Worlds, Inc. v. Activision Blizzard, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Worlds, Inc.
Defendant: Activision Publishing, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc. and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv10576
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Norfolk
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 231 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #230 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Case stayed until 6/29/19 or until there is a decision by the Federal Circuit, whichever is earliest. Counsel to file a status report 5 days before 6/29/19. (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 25, 2019 Filing 230 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay)(Caughey, Ryan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 229 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered re #228 Status Report and Motion to Stay filed by Worlds, Inc. Case stayed until 4/30/19 or until there is a decision by the Federal Circuit, whichever is earliest. Counsel to file a status report 5 days before 4/30/19.(Hourihan, Lisa)
January 8, 2019 Filing 228 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 227 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #226 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Case stayed for 60 days or until Federal Circuit issues decision, whichever occurs first. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 31, 2018 Filing 226 STATUS REPORT and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
June 8, 2018 Filing 225 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #224 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Case stayed until 9/7/18 or until there is a decision by the Federal Circuit, whichever is earliest. Counsel to file a status report 5 days before 9/7/18.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 7, 2018 Filing 224 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
March 23, 2018 Filing 223 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kathryn N. Hong (Hong, Kathryn)
March 15, 2018 Filing 222 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #221 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Continuation of stay allowed in part. Stay extended to 6/14/18 and counsel to file further status report 5 days before 6/14/18 (or earlier if Federal Circuit appeal concludes before then) (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 8, 2018 Filing 221 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
December 11, 2017 Filing 220 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT #219 Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay filed by Worlds, Inc. Allowed in part stay for 3 more months until 3/8/18. Joint status memo to be filed by that date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 8, 2017 Filing 219 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
August 30, 2017 Filing 218 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #217 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Stay extended to 12/8/17. Counsel to file a joint status report by that date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 18, 2017 Filing 217 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
May 2, 2017 Filing 216 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Sharon Lee (Lee, Sharon)
February 15, 2017 Filing 215 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #214 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Stay continued to 8/19/17. Counsel to file further status report by that date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 14, 2017 Filing 214 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
December 19, 2016 Filing 213 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #212 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Stay extended to February 15, 2017. Counsel to file a joint status report by that date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 14, 2016 Filing 212 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
November 7, 2016 Filing 211 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Samuel L. Brenner filing for the Withdrawal of Appearance of Brian P. Biddinger (Brenner, Samuel)
September 23, 2016 Filing 210 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In light of the stay until 12/15/16, the Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/16 is cancelled. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 15, 2016 Filing 209 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #208 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Stay allowed only until 12/15/16. Status report to be filed before that date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 13, 2016 Filing 208 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
May 13, 2016 Filing 207 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In light of the stay in this case until 9/13/16, the Daubert/Motion Hearing set for 7/20/16 is cancelled. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 13, 2016 Filing 206 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #205 Status Report filed by Worlds, Inc. Motion to Continue Stay allowed in part. Stay continued to 9/13/16. Parties to file joint status report on or before that date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 11, 2016 Filing 205 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] AND MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
March 7, 2016 Filing 204 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew J. Moffa terminated (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 4, 2016 Filing 203 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Matthew J. Moffa by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew)
February 11, 2016 Filing 202 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot in light of D. 198 #200 Motion to Continue to Vacate Pretrial Schedule (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 11, 2016 Filing 201 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #198 Motion to Stay pending IPR proceedings for 3 months. Counsel to file joint status report by 5/11/16. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 10, 2016 Filing 200 Joint MOTION to Continue to Vacate Pretrial Schedule by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
January 15, 2016 Filing 199 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gene W. Lee (Lee, Gene)
December 16, 2015 Filing 198 Joint MOTION to Stay re #197 Stipulation by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
