Gordon v. DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc. et al Featured Case

A copyright infringement lawsuit filed against Dreamworks SKG and Paramount Pictures by illustrator Jayme Gordon. The plaintiff claims that he "routinely sent his works including his illustrated characters, including his Kung Fu Panda Power characters, to animation and film studios." The resemblance between the plaintiffs characters and the Dreamworks characters is striking: you can see images of the characters on the first page of the complaint.

Plaintiff: Jayme Gordon
Defendant: DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., DreamWorks Animation LLC and Paramount Pictures Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv10255
Filed: February 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Joseph L. Tauro
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2011 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 25, 2011 Filing 58 Transcript of Hearing held on November 17, 2011, before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Carol Scott at 617-330-1377 Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 17, 2011 Filing 57 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. After considering Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions 34 and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition 36 , and conducting a Hearing on 11/17/2011, the court hereby orders that: Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions 34 AND Motion to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition 36 ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the issue of sanctions relating to the conduct of both Parties' Counsel during the discovery process being taken up by the court at a later time. With the above-mentioned exceptions, the remainder of this court's Scheduling Order 32 of August 17, 2011, REMAINS IN EFFECT. IT IS SO ORDERED. See ORDER for Details. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 17, 2011 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro: Further Scheduling Conference held on 11/17/2011. (see order for details). (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at 617-330-1377.)(Attorneys present: Brooks,Madera,McCallion,Fisher,pltfs.;Shope,Zavin,deft.) (Lovett, Zita)
November 15, 2011 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to 34 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions filed by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Martinez Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Martinez Decl, # 3 McCallion Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A to McCallion Decl, # 5 Exhibit B to McCallion Decl, # 6 Exhibit C to McCallion Decl, # 7 Exhibit D to McCallion Decl, # 8 Exhibit E to McCallion Decl, # 9 Exhibit F to McCallion Decl)(Madera, Gregory)
November 15, 2011 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition filed by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Shope, John)
November 14, 2011 Filing 54 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED 51 Motion for Leave to File Document Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Appear at Deposition ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 14, 2011 Filing 53 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED 50 Motion for Leave to File Document a Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of His Emergency Motion for a Protective Order and Sanctions; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 14, 2011 Filing 52 Opposition re 50 MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF HIS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS filed by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Shope, John)
November 14, 2011 Filing 51 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Appear at Deposition by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Shope, John)
November 10, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF HIS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Law in support, # 2 Martinez declaration, # 3 Exhibit A-Martinez declaration, # 4 McCallion declaration, # 5 Exhibit A-McCallion declaration, # 6 Exhibit B-McCallion declaration, # 7 Exhibit C-McCallion declaration, # 8 Exhibit D-McCallion declaration, # 9 Exhibit E-McCallion declaration, # 10 Exhibit F-McCallion declaration)(Madera, Gregory)
November 3, 2011 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Kristen McCallion (REVISED) in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition filed by Jayme Gordon. (McCallion, Kristen)
November 2, 2011 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Derek Tuttle in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition filed by Jayme Gordon. (Brooks, Juanita)
November 2, 2011 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Kristen McCallion in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition filed by Jayme Gordon. (Brooks, Juanita)
November 2, 2011 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition filed by Jayme Gordon. (Brooks, Juanita)
November 2, 2011 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of L. Dominguez in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition filed by Jayme Gordon. (Brooks, Juanita)
November 2, 2011 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition of C. Lubin filed by Jayme Gordon. (Brooks, Juanita)
November 2, 2011 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition of V. Alfonso filed by Jayme Gordon. (Brooks, Juanita)
November 2, 2011 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition of Jayme Gordon filed by Jayme Gordon. (Brooks, Juanita)
November 1, 2011 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 39 Opposition to Motion for a Protective Order and Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Shope, John)
November 1, 2011 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 39 Opposition to Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shope, John)
November 1, 2011 Filing 39 Opposition re 34 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions filed by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Shope, John)
October 24, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGMotion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
October 21, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGHearing set for 11/7/2011 11:30 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
October 19, 2011 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Huston, Julia)
October 19, 2011 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition filed by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Huston, Julia)
October 19, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Appear at Deposition by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation.(Huston, Julia)
October 19, 2011 Filing 35 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. After considering Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions 34 , this court hereby orders that: Defendants may not depose Plaintiff Jayme Gordon until after a hearing before this court. With that exception, this court's Scheduling Order 32 of August 17, 2011 remains in effect. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions 34 must be filed by 11/1/2011. The Parties Must Appear for a Hearing on 11/8/2011 02:15 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 18, 2011 Filing 34 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order and Sanctions by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit McCallion declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F-Notice of filing with Clerk's office)(Madera, Gregory)
October 10, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Mark A. Fischer (Fischer, Mark)
August 17, 2011 Filing 32 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: The Parties may conduct the following Depositions included in this ORDER. The above-listed depositions shall be completed by 4/6/2012. To the extent that it exists, Defendants shall produce to Plaintiff meta data for all categories of electronic documents ( including images). If Defendants believe the production of such meta data shall be unduly expensive, the Parties shall report back to this court. No further discovery is permitted without leave of this court. A Further Conference is set for 5/1/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 17, 2011 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro: Scheduling Conference held on 8/17/2011, (see order for details). A further conference/pre-trial is set for May 1, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at 617-330-1377.)(Attorneys present: Madera,Kane,McCallion,pltf;) (Lovett, Zita)
