In Re: Nexium (Esomeprazole) Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, All Plaintiffs, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Plaintiffs, A.F. of L., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Meijer, Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund and HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. and AstraZeneca LP
Petitioner: Mr. TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Interested Party: CaremarkPCS Health, LLC and McKesson Corporation
Consolidated Plaintiff: A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., CARITEN INSURANCE COMPANY, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., Eckerd Corporation, CAREPLUS HEALTH PLANS, INC., CARITEN HEALTH PLAN INC., The Kroger Co., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF OHIO, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., CHA HMO, INC., EMPHESYS INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMANA BENEFIT PLAN OF ILLINOIS, INC., Value Drug Company, M.D. CARE INC., HUMANA HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, Safeway Inc., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF UTAH, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF TEXAS, INC., Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF KENTUCKY, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Humana Employers Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., Walgreen Co., American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., HUMANA WISCONSIN HEALTH ORGANIZATION INSURANCE CORPORATION, HUMANA INSURANCE OF PUERTO RICO, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN, INC., Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., Burlington Drug Company Inc., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN, INC., Supervalu, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF MICHIGAN, INC., HUMANA REGIONAL HEALTH PLAN, INC., Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Giant Eagle, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMAN HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, INC., HUMANA ADVANTAGECARE PLAN and HEB GROCERY CO. LP
Intervenor: Express Scripts, Inc., Christopher Wirth, Edward Breivik, Jonathan Rich, James Jared Thule, Cardinal Health, Inc., Christopher Donnelly and Terry Lynn Nicholas
Intervenor Plaintiff: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
In Re: Nexium (Esomeprazole) Antitrust Litigation
Case Number: 1:2012md02409
Filed: December 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 1638 DECLARATION of Elena K. Chan in Support re #1635 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Donate Unclaimed Settlement Funds filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paine, Matthew)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1637 DECLARATION of Philip Mattoon in Support re #1635 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Donate Unclaimed Settlement Funds filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Paine, Matthew)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1636 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1635 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Donate Unclaimed Settlement Funds filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Paine, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1635 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Donate Unclaimed Settlement Funds by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Donate Unclaimed Settlement Funds, )(Chan, Elena) (Modified on 5/13/2019 to Correct Docket Text. Refiled Memorandum in Support and Declarations as Separate Docket Entries) (Paine, Matthew).
January 8, 2018 Filing 1634 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #1632 Unopposed Motion for Reimbursement of Post-Trial Expenses and Disbursement of the Remainder of the Teva Settlement Fund. (Paine, Matthew)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1633 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1632 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Reimbursement of Post-Trial Expenses and Disbursement of the Remainder of the Teva Settlement Fund filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A - Direct Purchaser Class Declaration (Hagens Berman), #2 Affidavit Ex A-1 Second Hagens Berman Declaration, #3 Affidavit Ex A-2 Berger & Montague Declaration, #4 Affidavit Ex A-3 Garwin Gerstein & Fisher Declaration, #5 Affidavit Ex A-4 Odom & Des Roches Declaration, #6 Affidavit Ex A-5 Heim Payne & Chorush Declaration, #7 Affidavit Ex A-6 Smith Segura & Raphael Declaration, #8 Affidavit Ex A-7 Radice Law Firm Declaration, #9 Affidavit Ex A-8 Taus Cebulash Declaration, #10 Affidavit Ex A-9 Declaration of Philip Mattoon of Rust Consulting Inc. (Notice and Claims Administrator), #11 Affidavit Ex B Declaration of Michael Rosenbaum of Berdon Claims Administration LLC (Escrow Agent), #12 Affidavit Ex C Giant Eagle Declaration, #13 Affidavit Ex D - End Payor Class Counsel Declaration (Wexler Wallace), #14 Affidavit Ex D-1 Hilliard Shadowen Declaration, #15 Affidavit Ex D-2 Cohen Milstein Declaration, #16 Affidavit Ex D-3 Pomerantz Declaration, #17 Affidavit Ex D-4 Girard Gibbs Declaration)(Chan, Elena) (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/5/2018) (Paine, Matthew).
January 5, 2018 Filing 1632 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Reimbursement of Post-Trial Expenses and Disbursement of the Remainder of the Teva Settlement Fund by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Elena)
November 27, 2017 Filing 1631 Letter from Gwendolyn I. Wamsley to Judge William G. Young. (Paine, Matthew)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1630 BILL OF COSTS as to Ranbaxy. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1629 BILL OF COSTS as to AstraZeneca. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1628 Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re #1578 MOTION to Stay re #1570 Bill of Costs, #1569 MOTION for Bill of Costs --- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Or, in the Alternative, Decline to Award Defendants' Costs filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1627 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #1578 MOTION to Stay re #1570 Bill of Costs, #1569 MOTION for Bill of Costs --- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Or, in the Alternative, Decline to Award Defendants' Costs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shadowen, Steve)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1626 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #1624 Letter from Plaintiffs request for supplemental briefing regarding Bills of Costs.Treated as a motion to file a supplemental brief by May 1, 2017, motion allowed. (Paine, Matthew)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1625 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #1623 Letter from AstraZeneca regarding Bills of Costs.Treated as a motion to lift the stay, motion allowed.(Paine, Matthew)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1624 Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs request for supplemental briefing regarding Bills of Costs. (Shadowen, Steve)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1623 Letter/request (non-motion) from AstraZeneca regarding Bills of Costs. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
January 18, 2017 Filing 1622 MANDATE of USCA as to #1546 Notice of Appeal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #1547 Notice of Appeal filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, #1548 Notice of Appeal filed by Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Supervalu, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., The Kroger Co., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Walgreen Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Safeway Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Eckerd Corporation. Appeal #1546 , #1548 , #1547 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 ORDER of USCA as to #1546 Notice of Appeal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #1547 Notice of Appeal filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, #1548 Notice of Appeal filed by Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Supervalu, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., The Kroger Co., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Walgreen Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Safeway Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Eckerd Corporation. (Paine, Matthew)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 ORDER of USCA as to #1546 Notice of Appeal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #1547 Notice of Appeal filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, #1548 Notice of Appeal filed by Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Supervalu, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., The Kroger Co., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Walgreen Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Safeway Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Eckerd Corporation.The petitions for rehearing en banc filed by the Individual Retailer Appellants, End-Payor Class Plaintiffs-Appellants, and Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs-Appellants are DENIED. (Paine, Matthew)
November 21, 2016 Filing 1619 USCA Judgment as to #1546 Notice of Appeal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #1547 Notice of Appeal filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, #1548 Notice of Appeal filed by Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Supervalu, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., The Kroger Co., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Walgreen Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Safeway Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Eckerd Corporation. AFFIRMED... (Paine, Matthew)
November 21, 2016 Filing 1618 OPINION of USCA as to #1546 Notice of Appeal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #1547 Notice of Appeal filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, #1548 Notice of Appeal filed by Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Supervalu, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., The Kroger Co., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Walgreen Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Safeway Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Eckerd Corporation. (Paine, Matthew)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1617 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #1615 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund. (Paine, Matthew)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1616 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1615 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Declaration of Philip Mattoon (Claims Administrator, Rust Consulting), #2 Affidavit Ex. B - Declaration of Elena K. Chan in support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund)(Chan, Elena)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1615 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Elena)
May 3, 2016 Filing 1614 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #1612 MOTION for Order By Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs for Approval of Plan of Allocation of the Teva Settlement Proceeds to Class Members and Claim Form. (Paine, Matthew)
May 2, 2016 Filing 1613 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1612 MOTION for Order By Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs for Approval of Plan of Allocation of the Teva Settlement Proceeds to Class Members and Claim Form filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce)
May 2, 2016 Filing 1612 MOTION for Order By Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs for Approval of Plan of Allocation of the Teva Settlement Proceeds to Class Members and Claim Form by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A. - Proposed Plan of Allocation, #3 Exhibit B. - Proposed Claim Form)(Gerstein, Bruce)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1611 NOTICE by Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company OF DEPOSIT OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS FUNDS TO NEXIUM ESCROW ACCOUNT (Gerstein, Bruce)
April 19, 2016 Filing 1610 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #1607 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (Paine, Matthew)
April 13, 2016 Filing 1609 AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth A. Wexler in Support re #1607 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Orenstein, Nathaniel)
April 13, 2016 Filing 1608 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1607 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Orenstein, Nathaniel)
April 13, 2016 Filing 1607 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orenstein, Nathaniel)
April 6, 2016 Filing 1606 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Peter A. Barile, III (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barile, Peter)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1605 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting #1602 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of the Remainder of the Teva Settlement Proceeds. (Paine, Matthew)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1604 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1602 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of the Remainder of the Teva Settlement Proceeds Declaration of Scott Perwin filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1603 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1602 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of the Remainder of the Teva Settlement Proceeds filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1602 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds of the Remainder of the Teva Settlement Proceeds by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Perwin, Scott)
October 23, 2015 Filing 1600 Letter from Jo Anne McMahon. (Paine, Matthew)
October 21, 2015 Filing 1599 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: ORDER and JUDGMENT Approving End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Settlement with Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
October 21, 2015 Filing 1598 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: ORDER and JUDGMENT Approving End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Setttlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. and Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
October 20, 2015 Filing 1601 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #1595 Notice of Appeal Documents included: ECF Nos. 857,874,902,977,1383,1544,1545,1586,1595 (Paine, Matthew)
October 6, 2015 Filing 1595 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1586 Judgment, #857 Order, #874 Order, 902 Electronic Order, 940 Electronic Endorsement, #977 Memorandum and Order, #1383 Jury Verdict, #1544 Memorandum and Order, #1545 Amended Memorandum and Order by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5778495 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/26/2015. (Perwin, Scott) Modified on 10/7/2015 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Document Link) (Paine, Matthew).
