Skyhook Wireless, Inc. v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Skyhook Wireless, Inc.
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2010cv11571
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 72 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 25, 2011 71 Transcript of Technology Tutorial held on October 21, 2011, before Judge Rya W. Zobel. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 11/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 21, 2011 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Hearing re Tutorial held on 10/21/2011. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Urso, Lisa)
October 20, 2011 70 MOTION to Strike by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lu, Samuel)
October 18, 2011 69 DECLARATION re 68 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Manning, Susan)
October 18, 2011 68 REPLY to Response to 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Manning, Susan)
October 18, 2011 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 64 Motion to preclude presentation by fact witness. I prefer presentation of the tutorial by counsel, but Mr. Morgan is welcome to attend the proceedings. (Urso, Lisa)
October 16, 2011 67 AFFIDAVIT of Samuel K. Lu re 66 Opposition to Motion by Google Inc. to Preclude Presentations by Fact Witness at the Technology Tutorial by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Lu, Samuel)
October 16, 2011 66 Opposition re 64 Emergency MOTION to Preclude Presentations by Fact Witness at the Technology Tutorial filed by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Lu, Samuel)
October 14, 2011 65 Letter/request (non-motion) from William F. Abrams on behalf of Google, Inc. regarding the technology tutorial scheduled for October 21, 2011. (Abrams, William)
October 14, 2011 64 Emergency MOTION to Preclude Presentations by Fact Witness at the Technology Tutorial by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Correspondence, # 3 Correspondence, # 4 Correspondence, # 5 Correspondence, # 6 Correspondence)(Manning, Susan)
October 14, 2011 63 Letter/request (non-motion) from Samuel K. Lu on behalf of Skyhook Wireless, Inc. regarding the technology tutorial scheduled for October 21, 2011. (Lu, Samuel)
October 13, 2011 62 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49)(Lu, Samuel)
October 11, 2011 61 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel S. Albert Wang, Esq. and Linda C. Klein, Esq. (Notice) by Skyhook Wireless, Inc..(Tillberg, Douglas) Modified on 10/12/2011 to reflect the document filed. (motion to withdraw will be terminated) (Johnson, Jay).
October 11, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. Replies due by 10/18/2011. (Johnson, Jay)
October 11, 2011 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/18/11 (Urso, Lisa)
October 7, 2011 60 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Manning, Susan)
October 6, 2011 59 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 18, 2011 to file Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by GOOGLE, INC..(Manning, Susan)
September 29, 2011 E-Mail Notice re 53 originally issued on 9/28/11 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: S. Albert Wang. Email address removed, he is not longer with the firm. (Jones, Sherry)
September 28, 2011 58 AFFIDAVIT of Dr. David Kotz re 53 Opposition to Motion by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lu, Samuel)
September 28, 2011 57 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Lu, Samuel)
September 28, 2011 56 AFFIDAVIT of Samuel K. Lu re 53 Opposition to Motion by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Lu, Samuel)
September 28, 2011 55 DECLARATION of Catherine R. Murphy in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Skyhook Wireless, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Manning, Susan)
September 28, 2011 54 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by GOOGLE, INC.. (Manning, Susan)
September 28, 2011 53 Opposition re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness and Skyhook's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Lu, Samuel)
September 20, 2011 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by GOOGLE, INC. re 44 Statement of facts. (Manning, Susan)
September 20, 2011 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by GOOGLE, INC. re 42 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 50 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 49 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Lu, Samuel)
September 14, 2011 49 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Lu, Samuel)
September 14, 2011 48 DECLARATION of Susan Baker Manning in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgement of Indefiniteness And, In the Alternative, Opening Claim Construction Brief by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T, # 2 Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit V, # 4 Exhibit W, # 5 Exhibit X, # 6 Exhibit Y, # 7 Exhibit Z, # 8 Exhibit AA, # 9 Exhibit BB)(Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 47 DECLARATION of Susan Baker Manning in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgement of Indefiniteness And, In the Alternative, Opening Claim Construction Brief by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R, # 7 Exhibit S)(Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 46 DECLARATION of Susan Baker Manning in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgement of Indefiniteness And, In the Alternative, Opening Claim Construction Brief by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 45 DECLARATION of Susan Baker Manning in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgement of Indefiniteness And, In the Alternative, Opening Claim Construction Brief by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 44 STATEMENT of facts re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1. (Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 43 DECLARATION of Anthony S. Acampora, Ph.D. by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness And, In The Alternative, Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Manning, Susan)
September 14, 2011 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by GOOGLE, INC..(Manning, Susan)
September 13, 2011 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re 40 Stipulation filed by GOOGLE, INC. Allowed; No such excess with respect to any further briefs. (Urso, Lisa)
September 13, 2011 40 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by GOOGLE, INC.. (Manning, Susan)
August 29, 2011 39 NOTICE of Appearance by George E. Rice, III on behalf of Skyhook Wireless, Inc. (Rice, George)
July 20, 2011 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 29 Motion for Protective Order, pending further order of the court; denying 31 Motion for Protective Order, without prejudice. (Urso, Lisa)
July 13, 2011 38 Letter/request (non-motion) from Google, Inc.. (Manning, Susan)
July 8, 2011 37 Letter/request (non-motion) from Skyhook Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Somait, Lina)
June 8, 2011 36 Opposition re 31 MOTION for Protective Order filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Manning, Susan)
June 8, 2011 35 Opposition re 29 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Maffei, Thomas)
June 6, 2011 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Albano on behalf of GOOGLE, INC. (Albano, Jonathan)
May 25, 2011 33 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 31 MOTION for Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Maffei, Thomas)
May 25, 2011 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re 31 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Maffei, Thomas)
May 25, 2011 31 MOTION for Protective Order by Skyhook Wireless, Inc..(Maffei, Thomas)
May 25, 2011 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re 29 MOTION for Protective Order filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Manning, Susan)
May 25, 2011 29 MOTION for Protective Order by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Manning, Susan)
April 21, 2011 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Seal (Urso, Lisa)
April 15, 2011 27 NOTICE by GOOGLE, INC. of PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Manning, Susan)
April 15, 2011 26 NOTICE by GOOGLE, INC. of Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions (REDACTED) (Manning, Susan)
April 15, 2011 25 Assented to MOTION to Seal by GOOGLE, INC..(Manning, Susan) (Main Document 25 replaced on 4/25/2011) (Anderson, Jennifer). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Anderson, Jennifer).