July 29, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
July 5, 2011 Filing 31 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference pursuant to L.R. 16.1(D). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Thomas)
June 30, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation DEFENDANTS' LIST OF PROPOSED DEPONENTS (Kluft, David)
June 30, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE by Jayme Gordon PLAINTIFFS LIST OF PROPOSED DEPONENTS (Madera, Gregory)
June 29, 2011 Filing 28 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 29, 2011 Filing 27 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered ALLOWED 26 Joint Motion for Protective Order. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 29, 2011 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
June 28, 2011 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Jayme Gordon, Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Brown, Thomas)
June 23, 2011 Filing 25 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to August 9 or 10, 2011 by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kluft, David)
June 15, 2011 Filing 24 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: RULE 26 DISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 15, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2011 11:45 AM in Courtroom 22 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 9, 2011 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Grossman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 9, 2011 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan Zavin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 6, 2011 Filing 22 ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint, by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation.(Huston, Julia)
May 6, 2011 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Grossman Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3394603 by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Grossman)(Kluft, David)
May 6, 2011 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan Zavin Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3394593 by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jonathan Zavin)(Kluft, David)
May 6, 2011 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Kluft, David)
April 19, 2011 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paramount Pictures Corporation, DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., filed by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - Notice of manual filing with the Clerk's Office, # 5 Exhibit E - Amended, # 6 Exhibit F - Notice of manual filing with the Clerk's Office)(Madera, Gregory)
April 5, 2011 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer DreamWorks Animation LLC answer due 5/9/2011; DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc. answer due 5/9/2011; Paramount Pictures Corporation answer due 5/9/2011. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 29, 2011 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 9, 2011 to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation.(Kluft, David)
March 14, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen M. Brenner on behalf of Jayme Gordon (Brenner, Maureen)
March 11, 2011 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. DreamWorks Animation LLC answer due 4/8/2011; DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc. answer due 4/8/2011; Paramount Pictures Corporation answer due 4/8/2011. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 8, 2011 to Answer Complaint, ( Responses due by 3/21/2011) by DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation.(Kluft, David) Modified on 3/11/2011 to correct motion relief (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
March 7, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Shope on behalf of DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation (Shope, John)
March 7, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Huston on behalf of DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation (Huston, Julia)
March 7, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Kluft on behalf of DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation (Kluft, David)
March 2, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Brown on behalf of Jayme Gordon (Brown, Thomas)
February 24, 2011 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Kane. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWED 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Juanita R. Brooks. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 23, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Juanita R. Brooks Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3281445 by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Brooks declaration)(Madera, Gregory)
February 23, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Kane Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3281438 by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Kane declaration)(Madera, Gregory)
February 22, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Paramount Pictures Corporation served on 2/16/2011, answer due 3/9/2011. (Madera, Gregory)
February 22, 2011 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc. served on 2/16/2011, answer due 3/9/2011. (Madera, Gregory)
February 22, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed DreamWorks Animation LLC served on 2/16/2011, answer due 3/9/2011. (Madera, Gregory)
February 17, 2011 Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joel D. Leviton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWED 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kristen McCallion. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 17, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kristen McCallion Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3274353 by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-McCallion declaration)(Madera, Gregory)
February 16, 2011 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of copyright case. Re-entered by court staff. Please note that Report on the Filing of a Copyright Case ( AO121) is to be filed as a separate entry in PDF form non-fillable format. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 16, 2011 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joel D. Leviton Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3272868 by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Leviton declaration)(Madera, Gregory)
February 16, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DreamWorks Animation LLC, DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cummings, Mary)
February 16, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Joseph L. Tauro assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Cummings, Mary)
February 16, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3272384 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jayme Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 AO121, # 4 Exhibit A - TXu 867-275 Luckylizard.com, # 5 Exhibit B - Jayme Gordons Panda Power, # 6 Exhibit C - VAu 1-053-083 Unpubl sketches, # 7 Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits D & F with Clerk's Office, # 8 Exhibit E - TXu 1-590-20, # 9 Exhibit G - VAu 1-053-081 Kung Fu Panda Power Posters)(Madera, Gregory) (Attachments 1 and 2 replaced on 2/16/2011, documents were filed in form-fillable format) (Cummings, Mary). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/17/2011, AO121 were filed in form-fillable format ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Gordon
Represented By: Maureen M. Brenner
Represented By: Juanita R. Brooks
Represented By: Thomas A. Brown
Represented By: Mark A. Fischer
Represented By: Michael J. Kane
Represented By: Joel D. Leviton
Represented By: Gregory A. Madera
Represented By: Kristen McCallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Huston
Represented By: David A. Kluft
Represented By: John A. Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DreamWorks Animation LLC
Represented By: Julia Huston
Represented By: David A. Kluft
Represented By: John A. Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Julia Huston
Represented By: David A. Kluft
Represented By: John A. Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?