December 10, 2015 Filing 197 STIPULATION re Joint Motion to Stay by Worlds, Inc.. (Caughey, Ryan)
November 24, 2015 Filing 196 Response by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. to #195 Notice of Supplemental Authorities . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moffa, Matthew)
November 18, 2015 Filing 195 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caughey, Ryan)
November 10, 2015 Filing 194 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2015 re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc. Arguments. The Court takes #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 under advisement. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Caughey and Langham for the plaintiff; Jenner, Lee, Biddinger and Moffa for the defendants) (Maynard, Timothy)
November 10, 2015 Filing 193 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #192 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sharon Lee. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
November 6, 2015 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sharon Lee Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5832576 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Sharon Lee)(Brenner, Samuel)
November 5, 2015 Filing 191 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 01:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY)(Hourihan, Lisa)
October 13, 2015 Filing 190 Recommendations for Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Final Pretrial and Trial Dates. (Caughey, Ryan)
October 9, 2015 Filing 189 Supplemental Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Moffa, Matthew)
October 9, 2015 Filing 188 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 10 Prism Techs., LLC v. T-Mobile USA, No. 8-12-cv-00124 (D.I. 428) (D. Neb. Sept. 22, 2015), #2 Exhibit Ex. 11 Execware, LLC v. BJs Wholesale Club, Inc., 14-233-LPS, 2015 WL 5734434 (D. Del Sept. 30, 2015), #3 Exhibit Ex. 12 Benford et al., Managing Mutual Awareness in Collaborative Virtual Environments, #4 Exhibit Ex. 13 Broadband iTV v. Oceanic Time Warner Cable, LLC, 15-131 (D.I. 181) (D. Haw. Sept. 29, 2015))(Moffa, Matthew)
October 9, 2015 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Moffa, Matthew)
October 5, 2015 Filing 186 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the schedule adopted on 9/16/15 thru initial pretrial conference, the Court is inclined to adopt a final pretrial conference and trial date to allow for appropriate advance scheduling by the Court and counsel. Parties shall confer and jointly propose and final pretrial conference and trial date along with an estimated length of trial (assuming 9AM - 1PM trial days). Such proposal shall be filed by 10/13/15. The Court anticipates trial to be conducted before the end of 2016.(Hourihan, Lisa)
September 25, 2015 Filing 185 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Caughey, Ryan)
September 25, 2015 Filing 184 AFFIDAVIT of Declaration of Ryan V. Caughey in Opposition re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 7,181,690, #2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 7,493,558, #3 Exhibit 3 - Patent No.7,945,856, #4 Exhibit 4 - Patent No.8,082,501, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from 501 File History Part 1 of 2, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from 501 File History Part 2 of 2, #7 Exhibit 6 - Patent No.8,145,998, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt from 998 File History, #9 Exhibit 8 - Kidrin Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 - Article from San Francisco Examiner, #11 Exhibit 10 - Article from Dallas Morning News, #12 Exhibit 11 - DDR Holdings, #13 Exhibit 12 - CalTech, #14 Exhibit 13 - DataTern Inc., #15 Exhibit 14 - Execware LLC, #16 Exhibit 15 - Ameritox, Ltd.)(Caughey, Ryan)
September 25, 2015 Filing 183 Opposition re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Caughey, Ryan)
September 16, 2015 Filing 182 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Daubert/Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. The parties shall confer regarding the topics identified under Local Rule 16.5(d) and shall prepare and submit a joint pretrial memorandum in accordance with Local Rule 16.5(d) no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. The pretrial memorandum shall also propose deadlines for the filing of motions in limine, proposed jury instructions, proposed jury voir dire and a proposed trial date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 16, 2015 Filing 181 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court adopts the Joint Pretrial Schedule as outlined in D. 180. Fact discovery to be completed by 2/1/16. Opening expert reports by 3/1/16. Rebuttal expert reports by 4/1/16. Expert discovery to be completed by 4/22/16. Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 5/20/16. Opposition to Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 6/20/16. Reply ISO Dispositive/Daubert Motions not to exceed 5 pages to be filed by 7/11/16. Hearing on Dispositive/Daubert Motions set for 7/20/16 at 2:00PM. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/16 at 2:00PM.(Hourihan, Lisa)
September 14, 2015 Filing 180 Recommendations for Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Pretrial Schedule. (Caughey, Ryan)
September 9, 2015 Filing 179 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 9, 2015 Filing 178 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Status Conference held on 9/9/2015. Court hears from counsel re: scheduling of the case through trial. Counsel to file proposed schedule by 9/14/15. Hearing on pending summary judgment motion set for 11/10/15 at 2:30PM. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Joel Leeman and Ryan Caughey for the plaintiff. Brian Biddinger and Jesse Jenner for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 4, 2015 Filing 177 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Moffa, Matthew)
September 4, 2015 Filing 176 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 7,181,690, #2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 7,493,558, #3 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 7,945,856, #4 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,082,501, #5 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,145,998, #6 Exhibit Excerpts from the certified file history of U.S. Patent No. 8,082,501, #7 Exhibit Excerpts from the certified file history of U.S. Patent No. 8,145,998, #8 Exhibit Worlds Inc.s Sixth Supplemental Disclosure of the Claims Infringed (D.I. 160), #9 Exhibit Courts Markman Order of June 26, 2015 (D.I. 153))(Moffa, Matthew)