February 16, 2011 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 22 Motion to Seal (Urso, Lisa)
February 14, 2011 23 NOTICE by Skyhook Wireless, Inc. of Preliminary Infringement Disclosure (REDACTED) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Maffei, Thomas)
February 14, 2011 22 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff Skyhook Wireless Inc.'s Preliminary Infringement Disclosure (Unopposed) by Skyhook Wireless, Inc..(Maffei, Thomas)
January 31, 2011 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lina F. Somait. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Johnson, Jay)
January 20, 2011 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Linda C. Klein. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Johnson, Jay)
January 19, 2011 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Linda C. Klein Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3234716 ( Responses due by 2/2/2011) by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas) Modified on 1/19/2011 (Johnson, Jay).
January 18, 2011 Motion terminated because the document filed was a Notice of withdrawal: 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Blake B. Greene) filed by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Johnson, Jay)
January 14, 2011 20 Notice of Withdrawal (Blake B. Greene) by Skyhook Wireless, Inc..(Tillberg, Douglas) Modified on 1/18/2011 to reflect the PDF filed (Johnson, Jay).
January 11, 2011 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lina F. Somait Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3225194 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
December 14, 2010 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Scheduling Conference held on 12/14/2010, Tutorial 10/21/11 at 9:00 a.m.; Markman Hearing set for 11/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.). (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Hueston, Lu, Maffei, Lo, Manning & Abrams) (Urso, Lisa)
December 13, 2010 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Blake B. Greene. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Blake B. Greene. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Blake B. Greene. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Blake B. Greene. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Urso, Lisa)
December 7, 2010 18 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Joint Statement by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Magee, David)
November 22, 2010 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Skyhook Wireless, Inc..(Maffei, Thomas)
November 12, 2010 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Blake B. Greene Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3148864 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
November 12, 2010 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of S. Albert Wang Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3148855 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
November 12, 2010 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Samuel K. Lu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Samuel K. Lu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Samuel K. Lu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Urso, Lisa)
November 12, 2010 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ofer Bleiweiss Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3148839 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
November 12, 2010 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Glenn K. Vanzura Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3148833 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
November 12, 2010 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Samuel K. Lu Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3148821 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
November 12, 2010 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John C. Hueston Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3148807 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
November 12, 2010 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Morgan Chu Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3148794 by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maffei, Thomas)
November 3, 2010 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GOOGLE, INC.. (Magee, David) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/5/2010) (Johnson, Jay).
November 2, 2010 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
October 29, 2010 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Skyhook Wireless, Inc. by GOOGLE, INC..(Magee, David)
October 28, 2010 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, GOOGLE, INC. answer due 10/29/2010. (Johnson, Jay)
October 27, 2010 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/29/2010 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by GOOGLE, INC..(Magee, David)
October 21, 2010 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Susan B.Manning, Robert C.Bertin and William F. Abrams. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Johnson, Jay)
October 20, 2010 5 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Susan Baker Manning, Robert C. Bertin, William F. Abrams Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 0101-3116282 by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Manning Certification, # 2 Bertin Certification, # 3 Abrams Certification)(Magee, David)
September 21, 2010 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed GOOGLE, INC. served on 9/16/2010, answer due 10/7/2010. (Maffei, Thomas)
September 16, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE, INC.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cummings, Mary)
September 16, 2010 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Cummings, Mary)
September 15, 2010 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Maffei, Thomas)
September 15, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against GOOGLE, INC. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3067329 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Skyhook Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Category Sheet)(Maffei, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skyhook Wireless, Inc. v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyhook Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F. Maffei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?