October 5, 2015 Filing 1597 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: ORDER granting Final Judgment and ORDER of Dismissal Approving Direct Purchaser Class Settlement and Dismissing Direct Purchaser Class Claims Against Dr. Reddy's Laboratories LTD. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1596 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: ORDER granting Final Judgment and ORDER of Dismissal Approving Direct Purchaser Class Settlement and Dismissing Direct Purchaser Class Claims Against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1594 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #1580 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (Paine, Matthew)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1593 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1578 Motion to Stay (Paine, Matthew)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1592 Opposition re #1578 MOTION to Stay re #1570 Bill of Costs, #1569 MOTION for Bill of Costs --- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Or, in the Alternative, Decline to Award Defendants' Costs filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Foley Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Weingarten, James)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1591 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1589 Subsequent Notice of Appeal (Paine, Matthew)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1590 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1588 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1589 Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1586 Judgment, #1544 Memorandum & ORDER, 902 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Pretrial Conference - Interim #857 Order #1545 Memorandum & ORDER, #874 Order, #977 Memorandum & ORDER by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund ( Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5772881 Fee status: n.) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/21/2015. (DeValerio, Glen)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1588 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 902 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Pretrial Conference - Interim #857 Order #874 Order, #977 Memorandum & ORDER by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/21/2015. (Sobol, Thomas) (Modified on 10/2/2015 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
September 29, 2015 Filing 1587 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Fairness Hearing held on 9/29/2015. The Court inquires as to any objectors present, no affirmative answer. The Court approves the motions and will enter all proposed orders (5) with today's date. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1586 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Paine, Matthew)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1585 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Rosenbaum in Support re #1580 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE COSTS, AND AWARDING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND END-PAYOR CLASS filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company, Walgreen Co.. (Gerstein, Bruce)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1584 EXHBITS (19) - (36) re #1580 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE COSTS, AND AWARDING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND END-PAYOR CLASS Exhibit 19 filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 - Shadowen Declaration, #2 Exhibit 21 - Richards Declaration, #3 Exhibit 22 - Goldstein Declaration, #4 Exhibit 23 - Girard Gibbs Declaration, #5 Exhibit 24 - Garvish Declaration, #6 Exhibit 25 - Finkelman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 26 - Scott Declaration, #8 Exhibit 27 - Penny Declaration, #9 Exhibit 28 Dugan Declaration, #10 Exhibit 29 - Schirripa Declaration, #11 Exhibit 30 - Schneider Declaration, #12 Exhibit 31 - Buchman Declaration, #13 Exhibit 32 - Shapiro Declaration, #14 Exhibit 33 - Kaufmann Declaration, #15 Exhibit 34 - DeValerio Declaration, #16 Exhibit 35 - Kitchenoff Declaration, #17 Exhibit 36 Rodriguez Declaration)(Gerstein, Bruce) (Modified on 9/29/2015 to Correct Docket Text as Counsel Filed the Exhibits Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
September 28, 2015 Filing 1583 EXHBITS (16) - (18) re #1580 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE COSTS, AND AWARDING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND END-PAYOR CLASS Exhibit 16 Kenny Nachwalter Declaration filed by The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 - Hanley Declaration, #2 Exhibit 18 - Marcus Shapira Declaration)(Gerstein, Bruce) Modified on 9/29/2015 to Correct Docket Text As Counsel Filed the Exhibits Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
September 28, 2015 Filing 1582 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1580 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE COSTS, AND AWARDING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND END-PAYOR CLASS filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Sobol Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Berger & Montague Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Garwin Gerstein & Fisher Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Barrett Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cohn Lifland Pearlman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Faruqi Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 - Grant & Eisenhofer Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 - Heim Payne Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 - Odom & DesRoches Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 - Radice Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 - Smith Segura Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 - Taus Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 - Vanek Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15A - Rust & Berdon Invoices, #16 Exhibit 15B - Value and Burlington Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15C - Rochester Drug Declaration, #18 Exhibit 15D - American Sales Declaration, #19 Exhibit 15E - Meijer Declaration)(Gerstein, Bruce)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1581 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1580 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE COSTS, AND AWARDING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND END-PAYOR CLASS filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company, Walgreen Co.. (Gerstein, Bruce)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1580 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE COSTS, AND AWARDING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND END-PAYOR CLASS by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE COSTS, AND AWARDING INCENTIVE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND END-PAYOR CLASS)(Gerstein, Bruce)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1579 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs. Document received: Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay, or In the Alternative, Decline to Award Defendants' Costs (ECF No. 1578). (Sobol, Thomas)
September 27, 2015 Filing 1578 MOTION to Stay re #1570 Bill of Costs, #1569 MOTION for Bill of Costs --- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Or, in the Alternative, Decline to Award Defendants' Costs by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
September 25, 2015 Filing 1577 RESPONSE to Motion re #1555 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Jointly Proposed Judgment)(Weingarten, James)
September 25, 2015 Filing 1576 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna M. Evans on behalf of New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund (Evans, Donna)
September 25, 2015 Filing 1575 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Donna M. Evans (Evans, Donna)
September 23, 2015 Filing 1574 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1571 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #1555 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Responses due by 9/25/2015 (Paine, Matthew)
September 23, 2015 Filing 1573 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered VACATING re 1572 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). (THIS ORDER WAS ENTERED IN ERROR BY THE DOCKET CLERK) (Paine, Matthew)
September 18, 2015 Filing 1571 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/25/2015 to File Response/Reply as to #1555 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weingarten, James)
September 15, 2015 Filing 1572 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1555 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Paine, Matthew)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1570 BILL OF COSTS by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Decl. of Danielle R. Foley with Cert. of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Foley, Danielle)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1569 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 1) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 2) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #8 Exhibit 5 (Part 3) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #9 Exhibit 5 (Part 4) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #10 Exhibit 5 (Part 5) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #11 Exhibit 5 (Part 6) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #12 Exhibit 5 (Part 7) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #13 Exhibit 5 (Part 8) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #14 Exhibit 5 (Part 9) to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #15 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Weingarten, James)
September 10, 2015 Filing 1568 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #1563 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #1558 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with Teva, #1560 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #1559 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1561 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #1564 Declaration,,, #1567 Declaration,,,, #1557 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1562 MOTION Requesting Named Plaintiff Service Awards , #1566 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #1565 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlements with DRL and TEVA-, #1556 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1567 DECLARATION re #1566 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #1565 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlements with DRL and TEVA- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sherwood Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-E, Part 1, #3 Exhibit A-E, Part 2)(DeValerio, Glen)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1566 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1565 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlements with DRL and TEVA- filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (DeValerio, Glen)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1565 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlements with DRL and TEVA- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Teva Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order DRL Settlement)(DeValerio, Glen)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1564 DECLARATION re #1563 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(DeValerio, Glen)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1563 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1562 MOTION Requesting Named Plaintiff Service Awards filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (DeValerio, Glen)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1562 MOTION Requesting Named Plaintiff Service Awards by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund.(DeValerio, Glen)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1561 AFFIDAVIT of Rebecca Blake of Rust Consulting (Notice Administrator for the Direct Purchaser Class) in Support re #1558 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with Teva, #1556 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1560 AFFIDAVIT of Direct Purchaser Co-Lead Counsel in Support re #1558 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with Teva, #1556 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1559 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1558 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with Teva filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1558 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with Teva by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1557 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1556 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1556 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
September 4, 2015 Filing 1555 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sobol, Thomas)
September 2, 2015 Filing 1554 USCA Case Number 15-2007 for #1548 Notice of Appeal filed by Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Supervalu, Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., Walgreen Co., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, The Kroger Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Safeway Inc., JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Eckerd Corporation. (Paine, Matthew)
September 2, 2015 Filing 1553 USCA Case Number 15-2006 for #1547 Notice of Appeal filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. (Paine, Matthew)
September 2, 2015 Filing 1552 USCA Case Number 15-2005 for #1546 Notice of Appeal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Paine, Matthew)
September 1, 2015 Filing 1551 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1548 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 1, 2015 Filing 1550 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1547 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 1, 2015 Filing 1549 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #1546 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
August 28, 2015 Filing 1548 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #874 Order, #857 Order, 940 Electronic Endorsement Order, #977 Memorandum and Order, #1383 Jury Verdict, #1544 Memorandum and Order, and #1545 Amended Memorandum and Order by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5722124 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 9/17/2015. (Perwin, Scott) (Modified on 9/1/2015 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Document Link) (Paine, Matthew).