September 4, 2015 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Support re #174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Moffa, Matthew)
September 4, 2015 Filing 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Patent Claims are Invalid under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew)
September 1, 2015 Filing 173 Defendant's Seventh Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Maynard, Timothy)
August 27, 2015 Filing 172 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #169 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Activisions Seventh Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions. by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 26, 2015 Filing 171 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Moffa, Matthew)
August 26, 2015 Filing 170 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Moffa, Matthew)
August 26, 2015 Filing 169 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Activisions Seventh Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions. by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew)
July 30, 2015 Filing 168 EXHIBITS re #160 Amended Document, Sixth Supplemental Disclosure of the Claims Infringed by Worlds, Inc. (Main document is Exhibit A) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit B-3, #4 Exhibit B-4, #5 Exhibit B-5, #6 Exhibit B-6, #7 Exhibit B-7, #8 Exhibit B-8, #9 Exhibit B-9, #10 Exhibit B-10, #11 Exhibit B-11, #12 Exhibit B-12, #13 Exhibit B-13, #14 Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit D-1, #16 Exhibit D-2, #17 Exhibit D-3, #18 Exhibit D-4, #19 Exhibit D-5, #20 Exhibit D-6, #21 Exhibit D-7, #22 Exhibit D-8, #23 Exhibit D-9, #24 Exhibit D-10, #25 Exhibit D-11, #26 Exhibit D-12, #27 Exhibit D-13, #28 Exhibit E, #29 Exhibit F-1, #30 Exhibit F-2, #31 Exhibit F-3, #32 Exhibit F-4, #33 Exhibit F-5, #34 Exhibit F-6, #35 Exhibit F-7, #36 Exhibit F-8, #37 Exhibit F-9, #38 Exhibit F-10, #39 Exhibit F-11, #40 Exhibit F-12, #41 Exhibit F-13, #42 Exhibit G, #43 Exhibit H-1, #44 Exhibit H-2, #45 Exhibit H-3, #46 Exhibit H-4, #47 Exhibit H-5, #48 Exhibit H-6, #49 Exhibit H-7, #50 Exhibit H-8, #51 Exhibit H-9, #52 Exhibit H-10, #53 Exhibit H-11, #54 Exhibit H-12, #55 Exhibit H-13, #56 Exhibit I, #57 Exhibit J-1, #58 Exhibit J-2, #59 Exhibit J-3, #60 Exhibit J-4, #61 Exhibit J-5, #62 Exhibit J-6, #63 Exhibit J-7, #64 Exhibit J-8, #65 Exhibit J-9, #66 Exhibit J-10, #67 Exhibit J-11, #68 Exhibit J-12, #69 Exhibit J-13)(Maynard, Timothy)
July 30, 2015 Filing 167 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #163 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Sixth Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions. (Maynard, Timothy)
July 30, 2015 Filing 166 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #161 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Maynard, Timothy)
July 29, 2015 Filing 165 EXHIBITS re #164 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Main document is Exhibit 1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Maynard, Timothy)
July 27, 2015 Filing 164 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Moffa, Matthew)
July 27, 2015 Filing 163 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits 1-10 of Sixth Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew)
July 27, 2015 Filing 162 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Moffa, Matthew)
July 27, 2015 Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Worlds, Inc..(Caughey, Ryan)
July 27, 2015 Filing 160 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Worlds, Inc.. Amendment to #34 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed, Sixth Supplemental. (Caughey, Ryan)
July 21, 2015 Filing 159 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #157 Motion to Continue Status Conference set for 9/9/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
July 16, 2015 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM in Support re #157 Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to August 25, 2015 filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Moffa, Matthew)
July 16, 2015 Filing 157 Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to August 25, 2015 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew)
July 16, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 26, 2015 Filing 154 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 7/30/2015 03:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 26, 2015 Filing 153 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: Markman Hearing.(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 27, 2015 Filing 152 EXHIBITS re #149 Amended Document filed by Worlds, Inc. by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-13, #2 Exhibit F-13, #3 Exhibit H-13, #4 Exhibit J-13) (Main document is Exhibit B-13)(Maynard, Timothy)
February 25, 2015 Filing 151 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #150 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits B-13 through J-13 of World's Fifth Supplemental Disclosure of the Claim Infringed filed 2/9/15; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 9, 2015 Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Worlds, Inc..(Caughey, Ryan)
February 9, 2015 Filing 149 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Worlds, Inc.. Amendment to #34 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed, Fifth Supplemental.. (Caughey, Ryan)
October 3, 2014 Filing 147 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Markman Hearing held on 10/3/2014. Arguments. Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Chandler Langham and Ryan Caughey for the plaintiff. Brian Biddinger, Gene Lee, Jesse Jenner and Matthew Moffa for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 12, 2014 Filing 146 Response by Worlds, Inc. to #145 Markman Brief, . (Caughey, Ryan)
August 25, 2014 Filing 145 Markman Brief by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Moffa Declaration in support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Moffa Declaration - Nautilus, Inc. v. Biosig slip opinion)(Moffa, Matthew)
August 25, 2014 Filing 144 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #143 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Claim Construction Briefs ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Maynard, Timothy)
