal and Applicaiton for a Certificate of Appealability 48 of the denial of his habeas petition. A Certificate of Appealability will issue " only if the applicant has made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right". The Applicant " must demonstrate that reasonable jurists would find the district court's assessment of the constitutional claim debatable or wrong ". Here, upon review of the submissions of Petitioner, this court finds that he has not made the requisite showing with respect to the alleged denial of his constitutional rights. Accordingly, Petitioner's Notice of Appeal and Application for a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. The Clerk shall transmit this Order to the First Circuit Court of Appeals. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Action on motion: After Considering Chief Magistrate Judge Sorokin's Report and Recommendation on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 44 and Report and Recommendatio n on Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider 43 as well as Petitioner's objections 45 and 46 thereto, this court hereby ACCEPTS and ADOPTS both Report and Recommendation on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 44 and the Report and Recomme ndation on Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider 43 for the reasons set forth therein. Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider 38 is,accordingly DENIED. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is also DENIED. This case is CLOSED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. (Abaid, Kimberly) Modified text on 2/16/2010 (Abaid, Kimberly).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Amand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Diaz
Represented By: Rosemary C. Scapicchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter St. Amand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?