Blakeslee v. PHC, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Peter Blakeslee
Defendant: PHC, Inc., Bruce A. Shear, Donald E. Robar, Douglas J. Smith, Howard W. Phillips, William F. Grieco, David E. Dangerfield, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. and Acadia Merger Sub, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv11049
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2016 302 Opinion or Order of the Court Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. This Court ALLOWS in part and DENIES in part the defendants' motion for partial reconsideration of the order on summary judgment (Docket No. 285 ). This Court DENIES MAZ's motion to modify the order on class certification (Docket No. 271 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 15, 2016 273 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. For the reasons stated, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Limited Discovery 240 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 1, 2016 258 Opinion or Order of the Court Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The Court ALLOWS in part and DENIES in part the plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Docket No. 182 ) and the defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 181 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 14, 2016 234 Opinion or Order of the Court Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: For the reasons set forth in the attached MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the plaintiffs motion to certify a class of all Class Ashareholders 161 is DENIED without prejudice. However, the Court ALLOWS the motion to certify a class of all Class A shareholders who voted against the merger or abstained. (Molloy, Maryellen)
September 30, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered granting (97) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:11-cv-11049-GAO Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-11049-GAO, 1:11-cv-11099-GAO(Danieli, Chris)
March 30, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered. The motions to dismiss filed by PHC and the individual defendants are GRANTED only to the extent that the claims against the corporation itself are dismissed and is otherwise DENIED. The 35 Moti on to Dismiss the Blakeslee Complaint (11-11049) is GRANTED as to Count I and DENIED as to Counts II and III. The 33 Motion to Dismiss the MAZ Complaint (11-11099) is DENIED.Acadias 33 Motion to Dismiss the Blakeslee Complaint (11-11049) and its 39 Motion to Dismiss the MAZ Compliant (11-11099) are both DENIED. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-11049-GAO, 1:11-cv-11099-GAO(Danieli, Chris)
August 17, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered granting in part 16 Motion for Discovery (Lyness, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakeslee v. PHC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Blakeslee
Represented By: Patrick J. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce A. Shear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Robar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard W. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Dangerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Merger Sub, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?