August 22, 2014 Filing 143 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Claim Construction Briefs by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Claim Construction Brief Concerning Indefiniteness, #2 Moffa Declaration in support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Moffa Declaration - Nautilus, Inc. v. Biosig slip opinion, #4 Exhibit B to Moffa Declaration - Docket Excerpts from Okor v Sega of Am Inc)(Moffa, Matthew)
June 26, 2014 Filing 142 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Markman Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 10, 2014 Filing 141 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #131 Motion to Transfer Case in light of the Stipulation Withdrawing Pending Motion to Transfer, D.139. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 10, 2014 Filing 140 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In light of the filing of the Stipulation Withdrawing Pending Motion to Transfer, D. 139, the hearing set for 7/11/14 is cancelled. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 9, 2014 Filing 139 STIPULATION re #131 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California. Stipulation Withdrawing Pending Motion to Transfer by Worlds, Inc.. (Caughey, Ryan)
May 29, 2014 Filing 138 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #131 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California. : NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: Cameras in the Courtroom Project. The parties in this case are hereby notified that this scheduled proceeding is eligible for video recording. Counsel are directed to the district court web site at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/general/cameras.html to determine if they wish to consent to video recording. Responses are due seven days from the date of this notice. A RESPONSE FROM EACH PARTY IS REQUIRED. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 28, 2014 Filing 137 DECLARATION re #136 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue of Matthew J. Moffa by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Brenner, Samuel)
May 28, 2014 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #131 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California. filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Brenner, Samuel)
May 19, 2014 Filing 135 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Hong, Kathryn)
May 9, 2014 Filing 134 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #131 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California. Responses due by 5/28/2014 (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 8, 2014 Filing 133 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 28, 2014 to File Response/Reply as to #131 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California. by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Brenner, Samuel)
May 2, 2014 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Support re #131 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California. filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of R. Caughey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Affidavit Decl. of Kidrin)(Caughey, Ryan)
May 2, 2014 Filing 131 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California. by Worlds, Inc..(Caughey, Ryan)
April 16, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Blake B. Greene (Greene, Blake)
April 16, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel L. Brenner on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Brenner, Samuel)
April 4, 2014 Filing 128 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #118 Motion for Markman Hearing. Counsel to file a joint statement with a proposed schedule for the filing of pre-hearing briefs and a proposed hearing date. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 27, 2014 Filing 127 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Concerning Summary Judgment. (Greene, Blake)
March 13, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by David R. Kerrigan (Kerrigan, David)
March 13, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher A. Kenney (Kenney, Christopher)
March 13, 2014 Filing 124 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court ALLOWS the Defendants' motion for summary judgment, D. 83.(Hourihan, Lisa)
March 7, 2014 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #118 MOTION Request for Markman Hearing filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Greene, Blake)
March 6, 2014 Filing 122 EXHIBITS re #119 Amended Document filed by Worlds, Inc. by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-12, #2 Exhibit F-12, #3 Exhibit H-12, #4 Exhibit J-12) (Maynard, Timothy)
March 5, 2014 Filing 121 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #120 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits b-12 THROUGH j-12 to DKT 119 Disclosure of Claims Infringed, Fourth Supplemental by Worlds, Inc.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 4, 2014 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to DKT 119 Disclosure of Claims Infringed, Fourth Supplemental by Worlds, Inc..(Caughey, Ryan)
March 4, 2014 Filing 119 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Worlds, Inc.. Amendment to #34 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed, Fourth Supplemental. (Caughey, Ryan)
February 28, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION Request for Markman Hearing by Worlds, Inc..(Caughey, Ryan)
February 3, 2014 Filing 116 Response by Worlds, Inc. to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Caughey, Ryan)
January 24, 2014 Filing 115 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Notice of Supplemental Authorities, with Exhibits)(Hong, Kathryn)
December 12, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Meredith L. Ainbinder (Ainbinder, Meredith)
November 5, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 5, 2013 Filing 112 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 17, 2013, before Judge Denise J. Casper. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 21, 2013 Filing 111 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #110 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew J. Moffa. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
October 18, 2013 Filing 110 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew J. Moffa Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4686018 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Matthew J Moffa)(Greene, Blake)