August 28, 2015 Filing 1547 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1544 Memorandum & ORDER, 902 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,, Pretrial Conference - Interim,,, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1545 Memorandum & ORDER, #874 Order, #977 Memorandum & ORDER by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5721970 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 9/17/2015. (DeValerio, Glen)
August 28, 2015 Filing 1546 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1544 Memorandum & ORDER, 902 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,, Pretrial Conference - Interim,,, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1545 Memorandum & ORDER, #874 Order, #977 Memorandum & ORDER by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-5721847 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 9/17/2015. (Sobol, Thomas)
August 7, 2015 Filing 1545 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (Amendment found on page 95)(Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 30, 2015 Filing 1544 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1543 Letter from Lloyd Antonio Vereen. (Paine, Matthew)
June 29, 2015 Filing 1542 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial, #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
June 16, 2015 Filing 1541 Judge William G. Young: AMENDED ORDER entered:AMENDED ORDER Approving End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Notice Plan for the DRL Settlement. (Paine, Matthew)
June 16, 2015 Filing 1540 Judge William G. Young: AMENDED ORDER entered:AMENDED ORDER Preliminarily Approving End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Settlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Approving Notice Plan. (Paine, Matthew)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1539 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing re FINAL APPROVAL - FAIRNESS HEARING : Hearing set for 9/29/2015 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 - 5th Floor before Judge William G. Young. (Paine, Matthew)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1538 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered:ORDER Approving End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Notice Plan for the DRL Settlement. (Paine, Matthew)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1537 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered:ORDER Preliminarily Approving End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Settlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Approving Notice Plan. (Paine, Matthew)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1536 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered:ORDER Preliminarily Approving Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Authorizing Notice to the Class, and Setting Hearing. (Paine, Matthew)
June 10, 2015 Filing 1535 Response by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB to #1532 Notice of Supplemental Authorities . (Weingarten, James)
June 10, 2015 Filing 1534 Opposition to Notice of Supplemental Authority ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Permanent Injunction Response by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to #1532 Notice of Supplemental Authorities . (Baldridge, James)
June 10, 2015 Filing 1533 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Sarah Choi (Choi, Sarah)
June 4, 2015 Filing 1532 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sobol, Thomas)
May 14, 2015 Filing 1531 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Please Disregard ECF No. #1529 Notice of Appearance of Counsel Eisler. The Notice of Appearance Was Docketed In the Wrong Case and Counsel Eisler Removed From the Case Docket. (Paine, Matthew)
May 11, 2015 Filing 1530 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST0495509 for #1529 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice - Robert G. Eisler) (Paine, Matthew)
May 11, 2015 Filing 1529 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Eisler on behalf of American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company (Paine, Matthew)
April 30, 2015 Filing 1528 NOTICE of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Modified on 5/1/2015 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
April 24, 2015 Filing 1527 DECLARATION re #1526 Notice (Other),,,, by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeValerio, Glen)
April 24, 2015 Filing 1526 NOTICE by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund re #1511 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,, #1510 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement With Teva and Approval of Notice Plan for the Teva and DRL Settlements- -Notice of Revisions to End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice Plan- (DeValerio, Glen)
April 9, 2015 Filing 1525 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #1522 Motion for Reconsideration (Paine, Matthew)
April 9, 2015 Filing 1524 NOTICE by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 (Schoen, Laurence)
April 8, 2015 Filing 1523 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1522 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (DeValerio, Glen)
April 8, 2015 Filing 1522 MOTION for Reconsideration by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund.(DeValerio, Glen)
April 8, 2015 Filing 1521 REPLY to Response to #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial, #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 -- PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS ASTRAZENECAS AND RANBAXYS OPPOSITIONS (ECF NOS. 1507 AND 1508) TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN CONNECTION WITH PENDING NEW TRIAL MOTIONS filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
April 8, 2015 Filing 1520 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1519 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Their Supplemental Submission in Connection with Pending New Trial Motions ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
April 7, 2015 Filing 1519 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Their Supplemental Submission in Connection with Pending New Trial Motions by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
April 7, 2015 Filing 1518 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: Motion allowed. See order. re #1516 MOTION to Amend Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend the Form of Notice of the Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL, and Schedule for Final Approval. (Paine, Matthew)
April 6, 2015 Filing 1517 RESPONSE to Motion re #1516 MOTION to Amend Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend the Form of Notice of the Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL, and Schedule for Final Approval, #1510 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement With Teva and Approval of Notice Plan for the Teva and DRL Settlements-, #1512 MOTION for Settlement Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Approval of Proposed Notice Program and Form of No filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Resnik, Stephanie)
April 6, 2015 Filing 1516 MOTION to Amend Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend the Form of Notice of the Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with DRL, and Schedule for Final Approval by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerstein, Bruce)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1515 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial --- Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission In Connection With Pending New Trial Motions filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol, #2 Exhibit A to TMS Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to TMS Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to TMS Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to TMS Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to TMS Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to TMS Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to TMS Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to TMS Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to TMS Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to TMS Declaration, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1514 DECLARATION re #1511 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,, #1510 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement With Teva and Approval of Notice Plan for the Teva and DRL Settlements- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit 2 - KCC Declaration)(DeValerio, Glen)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1513 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1512 MOTION for Settlement Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Approval of Proposed Notice Program and Form of No filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bruce E. Gerstein, Esq. in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Approval of Proposed Notice Program and Form of Notice, and Scheduling a Hearing for Final Approval of the Settlement, #2 Affidavit of Rebecca A. Blake of Rust Consulting, Inc. in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Proposed Notice Program and Form of Notice)(Gerstein, Bruce)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1512 MOTION for Settlement Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Approval of Proposed Notice Program and Form of Notice, and Scheduling a Hearing for Final Approval of the Settlement by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving the Direct Purchaser Class Settlement with Teva)(Gerstein, Bruce)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1511 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1510 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement With Teva and Approval of Notice Plan for the Teva and DRL Settlements- filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Teva Preliminary Approval Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order DRL Notice Approval Order)(DeValerio, Glen)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1510 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement With Teva and Approval of Notice Plan for the Teva and DRL Settlements- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund.(DeValerio, Glen)
April 2, 2015 Filing 1509 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1502 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Submission In Connection With Pending New Trial Motions and Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
March 30, 2015 Filing 1508 Opposition re #1502 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Submission In Connection With Pending New Trial Motions and Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
March 30, 2015 Filing 1507 Opposition re #1502 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Submission In Connection With Pending New Trial Motions and Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
March 17, 2015 Filing 1506 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #1500 MOTION Motion to Set a Schedule for Approval of its Settlement Agreements.Denied without prejudice to its renewal (Paine, Matthew)
March 17, 2015 Filing 1505 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #1502 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Submission In Connection With Pending New Trial Motions and Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
March 16, 2015 Filing 1504 Opposition re #1500 MOTION Motion to Set a Schedule for Approval of its Settlement Agreements filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Chan, Elena)
March 16, 2015 Filing 1503 RESPONSE to Motion re #1500 MOTION Motion to Set a Schedule for Approval of its Settlement Agreements filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (DeValerio, Glen)
March 16, 2015 Filing 1502 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Submission In Connection With Pending New Trial Motions and Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission in Connection with Pending New Trial Motions, #2 Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol, #3 Exhibit A to TMS Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to TMS Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to TMS Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to TMS Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to TMS Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to TMS Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to TMS Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to TMS Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to TMS Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to TMS Declaration, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1501 TAXATION OF COST as to #928 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Astrazeneca AB, #926 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca AB (Paine, Matthew)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1500 MOTION Motion to Set a Schedule for Approval of its Settlement Agreements by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Resnik, Stephanie)
February 20, 2015 Filing 1499 Trial Exhibit and Witness List. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1498 MANDATE of USCA as to #928 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Astrazeneca AB, #926 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca AB. Appeal #928 , #926 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1497 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 18, 2015 Filing 1496 Transcript of Post-Trial Motion Session held on February 6, 2015, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 3/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 9, 2015 Filing 1494 NOTICE by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 (Resnik, Stephanie)
February 9, 2015 Filing 1493 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST DRL (Perwin, Scott)
February 6, 2015 Filing 1495 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2015 re #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund. The Court hears oral arguments and takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 6, 2015 Filing 1492 REPLY to Response to #1488 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Further Support of Class Plaintiffs Motion for New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
February 6, 2015 Filing 1491 REPLY to Response to #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
February 6, 2015 Filing 1490 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1488 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
February 6, 2015 Filing 1489 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1487 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
February 6, 2015 Filing 1488 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Further Support of Class Plaintiffs Motion for New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 5, 2015 Filing 1487 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of New Trial by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply in Support of Motion for New Trial)(Refsin, Barry)
February 5, 2015 Filing 1486 REPLY to Response to #1484 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Oppositions To Plaintiffs' Motion For Permanent Injunction filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund. (Shadowen, Steve)
February 5, 2015 Filing 1485 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1484 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Oppositions To Plaintiffs' Motion For Permanent Injunction ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
February 4, 2015 Filing 1484 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Oppositions To Plaintiffs' Motion For Permanent Injunction by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Reply)(Shadowen, Steve)
January 30, 2015 Filing 1483 Opposition re #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial, #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
January 30, 2015 Filing 1482 DECLARATION re #1481 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for New Trial (Retailer Plaintiffs) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Weingarten, James)
January 30, 2015 Filing 1481 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
January 30, 2015 Filing 1480 DECLARATION re #1479 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for New Trial (Class Plaintiffs) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Weingarten, James)
January 30, 2015 Filing 1479 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
January 28, 2015 Filing 1478 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1474 Consent MOTION Approval of Settlement Agreements (Paine, Matthew)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1477 Request for Judicial Notice OF AMNEAL'S LAUNCH OF ESOMEPRAZOLE STRONTIUM by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1476 DECLARATION re #1475 Opposition to Motion J. Douglas Baldridge by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Baldridge, James)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1475 Opposition re #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1474 Consent MOTION Approval of Settlement Agreements by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc..(Resnik, Stephanie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1473 RESPONSE to Motion re #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction , #1464 MOTION for Joinder as to Motion for Permanent Injunction (ECF No. 1457) filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1472 USCA Judgment as to #928 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Astrazeneca AB, #926 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca AB. AFFIRMED... (Paine, Matthew)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1471 OPINION of USCA as to #928 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Astrazeneca AB, #926 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca AB. (Paine, Matthew)
