Glass Dimensions, Inc. v. State Street Bank & Trust Co.
Plaintiff: Glass Dimensions, Inc.
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Co.
Case Number: 1:2010cv10588
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Essex
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE:PLAINTIFF GLASS DIMENSIONS, INC.S MOTION TO UNSEAL THE RECORD (DOCKET ENTRY # 255) is DENIED with respect to the portion of the motion that remains subject to dispute by the parties. The motion is otherwise DENIED as moot in light of the parties agreement. (Feeney, Eileen)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM and ORDER(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. Case should be re-drawn randomly. (Patch, Christine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass Dimensions, Inc. v. State Street Bank & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glass Dimensions, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?