October 17, 2013 Filing 109 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2013 re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc. Arguments. Court takes under advisement #83 Motion for Summary Judgment; (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Max Tribble and Ryan Caughey for the plaintiff. Gene Lee, Jesse Jenner, Blake Greene and Matthew Moffa for the defendants.) This hearing has been video recorded as part of the Cameras in the Courtroom pilot project hosted at #http://www.uscourts.gov.(Hourihan, Lisa)
October 1, 2013 Filing 108 Response by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. to #107 Notice of Supplemental Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Greene, Blake)
September 24, 2013 Filing 107 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Caughey, Ryan)
August 27, 2013 Filing 106 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A notice was issued on August 9, 2013 regarding possible participation in the Cameras in the Courtroom pilot program for the hearing scheduled for October 17, 2013. In accordance with the program procedures, a response is required by both sides, either consenting or declining to participate in the program. The clerk has not yet received a response from all counsel. (NOTE: Counsel for defendant has submitted a response.)Counsel are directed to the court web site at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/general/cameras.html to determine if they wish to consent to video recording. Responses must be submitted by September 4, 2013. (Hurley, Virginia)
August 19, 2013 Filing 105 EXHIBITS re #102 Supplemental Disclosure by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit B-3, #4 Exhibit B-4, #5 Exhibit B-5, #6 Exhibit B-6, #7 Exhibit B-7, #8 Exhibit B-8, #9 Exhibit B-9, #10 Exhibit B-10, #11 Exhibit B-11, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D-1, #14 Exhibit D-2, #15 Exhibit D-3, #16 Exhibit D-4, #17 Exhibit D-5, #18 Exhibit D-6, #19 Exhibit D-7, #20 Exhibit D-8, #21 Exhibit D-9, #22 Exhibit D-10, #23 Exhibit D-11, #24 Exhibit E, #25 Exhibit F-1, #26 Exhibit F-2, #27 Exhibit F-3, #28 Exhibit F-4, #29 Exhibit F-5, #30 Exhibit F-6, #31 Exhibit F-7, #32 Exhibit F-8, #33 Exhibit F-9, #34 Exhibit F-10, #35 Exhibit F-11, #36 Exhibit G, #37 Exhibit H-1, #38 Exhibit H-2, #39 Exhibit H-3, #40 Exhibit H-4, #41 Exhibit H-5, #42 Exhibit H-6, #43 Exhibit H-7, #44 Exhibit H-8, #45 Exhibit H-9, #46 Exhibit I, #47 Exhibit J-1, #48 Exhibit J-2, #49 Exhibit J-3, #50 Exhibit J-4, #51 Exhibit J-5, #52 Exhibit J-6, #53 Exhibit J-7, #54 Exhibit J-8, #55 Exhibit J-9, #56 Exhibit J-10, #57 Exhibit J-11, #58 Exhibit H-10, #59 Exhibit H-11)(Maynard, Timothy)
August 15, 2013 Filing 104 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #103 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits A through J of Worlds' Third Supplemental Disclosure of the Claims Infringed (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 14, 2013 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to #102 Disclosure of Claims Infringed, Third Supplemental by Worlds, Inc..(Caughey, Ryan)
August 14, 2013 Filing 102 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Worlds, Inc.. Amendment to #34 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed, Third Supplemental. (Caughey, Ryan)
August 9, 2013 Filing 101 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Markman Hearing on 8/22/13 and 8/23/13 is hereby CANCELLED until decision on the pending motion for summary judgment. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 9, 2013 Filing 100 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity : NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: Cameras in the Courtroom Project. The parties in this case are hereby notified that this scheduled proceeding is eligible for video recording. Counsel are directed to the district court web site at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/general/cameras.html to determine if they wish to consent to video recording. Responses are due seven days from the date of this notice. A RESPONSE FROM EACH PARTY IS REQUIRED. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 9, 2013 Filing 99 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #95 Motion to Continue Markman Hearing. The Court has reviewed the parties' filings related to the Defendants' motion to continue the date of the claim construction hearing, D. 95-97. The parties agree that the Defendants' summary judgment motion is a question of a matter of law and that there are no disputed facts. D. 96 at 4; D. 89 at 2 n.2. Although the Court recognizes that Worlds disagrees that a ruling in the Defendants' favor will be dispositive of this case, D. 97 at 3, the Defendants' position is that it would be and, therefore, addressing the pending motion first would be a more efficient use of judicial resources. D. 96 at 7. In light of the arguments raised in Defendants' motion for summary judgment, the Court GRANTS the motion to defer any claim construction hearing until after the resolution of the pending motion, D. 83. Accordingly, the Court postpones the currently scheduled Markman Hearing until a date after resolution of the summary judgment motion and sets a hearing on the summary judgment motion on 10/17/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 9, 2013 Filing 98 EXHIBIT re #86 Declaration,, filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc. by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19) (Maynard, Timothy)
August 6, 2013 Filing 97 Opposition re #95 MOTION to Continue the Date of the Markman Hearing filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Caughey, Ryan)
July 31, 2013 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Support re #95 MOTION to Continue the Date of the Markman Hearing filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Greene, Blake)
July 31, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION to Continue the Date of the Markman Hearing by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake)
July 23, 2013 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. re #91 Reply to Response to Motion, #92 Response, #93 Declaration,, . (Greene, Blake)
July 23, 2013 Filing 93 DECLARATION re #91 Reply to Response to Motion of Kathryn N. Hong by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 34, #16 Exhibit 35, #17 Exhibit 36, #18 Exhibit 37, #19 Exhibit 38, #20 Exhibit 39, #21 Exhibit 40, #22 Exhibit 41)(Greene, Blake)
July 23, 2013 Filing 92 Response by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. to #89 Opposition to Motion,,,, to World's, Inc.'s Statement of Facts in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. (Greene, Blake)
July 23, 2013 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Greene, Blake)