January 15, 2015 Filing 1470 Reset Deadlines as to #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction . Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Paine, Matthew)
January 15, 2015 Filing 1469 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1468 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 26, 2015 to TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION. (Paine, Matthew)
January 14, 2015 Filing 1468 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 26, 2015 to TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Baldridge, James)
January 14, 2015 Filing 1467 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction : Motion Hearing reset for 2/6/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Each side will be give one half hour to argue. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 13, 2015 Filing 1466 REPLY to Response to #1447 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
January 13, 2015 Filing 1465 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1463 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in support of Motion for Entry of Judgment (ECF No. 1447) ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
January 12, 2015 Filing 1464 MOTION for Joinder as to Motion for Permanent Injunction (ECF No. 1457) filed by American Sales Company, LLC. (Sobol, Thomas) (Modified on 1/13/2015 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2015 Filing 1463 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in support of Motion for Entry of Judgment (ECF No. 1447) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief)(Weingarten, James)
January 9, 2015 Filing 1462 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1456 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial, #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59. Responses due by 1/30/2015. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 1461 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2015 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will take place at Boston College Law School, 885 Centre Street, East Wing, Room 115, Newton, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 8, 2015 Filing 1460 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #1458 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction . Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
January 8, 2015 Filing 1459 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry #1457 Motion for Permanent Injunction Corrected Because: The Memorandum in Support Should Have Been Filed As A Separate Docket Entry By Counsel Shadowen. Please See Docket Entry #1458 for the Memorandum in Support. (Paine, Matthew)
January 8, 2015 Filing 1458 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund. (Paine, Matthew)
January 7, 2015 Filing 1457 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund. (Attachments: (2) Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit AB)(Shadowen, Steve) (Modified on 1/8/2015 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
January 5, 2015 Filing 1456 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial, #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
January 5, 2015 Filing 1455 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #1454 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1451 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial, #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #1452 Declaration,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
December 31, 2014 Filing 1454 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
December 31, 2014 Filing 1453 MOTION for New Trial Individual Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Refsin, Barry)
December 31, 2014 Filing 1452 DECLARATION re #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 -- Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 31, 2014 Filing 1451 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A -- Factual and Procedural Background, #2 Appendix B -- Excerpts re Patent Issues, #3 Appendix C -- Excerpts re At-Risk Launch, #4 Appendix D -- Excerpts re Events on or after May 27, 2014)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 31, 2014 Filing 1450 MOTION for New Trial -- Class Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1449 Opposition re #1447 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Form of Judgment (Redline), #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Proposed Form of Judgment (Clean))(Sobol, Thomas)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1448 NOTICE by Plaintiffs of Intent to File a Response to AstraZeneca and Ranbaxy Defendants' Motion for Entry of Rule 54(B) Final Judgment as to Claims Resolved at Trial in Favor of the AstraZeneca and Ranbaxy Defendants (ECF No. 1447) (Sobol, Thomas)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1447 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Judgment)(Weingarten, James)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1446 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1445 Transcript of Jury Trial (Deliberation/Verdict) held on December 5, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1444 Transcript of Jury Trial (Juror Question) held on December 4, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1443 Transcript of Jury Trial held on December 4, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1442 Transcript of Jury Charge (Excerpt Two) held on December 3, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1441 Transcript of Jury Charge (Excerpt One) held on December 3, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1440 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on December 3, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1439 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on December 3, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1438 Transcript of Jury Trial - Charge Conference held on December 2, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1437 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on December 2, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1436 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on December 1, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1435 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on December 1, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1434 Transcript of Jury Trial held on November 25, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1433 Transcript of Jury Trial- Judge's Ruling (excerpt) held on November 24, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1432 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 24, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1431 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 24, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1430 Transcript of Jury Trial - Judge's Directed Verdict Ruling held on November 21, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1429 Transcript of Motion Hearing (Afternoon) held on November 21, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1428 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 21, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1427 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 21, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1426 Transcript of Jury Trial - Motion Hearing (Afternoon) held on November 20, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1425 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 20, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1424 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 20, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1423 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 19, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1422 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 19, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1421 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 18, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1420 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 18, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1419 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 13, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1418 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Sessin One held on November 13, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1417 Transcript of Motion Hearing (Afternoon) held on November 12, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1416 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 12, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1415 Transcript of Jury Trial (Sidebar Conference) held on November 12, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1414 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 12, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1413 Transcript of Motion Hearing (Afternoon) held on November 10, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1412 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 10, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1411 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 10, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1410 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 7, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1409 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 7, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1408 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 6, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1407 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 6, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1406 Transcript of Jury Trial - Afternoon Session held on November 5, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1405 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 5, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1404 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 5, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1403 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on November 4, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1402 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on November 4, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1401 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on October 31, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1400 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on October 31, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1399 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on October 30, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1398 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on October 30, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1397 Transcript of Motion Hearing (Afternoon) held on October 29, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1396 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on October 29, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1395 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on October 29, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1394 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on October 28, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1393 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on October 28, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1392 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on October 27, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1391 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on October 27, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1390 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session Two held on October 23, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1389 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning Session One held on October 23, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1388 Transcript of Jury Trial held on October 22, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1387 Transcript of Jury Trial - Afternoon Session held on October 21, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1386 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning (Session Two) held on October 21, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Palanchian at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1385 Transcript of Jury Trial - Morning (Session One) held on October 21, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 1384 Transcript of Jury Trial held on October 20, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 8, 2014 Filing 1375 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1374 MOTION Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule Regarding Whether Judgment(s) Should Enter at This Time and Form of Entry of Judgment(s) filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 8, 2014 Filing 1374 MOTION Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule Regarding Whether Judgment(s) Should Enter at This Time and Form of Entry of Judgment(s) by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1383 JURY VERDICT in favor of defendants against plaintiffs returned. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1382 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 26 held on 12/5/2014. Jury continues deliberations and returns a verdict at 10:40 AM. See verdict slip for details. Jurors excused. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1373 MOTION in Limine Motion for Curative Instruction by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
December 4, 2014 Filing 1381 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 25 held on 12/4/2014. The jurors continue deliberations. Jury questions #19-#21 asked and answered. Jurors excused for the day to return on Friday, December 5th at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1380 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 24 held on 12/3/2014. Hearing held out of presence of jury regarding recently filed documents. Jury of 11 brought into the courtroom at 9:45 AM. The Court charges the jury. After a brief recess, the defendants make closing arguments followed by plaintiffs' closing arguments. Jurors retire to deliberate at 1:20. Jurors excused at 5:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1372 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs Notice of Preservation of Appellate Rights Regarding the Instructions Given to the Jury by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1371 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 12/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1370 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial Day 27 set for 12/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1369 Response by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Closing Demonstratives. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1368 Objection by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Proposed Demonstratives for Use in Closing Argument. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1367 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1366 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1366 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Baldridge, James)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1365 TRIAL BRIEF Ranbaxy's Response to Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Jury Instructions by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1364 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs Evidentiary Proffer as to Dr. Kevin Burgess by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1363 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Jury Instruction as to Verdict Form Question 1 by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1362 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Closing Demonstratives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Weingarten, James)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1361 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs Evidentiary Proffer as to Professor Bernhardt Trout by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 1360 TRIAL BRIEF Ranbaxy's Request for Amendment of Verdict Question 7 by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1379 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Charge Conference held on 12/2/2014. The Court reviews the verdict slip with counsel and announces that he will charge the jury first, before closing arguments. Counsel and the Court review proposed jury instructions. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1359 TRIAL BRIEF Submission Regarding Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1358 TRIAL BRIEF Submission Regarding Objective Standard on Jury Verdict Form by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1357 TRIAL BRIEF Identification of Witnesses Relevant to the Verdict Form Questions by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1356 Objection by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ranbaxy's Objection to Plaintiffs' At Risk Launch Theory. (Baldridge, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1355 TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING THE STANDARD FOR DETERMINING CAUSATION by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1354 TRIAL BRIEF re Motion to Amend Jury Charge and Questionnaire Regarding Plaintiffs' Theory of an At-Risk Launch by Teva by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1353 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Evidence Necessary for Plaintiffs to Establish Causation by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1352 TRIAL BRIEF re Defendants' Identification of Defense Witnesses Relevant to the Verdict Form Questions by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1351 TRIAL BRIEF Evidentiary Proffer as to Dr. Keith Leffler by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1350 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1349 MOTION for Directed Verdict at the Close of Phase I Evidence filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1349 MOTION for Directed Verdict at the Close of Phase I Evidence by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB.(Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1348 TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Bench Memorandum Regarding the Admissibility of Co-Conspirator Statements by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1347 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Arguments from Plaintiffs' Closings by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1346 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1333 MOTION Amend the Verdict Sheet and Submission of Jury Instructions filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1345 REPLY to Response to #1332 Amended MOTION in Limine to Exclude Purported "Rebuttal" Testimony of McGuire, Leffler, and Baker filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1344 Amended MOTION to Strike Dr. MacMillan's Testimony Regarding Infringement by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1343 Opposition re #1336 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Dr. MacMillan's Testimony Regarding Infringement filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1342 ADDENDUM re #1269 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Cheryl Blume filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 2, 2014 Filing 1341 Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1378 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 23 held on 12/1/2014. Jury of 11 present. D-6, Krishnan(sworn); P-4, Jeffrey Pott recalled. Court adjourned. Jurors excused until Wednesday, December 3, 2014 at 9:00 AM. A charge conference is set for Tuesday, December 2, 2014 at 9:00 AM. The Court makes rulings on pending motions (see transcript). (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1340 TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Brief in Support of the Rebuttal Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1339 Proposed Jury Verdict by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Jury Verdict Form)(Baldridge, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1338 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1337 Proposed Jury Verdict by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1336 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Dr. MacMillan's Testimony Regarding Infringement by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1335 MOTION in Limine to Permit Limited Rebuttal Testimony from Dr. Trout and Dr. Burgess and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Technical Experts From Offering Rebuttal Testimony on Patent Issues [ECF No. 1329] by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1334 Opposition re #1332 Amended MOTION in Limine to Exclude Purported "Rebuttal" Testimony of McGuire, Leffler, and Baker filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1333 MOTION Amend the Verdict Sheet and Submission of Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1332 Amended MOTION in Limine to Exclude Purported "Rebuttal" Testimony of McGuire, Leffler, and Baker by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1331 Objection by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Objections to Introduction of Ahmad Aboelezz's Deposition Testimony During Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baldridge, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1330 Request for Judicial Notice of Complaint Filing Dates by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1329 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Technical Experts from Offering Rebuttal Testimony on Patent Issues. (Weingarten, James)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1328 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Purported "Rebuttal" Testimony of McGuire, Leffler, and Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1377 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 22 held on 11/25/2014. Jury of 11 present. D-5, Nimish Vakil resumes the stand. Jurors excused at 10:20 AM. The Court makes rulings on pending motions re Pott, Ludwig and McGuire. Jury trial continued to Monday, December 1, 2014 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1327 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial Day 23 set for 12/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 24 set for 12/2/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 25 set for 12/3/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 26 set for 12/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 27 set for 12/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1326 Opposition re #1322 MOTION to Recall Mr. Pott at Trial and Request for Limiting Instruction as to Ex. 140 filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1325 MOTION to Permit Dr. McGuire to Testify Concerning Entry Date and Request for Oral Argument by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1324 MOTION Ranbaxy's Motion to Admit the Testimony of Peter Ludwig by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent E. Verrocchio, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Declaration)(Baldridge, James)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1323 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1322 MOTION to Recall Mr. Pott at Trial filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1322 MOTION to Recall Mr. Pott at Trial by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1376 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 21 held on 11/24/2014. The parties report that a settlement in principle has been reached with defendant Teva. The Court announces that he denies motions for directed verdict. Jury of 11 present. D-3, Jill Pastore; D-4, Richard Fante (sworn); D-5, Nimish Vakil (sworn). Court adjourned and continued to 11/25/2014 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1321 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Motions denied as moot re #1301 MOTION for Order to Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About a Reasonable Royalty in the Prilosec Litigation ; #1302 MOTION for Order to Preclude Tevas Expert Phillip Green From Testifying Given No Primary Evidence That Teva Performed and Relied on a Reasonable Royalty Analysis When Settling the Prilosec Litigation; #1303 MOTION for Reconsideration of Ruling Granting Directed Verdict on Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claim (Paine, Matthew)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1309 REPLY to Response to #1296 MOTION for Order to Prohibit or Limit the Testimony of Rich Fante as Trial Witness filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1308 TRIAL BRIEF Post-Argument Submission Regarding Actavis (Corrected) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1307 Opposition re #1296 MOTION for Order to Prohibit or Limit the Testimony of Rich Fante as Trial Witness filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weingarten, James)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1306 TRIAL BRIEF Post-Argument Submission Regarding Actavis by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1305 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #1271 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Causation and Antitrust Injury, Conspiracy, and Teva Payment filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1304 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1303 MOTION for Reconsideration of Ruling Granting Directed Verdict on Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claim filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1303 MOTION for Reconsideration of Ruling Granting Directed Verdict on Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claim by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1302 MOTION for Order to Preclude Tevas Expert Phillip Green From Testifying Given No Primary Evidence That Teva Performed and Relied on a Reasonable Royalty Analysis When Settling the Prilosec Litigation by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
November 24, 2014 Filing 1301 MOTION for Order to Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About a Reasonable Royalty in the Prilosec Litigation by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 23, 2014 Filing 1300 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re #1299 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Nimish Vakil Exhibit A - Declaration of Andersson by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 23, 2014 Filing 1299 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Nimish Vakil by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1320 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing Out of Jury Presence held on 11/21/2014. The Court hears arguments on the question posed by the Court regarding causation. After hearing from counsel, the Court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1319 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 20 held on 11/21/2014. Hearing held out of presence of jury. The pending motions for directed verdict are allowed in part/denied in part. See transcript for details. The Court sets a hearing for 2:00 PM this date for further oral arguments regarding the Court's question regarding causation. Jury of 11 present. D-2, David MacMillan (sworn). D-3, Jill Pastore (sworn). Court adjourned at 1:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1298 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial Day 21 set for 11/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 22 set for 11/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1297 TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Submission Regarding Actavis by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1296 MOTION for Order to Prohibit or Limit the Testimony of Rich Fante as Trial Witness by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1295 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #1294 MOTION to Strike Jill Pastore as a Trial Witness (Paine, Matthew)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1294 MOTION to Strike Jill Pastore as a Trial Witness by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1293 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Opposition to Notice by Ranbaxy re Motion to Exclude Dr. Blume [ECF No. 1280] by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1292 Response by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB to #1257 Objection, #1258 Objection to Testimony of Dr. Magnus Larsson and Dr. Frans Langkilde. (Weingarten, James)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1291 Opposition re #1269 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Cheryl Blume filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1290 Opposition re #1233 MOTION to Exclude Cheryl Blume filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1289 Response by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB to #1245 Objection to AstraZeneca Reading Certain Portions of Exhibit 79 to the Jury. (Weingarten, James)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1288 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs Opposition to Testimony from Dr. Shen Luk by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1287 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Reconsider The Exclusion of Dr. Magnus Larsson by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1286 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Opposition to Testimony from Dr. David MacMillan by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1285 TRIAL BRIEF Bench Memorandum regarding Admissibility of Patent-Related Testimony by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1318 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2014 re #1275 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Conspiracy filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #1279 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Supporting Memorandum filed by Ranbaxy Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, #1271 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Causation and Antitrust Injury, Conspiracy, and Teva Payment filed by Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, #1265 MOTION Mistrial AstraZeneca's Motion for Mistrial filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, #1277 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Causation filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #1243 MOTION Mistrial RANBAXY'S MOTION FOR A MISTRIAL filed by Ranbaxy Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD. After hearing from counsel, the Court denies motions for mistrial and takes the motions for directed verdict under advisement. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1317 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 19 held on 11/20/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-19, Cheryl Blume resumes the stand. During the break (out of presence of jury) the Court announces the plaintiffs' proposed exhibits that are admitted. P-20, Joseph Todisco by video taped deposition. Plaintiffs rest. All defendants move orally for directed verdict at conclusion of plaintiffs' case. Oral arguments to heard this date at 2:00 PM. Defendants' case commences with D-1, Magnus Larsson(sworn). Court adjourned at 1:00 PM. Hearing to be held on motions for mistrial and directed verdict at 2:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1284 Opposition re #1275 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Conspiracy filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1283 Opposition re #1271 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Causation and Antitrust Injury, Conspiracy, and Teva Payment filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1282 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer as to Dr. Thomas G. McGuire by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1281 Amended MEMORANDUM in Support re #1275 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Conspiracy filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1280 NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1269 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Cheryl Blume Notice of Joinder to ECF 1269 (Baldridge, James)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1279 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Supporting Memorandum by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Baldridge, James)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1278 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1277 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Causation filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1277 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Causation by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1276 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1275 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Conspiracy filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1275 MOTION for Directed Verdict on Conspiracy by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1274 Opposition re #1265 MOTION Mistrial AstraZeneca's Motion for Mistrial filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1273 Opposition re #1271 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Causation and Antitrust Injury, Conspiracy, and Teva Payment filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1272 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1271 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Causation and Antitrust Injury, Conspiracy, and Teva Payment filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1271 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Causation and Antitrust Injury, Conspiracy, and Teva Payment by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1270 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1269 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Cheryl Blume filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1269 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Cheryl Blume by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1268 REPLY to Response to #1243 MOTION Mistrial RANBAXY'S MOTION FOR A MISTRIAL filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1267 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1244 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Foreign Language Documents Unaccompanied by a Certified Translation and Any Testimony Referring to or About Such Documents filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1266 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1265 MOTION Mistrial AstraZeneca's Motion for Mistrial filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1265 MOTION Mistrial AstraZeneca's Motion for Mistrial by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB.(Weingarten, James)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1264 Opposition re #1243 MOTION Mistrial RANBAXY'S MOTION FOR A MISTRIAL filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sobol, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2014: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Paine, Matthew).