July 17, 2013 Filing 90 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #82 Motion to Seal Exhibits 18, 19 of the Declaration of Kathryn Hong in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Hourihan, Lisa)
July 9, 2013 Filing 89 Opposition re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan V. Caughey in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 to Caughey Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Caughey Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Caughey Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Caughey Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Caughey Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Caughey Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Caughey Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Caughey Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Caughey Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Caughey Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Caughey Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Caughey Declaration, #14 Declaration of Anatoly S. Weiser in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #15 Exhibit 1 to Weiser Declaration, #16 Exhibit 2 to Weiser Declaration, #17 Exhibit 3 to Weiser Declaration, #18 Exhibit 4 to Weiser Declaration, #19 Declaration of Thomas Kidrin in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Caughey, Ryan)
June 21, 2013 Filing 88 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Hong, Kathryn)
June 18, 2013 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Forrest Stroud. (Greene, Blake)
June 18, 2013 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Katherine Hong in Support of #83 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Greene, Blake)
June 18, 2013 Filing 85 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Greene, Blake)
June 18, 2013 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Support re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Greene, Blake)
June 18, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake)
June 18, 2013 Filing 82 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 18, 19 of the Declaration of Kathryn Hong in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake)
June 18, 2013 Filing 81 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Markman Hearing set for 8/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. Markman Hearing set for 8/23/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. In light of the trial of United States v. James Bulger Markman Hearing had to be rescheduled.(Hourihan, Lisa)
May 28, 2013 Filing 80 EXHIBITS re #75 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Main Document is Exhibit 1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Maynard, Timothy)
May 28, 2013 Filing 79 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #76 Motion to Seal Exhibits A-J of Second Supplemental Disclosure of the Claims Infringed filed by Worlds, Inc. (Maynard, Timothy)
May 28, 2013 Filing 78 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #74 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Third Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions. (Maynard, Timothy)
May 24, 2013 Filing 77 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Worlds, Inc.. Amendment to #34 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed, Second Supplemental. (Leeman, Joel)
May 24, 2013 Filing 76 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Worlds, Inc..(Leeman, Joel)
May 24, 2013 Filing 75 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Hong, Kathryn)
May 24, 2013 Filing 74 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Third Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Hong, Kathryn)
May 24, 2013 Filing 73 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Greene, Blake)
May 20, 2013 Filing 72 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #67 unopposed motion to to allow the filing of reply briefs up to 25 pages in length. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 17, 2013 Filing 71 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Hong, Kathryn)
May 6, 2013 Filing 70 DECLARATION re #69 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs of Kathryn N. Hong by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15)(Hong, Kathryn)
May 6, 2013 Filing 69 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Hong, Kathryn)
May 6, 2013 Filing 68 Responsive Claim Construction Response by Worlds, Inc. to #63 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Caughey Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Langham, Chanler)
May 3, 2013 Filing 67 Assented to MOTION to Enlarge the Page Limit for Reply Claim Construction Briefs by Worlds, Inc..(Leeman, Joel)
May 1, 2013 Filing 66 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Chanler A. Langham. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
April 30, 2013 Filing 65 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Chanler A. Langham in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel pro hac vice Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4433285 by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chanler A. Langham in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel pro hac vice)(Leeman, Joel)
April 22, 2013 Filing 64 DECLARATION re #63 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs of Kathryn N. Hong by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Hong, Kathryn)
April 22, 2013 Filing 63 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Hong, Kathryn)
April 22, 2013 Filing 62 Markman Brief by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Tribble, Max)
April 11, 2013 Filing 61 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs up to 25 pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Maynard, Timothy)
April 11, 2013 Filing 60 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #59 Motion to Seal Document #58 Amended Document, Exhibits A-J. (Maynard, Timothy)
April 10, 2013 Filing 59 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document #58 Amended Document Exhibits A-J by Worlds, Inc..(Leeman, Joel)
April 10, 2013 Filing 58 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Worlds, Inc.. Amendment to #34 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed, First Supplemental. (Leeman, Joel)
April 10, 2013 Filing 57 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Hong, Kathryn)
April 2, 2013 Filing 56 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #55 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. (Maynard, Timothy)
March 27, 2013 Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Amend The Scheduling Order by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Hong, Kathryn)
March 13, 2013 Filing 54 EXHIBIT re #51 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Activision's Second Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc. by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10) (Maynard, Timothy)
March 13, 2013 Filing 53 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #51 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Activision's Second Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions (Maynard, Timothy)
March 12, 2013 Filing 52 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Hong, Kathryn)
March 12, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-10 of Activision's Second Supplemental Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Hong, Kathryn)
February 25, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Matthew R. Clements (Clements, Matthew)
December 26, 2012 Filing 49 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Maynard, Timothy)
December 20, 2012 Filing 48 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10)(Hong, Kathryn)
December 20, 2012 Filing 47 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E1, #2 Exhibit E2, #3 Exhibit E3, #4 Exhibit E4, #5 Exhibit E5, #6 Exhibit E6, #7 Exhibit E7, #8 Exhibit E8, #9 Exhibit E9, #10 Exhibit E10, #11 Exhibit E11, #12 Exhibit E12, #13 Exhibit E13, #14 Exhibit E14, #15 Exhibit E15, #16 Exhibit E16, #17 Exhibit E17, #18 Exhibit E18, #19 Exhibit E19, #20 Exhibit E20, #21 Exhibit E21, #22 Exhibit E22, #23 Exhibit F)(Greene, Blake)
December 18, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith L. Ainbinder on behalf of Worlds, Inc. (Ainbinder, Meredith)
December 13, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jack C. Schecter (Schecter, Jack)
December 5, 2012 Filing 44 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kathryn N. Hong. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
December 4, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kathryn N. Hong Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4229442 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Kathryn H. Hong)(Greene, Blake)
December 3, 2012 Filing 42 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Greene, Blake)
December 3, 2012 Filing 41 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit A-9, #10 Exhibit A-10, #11 Exhibit A-11, #12 Exhibit A-12, #13 Exhibit A-13, #14 Exhibit A-14, #15 Exhibit A-15, #16 Exhibit A-16, #17 Exhibit A-17, #18 Exhibit A-18, #19 Exhibit A-19, #20 Exhibit A-20, #21 Exhibit A-21, #22 Exhibit A-22, #23 Exhibit B-1, #24 Exhibit B-2, #25 Exhibit B-3, #26 Exhibit B-4, #27 Exhibit B-5, #28 Exhibit B-6, #29 Exhibit B-7, #30 Exhibit B-8, #31 Exhibit B-9, #32 Exhibit B-10, #33 Exhibit B-11, #34 Exhibit B-12, #35 Exhibit B-13, #36 Exhibit B-14, #37 Exhibit B-15, #38 Exhibit B-16, #39 Exhibit B-17, #40 Exhibit B-18, #41 Exhibit B-19, #42 Exhibit B-20, #43 Exhibit B-21, #44 Exhibit B-22, #45 Exhibit C-1, #46 Exhibit C-2, #47 Exhibit C-3, #48 Exhibit C-4, #49 Exhibit C-5, #50 Exhibit C-6, #51 Exhibit C-7, #52 Exhibit C-8, #53 Exhibit C-9, #54 Exhibit C-10, #55 Exhibit C-11, #56 Exhibit C-12, #57 Exhibit C-13, #58 Exhibit C-14, #59 Exhibit C-15, #60 Exhibit C-16, #61 Exhibit C-17, #62 Exhibit C-18, #63 Exhibit C-19, #64 Exhibit C-20, #65 Exhibit C-21, #66 Exhibit C-22, #67 Exhibit D-1, #68 Exhibit D-2, #69 Exhibit D-3, #70 Exhibit D-4, #71 Exhibit D-5, #72 Exhibit D-6, #73 Exhibit D-7, #74 Exhibit D-8, #75 Exhibit D-9, #76 Exhibit D-10, #77 Exhibit D-11, #78 Exhibit D-12, #79 Exhibit D-13, #80 Exhibit D-14, #81 Exhibit D-15, #82 Exhibit D-16, #83 Exhibit D-17, #84 Exhibit D-18, #85 Exhibit D-19, #86 Exhibit D-20, #87 Exhibit D-21, #88 Exhibit D-22, #89 Exhibit F)(Greene, Blake)
November 26, 2012 Filing 40 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #38 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. December 3, 2012 is the deadline by which Activision must serve Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Disclosures regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 7,181,690, 7,493,558, 7,945,856, and 8,082,501 ("Disclosures"). (Maynard, Timothy)
November 26, 2012 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Leeman, Joel)
November 20, 2012 Filing 38 Assented to MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake)
November 15, 2012 Filing 37 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric B. Goldberg terminated (Maynard, Timothy)
October 9, 2012 Filing 36 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake)
September 25, 2012 Filing 35 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order so that Activision will have until December 20, 2012 to serve disclosures regarding the '998 patent. (Maynard, Timothy)
September 24, 2012 Filing 34 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Leeman, Joel)
September 21, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend #27 Joint submission re scheduling order by Worlds, Inc..(Leeman, Joel)
September 21, 2012 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Worlds, Inc..(Leeman, Joel)
August 22, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Activision Blizzard, Inc..(Kenney, Christopher)
August 16, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Biddinger on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Biddinger, Brian)
August 13, 2012 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 8/13/2012. Case to be scheduled through the Markman Hearing. Court adopts the joint statement with the following changes. Amendment and supplementation of preliminary infringement disclosure due by 5/24/13. Amendment and supplementation of preliminary invalidity and non-infringement disclosures due by 5/24/13. Parties to exchange any claim construction tutorials to be use at hearing by 6/17/13. Markman Hearing set for 6/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Joel Leeman, Ryan Caughey and Sandeep Seth for the plaintiff. Jesse Jenner and Blake Greene for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings to reflect the conference is at 2:15PM: Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2012 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 6, 2012 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) re litigation budget conference. (Leeman, Joel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 27 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 re Scheduling by Worlds, Inc..(Leeman, Joel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 26 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake)