November 20, 2014 Filing 1263 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Bench Memorandum Regarding the Admissibiity of Co-Conspirator Statements by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1262 TRIAL BRIEF re Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Dr. McGuire's Event Study by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Weingarten, James)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1261 Response by Plaintiffs to #1255 Objection to Plaintiffs' Submission of Exhibits. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1260 Response by Plaintiffs to #1249 Objection to Plaintiffs' Submission of Evidence. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1259 Response by Plaintiffs to #1253 Objection to Plaintiffs' Submission of Exhibits. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1258 Objection by Plaintiffs to Testimony of Dr. Frans Langkilde. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1257 Objection by Plaintiffs to Testimony of Dr. Magnus Larsson. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1256 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Summary of Teva Payment Briefing and Evidence by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1316 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 18 held on 11/19/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-13, Jay Deshmukh recalled (out of order). P-19, Cheryl Blume resumes the stand. Court adjourned at 1:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1255 Objection by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. RANBAXY'S OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED EXHIBITS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS ON NOVEMBER 18, 2014. (Baldridge, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1254 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Supplemental Trial Brief in Support of Dr. McGuire's Event Study by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1253 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB to Plaintiffs' Exhibits Offered Without Witness Testimony. (Weingarten, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1252 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding the Overarching Conspiracy by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1251 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #1191 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof, #1194 MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding the Alleged Teva Payment, #1243 MOTION Mistrial RANBAXY'S MOTION FOR A MISTRIAL, #1186 MOTION for Directed Verdict on The Threshold Issue of a Large and Unexplained Payment : Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1250 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: denied without prejudice calling the witness and determining whether there is a foundation for such testimony re #1238 MOTION to Admit Patent Expert Testimony (Paine, Matthew)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1249 Objection by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Submission of Exhibits without Foundation. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1248 Response by Plaintiffs to #1241 Objection, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to the McGuire Demonstratives. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1247 Response by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB to #1231 Objection to Defendants' Order of Proof. (Weingarten, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1246 Opposition re #1240 MOTION in Limine to Exclude McGuire "Event Study" Analysis filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1245 Objection by Plaintiffs to AstraZeneca Reading Certain Portions of Exhibit 79 to the Jury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2, #4 Exhibit C)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1244 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Foreign Language Documents Unaccompanied by a Certified Translation and Any Testimony Referring to or About Such Documents by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A list of Swedish documents, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1243 MOTION Mistrial RANBAXY'S MOTION FOR A MISTRIAL by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Baldridge, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1242 RESPONSE to Motion re #1222 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Admissibility of Exhibit GDF filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1241 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Proposed McGuire Demonstratives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
November 19, 2014 Filing 1240 MOTION in Limine to Exclude McGuire "Event Study" Analysis by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Weingarten, James)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1315 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing out of presence of jury regarding outstanding motions for directed verdict. The Court enters the following Order reserves ruling/takes under advisement #1186 Motion for Directed Verdict as to Teva; denying #1191 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Ranbaxy; denying #1194 Motion for Directed Verdict as to Astrazeneca. Jury Trial Day 17 held on 11/18/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-19, Cheryl Blume (sworn). Court adjourned. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1239 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #1230 MOTION to Prohibit Resumption of Testimony of Jay Deshmukh (Paine, Matthew)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1238 MOTION to Admit Patent Expert Testimony by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB.(Weingarten, James)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1237 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding the Deposition Testimony of Joseph Todisco by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1236 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Proposed Recall of Dr. McGuire for a Third Round of Testimony. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1235 Response by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to #1228 Trial Brief Concerning Quantitative Evidence. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1234 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Dr. Blume from Repeating Expert Opinions Offered by Dr. McGuire by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1233 MOTION to Exclude Cheryl Blume by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baldridge, James)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1232 TRIAL BRIEF Concerning Relevance of All Payments by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1231 Objection by Plaintiffs to Defendants' Order of Proof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 17, 2014 Filing 1230 MOTION to Prohibit Resumption of Testimony of Jay Deshmukh by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Baldridge, James)
November 17, 2014 Filing 1229 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial Day 17 set for 11/18/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 18 set for 11/19/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 19 set for 11/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 20 set for 11/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1314 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 16 held on 11/13/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-15 video taped deposition of Matthew Diggons resumes. P-9, Thomas McGuire recalled. P-16, Richard Stephen Barker's deposition is read into evidence. P-17, Patricia Jaworski by video taped deposition. P-18, Usha Sankaran by video taped deposition. Court adjourned at 1:00 PM and continued to Tuesday, November 18, 2014 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1228 TRIAL BRIEF PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF CONCERNING QUANTITATIVE EVIDENCE by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1227 Objection by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition Testimony Re Alleged Payments to Ranbaxy. (Baldridge, James)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1226 TRIAL BRIEF Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Further Expert Testimony of Thomas G. McGuire and Proposed Demonstratives [ECF No. 1225] by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1225 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Further Expert Testimony of Thomas G. McGuire and Proposed Demonstratives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1224 TRIAL BRIEF Post-Argument Submission in Support of Defendants' Motions for Directed Verdict by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1223 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1222 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Admissibility of Exhibit GDF filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1222 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Admissibility of Exhibit GDF by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1313 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 11/12/2014 re #1186 MOTION for Directed Verdict on The Threshold Issue of a Large and Unexplained Payment filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #1194 MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding the Alleged Teva Payment filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, #1191 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Ranbaxy Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD. The Court hears argument from the defendants. Hearing is suspended to hear other matters and resumes at 3:40 for arguments by the plaintiffs. The Court takes the matters under advisement. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1312 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing held out of presence of jury regarding motion to strike expert testimony of McCool. After hearing from counsel, the Court enters an Order granting in part and denying in part #1184 Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool. Jury Trial Day 15 held on 11/12/2014. Jury of 11 brought into the courtroom. Video taped deposition of P-12, Krishnan resumes. P-13, Jay Deshmukh (sworn). P-13 excused to be recalled at a later date. P-14, Meredith Rosenthal (sworn). P-15, Matthew Diggons by video deposition. Court adjourned at 1:00 PM. Hearing re motions for directed verdict set for 2:00 PM this date. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1221 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: denied. subject to the agreement by the defendants re #1203 MOTION for Disclosure of Defendants' Order of Proof. (Paine, Matthew)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1220 TRIAL BRIEF Submission Regarding Reasonable Royalty Evidence by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1219 NOTICE by Plaintiffs -- Plaintiffs' Submission re Morning Sidebar (Sobol, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1218 Objection by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Baldridge, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1217 Response by Plaintiffs to #1213 Objection, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS DEMONSTRATIVES FOR USE WITH DR. MEREDITH ROSENTHAL. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1216 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #1202 Amended MOTION to Strike Supplemental Report of Dr. McGuire filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1215 NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1209 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Ranbaxy's Notice of Joinder to Teva's Supplemental Submission in Support of Motions to Exclude Dr. McCool and for Directed Verdict (ECF 1209) (Baldridge, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1214 Objection by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Demonstrative Exhibit Titled "Ranbaxy's Patent Positions". (Baldridge, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1213 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Demonstratives for Use with Dr. Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1212 Objection by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Exhibit FWU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baldridge, James)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1211 Opposition re #1203 MOTION for Disclosure of Defendants' Order of Proof filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1210 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Request to Introduce IMS Data in Evidence. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1209 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #1184 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool, #1186 MOTION for Directed Verdict on The Threshold Issue of a Large and Unexplained Payment filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1208 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #1194 MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding the Alleged Teva Payment filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1207 Opposition re #1202 Amended MOTION to Strike Supplemental Report of Dr. McGuire, #1201 MOTION to Strike Supplemental McGuire Declaration filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1206 Response by Plaintiffs to #1199 Objection PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO TEVAS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF TEVAS 30(b)(6) TESTIMONY (ECF NO. 1199). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1205 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. McGuire. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 1204 Opposition re #1200 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 11, 2014 Filing 1203 MOTION for Disclosure of Defendants' Order of Proof by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 11, 2014 Filing 1202 Amended MOTION to Strike Supplemental Report of Dr. McGuire by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 11, 2014 Filing 1201 MOTION to Strike Supplemental McGuire Declaration by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 11, 2014 Filing 1200 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum of Law by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1311 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing Out of Jury Presence held on 11/10/2014. The Court makes rulings on document that shall be produced. The Court admits plaintiffs' proposed documents into evidence (#129 & #130) and reserves rulings on other documents. The Court hears arguments from counsel regarding the testimony of Dr. McCool. A schedule is set for hearing arguments on motions for directed verdict. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1310 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 14 held on 11/10/2014. Jury of 11 present. Witness taken out of order. P-11, Linda Palczuk (sworn). P-10, Rothwein video deposition resumes. P-12, Venkatachalam Krishnan by video deposition. Court adjourned. Hearing set for this date at 3:00 PM regarding privileged documents. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1199 Objection by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Late-Disclosed Deposition Designations of Staci Julie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schoen, Laurence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1198 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB to #1170 Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1197 Opposition re #1188 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire Concerning Avoided Litigation Costs filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- AIPLA 2013 Report)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1196 Opposition re #1194 MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding the Alleged Teva Payment, #1191 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof --- Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ranbaxy's and AstraZeneca's Motions for Directed Verdict and Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1195 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1194 MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding the Alleged Teva Payment filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1194 MOTION for Directed Verdict Regarding the Alleged Teva Payment by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB.(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1193 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Exhibits Disclosed on November 7, 2014 and November 8, 2014. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1192 Opposition re #1184 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1191 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Baldridge, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1190 Opposition re #1186 MOTION for Directed Verdict on The Threshold Issue of a Large and Unexplained Payment filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1189 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1188 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire Concerning Avoided Litigation Costs filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1188 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire Concerning Avoided Litigation Costs by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1187 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1186 MOTION for Directed Verdict on The Threshold Issue of a Large and Unexplained Payment filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1186 MOTION for Directed Verdict on The Threshold Issue of a Large and Unexplained Payment by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1185 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1184 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1184 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
November 7, 2014 Filing 1183 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial Day 14 set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 13 set for 11/12/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 14 set for 11/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 7, 2014 Filing 1182 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 13 held on 11/7/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-8, W. Shannon McCool resumes the stand. P-9, Thomas McGuire (sworn). P-10, Steven Rothwein by videotaped deposition. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 7, 2014 Filing 1178 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Profferred exhibits GCM and GCQ are excluded as late filed. re #1176 Objection, filed by AstraZeneca LP, Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Astrazeneca AB (Paine, Matthew)
November 7, 2014 Filing 1177 Objection by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Bench Memorandum (ECF No. 1174) Regarding Teva's [Purported] Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege as to Certain Spreadsheets. (Schoen, Laurence)
November 7, 2014 Filing 1176 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Exhibit Disclosed on November 6, 2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1181 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 12 held on 11/6/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-8, W. Shannon McCool resumes the stand. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1175 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination. (Paine, Matthew)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1174 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Bench Memorandum Regarding Teva's Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege as to Certain Spreadsheets by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1173 MOTION Request for Clarifying Georgia-Pacific Instruction by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1172 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Second Set of Demonstratives for Use with Dr. McCool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1171 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Exhibits Disclosed on November 5, 2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1170 Opposition re #1167 Amended MOTION to Produce Plaintiffs' Amended Emergency Motion for Immediate Production of Materials or Other Appropriate Relief Related to AstraZeneca Outside Counsel Timothy Hester's Communications with AstraZeneca In-House Counsel Jeffr filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1169 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schoen, Laurence)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1180 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing Out of Jury Presence held on 11/5/2014. The Court and counsel review outstanding matters re exhibits. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1179 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 11 held on 11/5/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-6, Tim Hester resumes the stand. P-7, Joseph Todisco by video taped deposition. P-8, W. Shannon McCool (sworn). Court adjourned at 1:00 PM. A hearing is set for 11/5 re outstanding matters/exhibits. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1168 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PRIOR COURT OPINION FROM EVIDENCE [ECF NO. 1112 filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1167 Amended MOTION to Produce Plaintiffs' Amended Emergency Motion for Immediate Production of Materials or Other Appropriate Relief Related to AstraZeneca Outside Counsel Timothy Hester's Communications with AstraZeneca In-House Counsel Jeffrey Pott Regarding the Teva Nexium and Prilosec Litigations and Settlements by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 7)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1166 Emergency MOTION to Produce PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS RELATED TO ASTRAZENECA OUTSIDE COUNSEL TIMOTHY HESTERS COMMUNICATIONS WITH ASTRAZENECA IN-HOUSE COUNSEL JEFFREY POTT REGARDING THE TEVA NEXIUM AND PRILOSEC LITIGATIONS AND SETTLEMENTS by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1164 Response by Plaintiffs to #1161 Objection, PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO THE MCGUIRE DEMONSTRATIVES. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1163 Response by Plaintiffs to #1162 Objection, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Demonstratives for Dr. Shannon McCool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1162 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Dr. McCool's Proposed Demonstratives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1161 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Dr. McGuire's Proposed Demonstratives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 1165 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day 10 held on 11/4/2014. Jury of 11 present. P-6, Tim Hester resumes the stand. Court adjourned at 1 PM. Jury trial continued to Wednesday, November 5th at 9:30 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 4, 2014 Filing 1150 Opposition re #1149 MOTION to Strike Mid-Trial Supplemental Expert Report of Thomas G. McGuire filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 4, 2014 Filing 1149 MOTION to Strike Mid-Trial Supplemental Expert Report of Thomas G. McGuire by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schoen, Laurence)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1148 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Jury Trial Day 10 set for 11/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 11 set for 11/5/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 12 set for 11/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial Day 13 set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 31, 2014 Filing 1160 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Nine held on 10/31/2014. P-5, Stacie Julie resumes the stand. P-6, Tim Hester (sworn). Jury excused. All parties agree to excuse juror #2. The trial will proceed with 11 jurors. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 31, 2014 Filing 1147 Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 1BST046294 for #1145 Notice of Appearance #1142 Notice of Appearance #1143 Notice of Appearance #1144 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice Hart, Lawrence, Phillip, Jr. and Rabinovitz) (Paine, Matthew)
October 30, 2014 Filing 1159 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Eight held on 10/30/2014. Jury of 12 present. P-5, Stacie Julie (sworn). Court adjourned and continued to 10/31/2014 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 30, 2014 Filing 1146 Letter/request (non-motion) from Barbara J. Hart . (St. Phillip, Peter)
October 30, 2014 Filing 1145 NOTICE of Appearance by URIEL RABINOVITZ on behalf of ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN, INC., CAREPLUS HEALTH PLANS, INC., CARITEN HEALTH PLAN INC., CARITEN INSURANCE COMPANY, CHA HMO, INC., EMPHESYS INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMAN HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, INC., HUMANA ADVANTAGECARE PLAN, HUMANA BENEFIT PLAN OF ILLINOIS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF OHIO, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF TEXAS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF KENTUCKY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, HUMANA INSURANCE OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF MICHIGAN, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF UTAH, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN, INC., HUMANA REGIONAL HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA WISCONSIN HEALTH ORGANIZATION INSURANCE CORPORATION, Humana Employers Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., M.D. CARE INC. (Paine, Matthew)
October 30, 2014 Filing 1144 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara J. Hart on behalf of ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN, INC., CAREPLUS HEALTH PLANS, INC., CARITEN HEALTH PLAN INC., CARITEN INSURANCE COMPANY, CHA HMO, INC., EMPHESYS INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMAN HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, INC., HUMANA ADVANTAGECARE PLAN, HUMANA BENEFIT PLAN OF ILLINOIS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF OHIO, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF TEXAS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF KENTUCKY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, HUMANA INSURANCE OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF MICHIGAN, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF UTAH, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN, INC., HUMANA REGIONAL HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA WISCONSIN HEALTH ORGANIZATION INSURANCE CORPORATION, Humana Employers Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., M.D. CARE INC. (Paine, Matthew)
October 30, 2014 Filing 1143 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Lawrence on behalf of ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN, INC., CAREPLUS HEALTH PLANS, INC., CARITEN HEALTH PLAN INC., CARITEN INSURANCE COMPANY, CHA HMO, INC., EMPHESYS INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMAN HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, INC., HUMANA ADVANTAGECARE PLAN, HUMANA BENEFIT PLAN OF ILLINOIS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF OHIO, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF TEXAS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF KENTUCKY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, HUMANA INSURANCE OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF MICHIGAN, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF UTAH, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN, INC., HUMANA REGIONAL HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA WISCONSIN HEALTH ORGANIZATION INSURANCE CORPORATION, Humana Employers Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., M.D. CARE INC. (Paine, Matthew)
October 30, 2014 Filing 1142 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr on behalf of ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., ARCADIAN HEALTH PLAN, INC., CAREPLUS HEALTH PLANS, INC., CARITEN HEALTH PLAN INC., CARITEN INSURANCE COMPANY, CHA HMO, INC., EMPHESYS INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMAN HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, INC., HUMANA ADVANTAGECARE PLAN, HUMANA BENEFIT PLAN OF ILLINOIS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF OHIO, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF TEXAS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF KENTUCKY, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, HUMANA INSURANCE OF PUERTO RICO, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF MICHIGAN, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN OF UTAH, INC., HUMANA MEDICAL PLAN, INC., HUMANA REGIONAL HEALTH PLAN, INC., HUMANA WISCONSIN HEALTH ORGANIZATION INSURANCE CORPORATION, Humana Employers Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., M.D. CARE INC. (Paine, Matthew)