July 13, 2012 Filing 25 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian D. Melton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
July 12, 2012 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian D. Melton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4026699 by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian D. Melton)(Leeman, Joel)
June 26, 2012 Filing 23 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew R. Clements, Brian P. Biddinger, David S. Chun, Christopher J. Harnett, Gene W. Lee, Jesse J. Jenner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy)
June 22, 2012 Filing 22 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 22, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2012 02:15 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 18, 2012 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
June 18, 2012 Filing 19 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Moore, Kellyann)
June 15, 2012 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake)
June 15, 2012 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Vivendi, S.A., Other Affiliate VGAC, LLC for Activision Blizzard, Inc... (Greene, Blake)
June 15, 2012 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jesse J. Jenner; Gene W. Lee; Christopher J. Harnett; David S. Chun; Brian P. Biddinger; Matthew R. Clements Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-3990093 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jesse J. Jenner Certificate, #2 Gene W. Lee Certificate, #3 Christopher J. Harnett Certificate, #4 David S. Chun Certificate, #5 Brian P. Biddinger Certificate, #6 Matthew R. Clements Certificate)(Greene, Blake)
June 14, 2012 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 15, 2012 to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 11, 2012 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 15, 2012 to File Answer , move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Greene, Blake) Modified on 6/11/2012 (to add the word "unopposed") (York, Steve).
June 11, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake B. Greene on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Greene, Blake)
May 1, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Kerrigan on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Kerrigan, David)
May 1, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Goldberg on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Goldberg, Eric)
May 1, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Kenney on behalf of Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Kenney, Christopher)
May 1, 2012 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (Kenney, Christopher)
April 25, 2012 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Max L. Tribble, Joseph S. Grinstein, Sandeep Seth and Ryan Caughey by Worlds, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time Until 6/11/12 to Answer re #1 Complaint by all defendants. (Lovett, Jarrett)
April 24, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 11, 2012 to Answer Complaint by Activision Blizzard, Inc..(Kenney, Christopher)
April 20, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Max L. Tribble, Joseph S. Grinstein, Sandeep Seth and Ryan Caughey Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-3910543 by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Leeman, Joel)
April 19, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. served on 4/4/2012, answer due 4/25/2012. (York, Steve)
April 19, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Activision Publishing, Inc. served on 4/4/2012, answer due 4/25/2012. (York, Steve)
April 19, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Activision Blizzard, Inc. served on 4/4/2012, answer due 4/25/2012. (York, Steve)
April 2, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Activision Blizzard, Inc., Activision Publishing, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Flaherty, Elaine)
April 2, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly)
March 30, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack C. Schecter on behalf of Worlds, Inc. (Schecter, Jack)
March 30, 2012 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Worlds, Inc.. (Leeman, Joel)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3880010 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Leeman, Joel)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3880010 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Worlds, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Leeman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worlds, Inc. v. Activision Blizzard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Gene W. Lee
Represented By: Matthew J. Moffa
Represented By: Jesse J. Jenner
Represented By: Sharon Lee
Represented By: David S. Chun
Represented By: Brian P. Biddinger
Represented By: Matthew R. Clements
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hong
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Represented By: Eric B. Goldberg
Represented By: Blake B. Greene
Represented By: Samuel L. Brenner
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Gene W. Lee
Represented By: Matthew J. Moffa
Represented By: Jesse J. Jenner
Represented By: Sharon Lee
Represented By: David S. Chun
Represented By: Brian P. Biddinger
Represented By: Matthew R. Clements
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hong
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Represented By: Eric B. Goldberg
Represented By: Blake B. Greene
Represented By: Samuel L. Brenner
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Gene W. Lee
Represented By: Matthew J. Moffa
Represented By: Jesse J. Jenner
Represented By: Sharon Lee
Represented By: David S. Chun
Represented By: Brian P. Biddinger
Represented By: Matthew R. Clements
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hong
Represented By: Christopher J. Harnett
Represented By: Eric B. Goldberg
Represented By: Blake B. Greene
Represented By: Samuel L. Brenner
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worlds, Inc.
Represented By: Chanler A. Langham
Represented By: Joseph S. Grinstein
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Represented By: Meredith L. Ainbinder
Represented By: Brian D. Melton
Represented By: Ryan Caughey
Represented By: Joel R. Leeman
Represented By: Max L. Tribble
Represented By: Jack C. Schecter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?