October 29, 2014 Filing 1158 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2014. Hearing held re Motion to Quash - motion is allowed. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 29, 2014 Filing 1157 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Seven held on 10/29/2014. Jury of 12 present. P-4, Jeffrey Pott resumes the stand. Witness taken out of order: P-5, Jennifer King (sworn). P-4, Jeffrey Pott resumes the stand. Hearing set for 10/29/2014 re motion to quash. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 28, 2014 Filing 1156 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Six held on 10/28/2014. Jury of 12 present. P-4, Jeffrey Pott resumes the stand. Court adjourned and continued to 10/29/2014. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1155 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Five held on 10/27/2014. Jury of 12 present. P-3, Gary Rowles by video deposition. P-4, Jeffrey Pott (sworn). Court adjourned and continued to 10/28/2014. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1141 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1140 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED NOTICE PROGRAM AND FORM OF NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING A HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT WITH DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. (DRL) filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DANIEL COGGESHALL, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice)(Gerstein, Bruce)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1140 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED NOTICE PROGRAM AND FORM OF NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING A HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT WITH DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. (DRL) (UNOPPOSED) by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE PROGRAM AND FORM OF NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING A HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS SETTLEMENT WITH DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.)(Gerstein, Bruce)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1139 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Motion DENIED without prejudice to objections to specific questions re #1133 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Foreign Sales of Generic Nexium (Paine, Matthew)
October 26, 2014 Filing 1135 Opposition re #1133 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Foreign Sales of Generic Nexium filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 24, 2014 Filing 1134 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1133 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Foreign Sales of Generic Nexium filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Weingarten, James)
October 24, 2014 Filing 1133 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Foreign Sales of Generic Nexium by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Weingarten, James)
October 23, 2014 Filing 1154 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Four held on 10/23/2014. Jury of 12 present. P-1, Matthew Pike resumes the stand. P-2, Dr. David Kessler (sworn). (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 23, 2014 Filing 1132 RESPONSE to Motion re #1044 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Various Topics filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 23, 2014 Filing 1131 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST046146 for #1130 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice - Richard Alan Arnold) (Paine, Matthew)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1153 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Three held on 10/22/2014. P-1, Matthew Pike resumes the stand. Court adjourned and continued to 10/23/2014 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1130 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Alan Arnold on behalf of Walgreen Co. (Paine, Matthew)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1129 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Teva's and Ranbaxy's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to New York Attorney General Investigation and Settlement by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schoen, Laurence)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1128 TRIAL BRIEF Opposition to Defendants' Bench Memorandum Regarding Plaintiffs Rule 1006 Exhibits (ECF No. 1119) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1127 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST046140 for #1107 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice - Vincent Verrocchio) (Paine, Matthew)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1126 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1120 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinion Testimony Regarding Marketing filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1152 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing held on 10/21/2014. Hearing held on outstanding matters. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1151 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day Two held on 10/21/2014. Jury of 12 sworn. The Court charges the jury. Out of presence of the jury the Court makes rulings on outstanding issues. After a brief recess, the Court admits Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Facts. Opening statements made. Plaintiffs' evidence commences with: P-1, Matthew Pike (sworn). Jurors excused. A hearing is set for 10/21/2014 at 2:40 PM. Court adjourned and continued to 10/22/2014. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1125 RESPONSE to Motion re #1080 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to New York Attorney General Investigation and Settlement filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1124 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Regarding Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1123 NOTICE by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. Notice of Appearance of Richard Alan Arnold (Perwin, Scott)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1122 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1120 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinion Testimony Regarding Marketing filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Weingarten, James)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1121 AFFIDAVIT of Benjamin M. Greenblum in Support re #1120 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinion Testimony Regarding Marketing filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Weingarten, James)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1120 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Opinion Testimony Regarding Marketing by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Weingarten, James)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1119 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Plaintiffs' Rule 1006 Summaries by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1118 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Cumulative Deposition Testimony by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1117 AFFIDAVIT of Benjamin M. Greenblum in Opposition re #1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 21, 2014 Filing 1115 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination filed by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schoen, Laurence)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1138 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Jury Trial Day One held on 10/20/2014. The Court reviews empanelment procedure with counsel. Defendant Reddy informs the Court that he has resolved with/as to all claims. Defendants' Motion in limine re: stmt of Ranbaxy is allowed without prejudice. The Court provides a brief break to allow counsel to review jury questionnaires. Counsel and the Court agree to excuse some jurors. The Court addresses the venire. A jury of 12 is selected and excused at 1:20 PM. Jury trial continued to Tuesday, October 21st at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1114 Objection by Plaintiffs to Teva's and AstraZeneca's Opening Demonstratives. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1113 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1112 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Use of Judge Cote's 2013 Apotex Opinion as Evidence or During Examination by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1111 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to Plaintiffs' Opening Demonstratives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schoen, Laurence)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1109 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST046103 for #1099 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice - Alyssa Chaplin) (Paine, Matthew)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1108 STIPULATION of Facts (Amended) by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1107 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent E. Verrocchio on behalf of Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1106 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: The Court rules that these documents appear to be self-authenticating pursuant to Fed.R.Evid. 902(2). Of course they may be subject to other appropriate objections. re #1087 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certified Documents Obtained From the Food and Drug Administration (Paine, Matthew)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1105 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: This blanket motion is denied without prejudice to raising particular relevance objections or other appropriate objections re #1071 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence Of Events Occuring On Or After May 27, 2014. (Paine, Matthew)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1104 DECLARATION re #1103 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #1102 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeValerio, Glen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1103 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1102 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement- filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (DeValerio, Glen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1102 MOTION for Settlement -End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeValerio, Glen)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1101 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1100 Transcript of Charge Conference held on October 15, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1098 MOTION for Order to FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Opper, Joseph)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1097 Opposition re #1071 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence Of Events Occuring On Or After May 27, 2014 filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1096 Objection to #1078 Objection by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. . (Weingarten, James)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1095 Response by American Sales Company, LLC to #1067 Proposed Jury Verdict, . (Sobol, Thomas)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1094 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1092 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Opper, Joseph)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1093 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1092 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Opper, Joseph)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1092 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC. by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company.(Opper, Joseph)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1091 Opposition re #1071 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence Of Events Occuring On Or After May 27, 2014 filed by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Foley, Danielle)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1090 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1071 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence Of Events Occuring On Or After May 27, 2014 filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1089 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1088 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1088 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1087 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certified Documents Obtained From the Food and Drug Administration filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1087 MOTION in Limine to Admit Certified Documents Obtained From the Food and Drug Administration by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1086 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List (Amended) with corrected attachment by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CORRECTED Plaintiffs' List of Exhibits To Which Defendants Object (Amended))(Sobol, Thomas)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1085 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List (Amended) with corrected attachment by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CORRECTED Plaintiffs' List of Exhibits To Which Defendants Object (Amended))(Sobol, Thomas)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1084 Exhibit List of Exhibits to be Introduced Without Objection by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits To Be Introduced Without Objection)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 19, 2014 Filing 1083 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List (Amended) by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' List of Exhibits To Which Defendants Object (Amended))(Sobol, Thomas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1099 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa K. Chaplin on behalf of American Sales Company, LLC (Paine, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1082 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibits to which Defendants Object)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1081 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1080 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to New York Attorney General Investigation and Settlement filed by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Schoen, Laurence)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1080 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to New York Attorney General Investigation and Settlement by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1079 Defendants' Exhibit List by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List)(Weingarten, James)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1078 Objection to #1043 Proposed Jury Instructions, by Plaintiffs 14 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Proposed Preliminary Jury Instruction No. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1077 RESPONSE to Motion re #1052 MOTION in Limine Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motions In Limine Relating to Opening Statements and Evidence filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1076 Proposed Voir Dire by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1075 NOTICE by Giant Eagle, Inc Notice Regarding Section 2 Claims (Cain-Mannix, Moira)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1074 NOTICE by HEB GROCERY CO. LP, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. Notice Regarding Section 2 Claims (Perwin, Scott)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1073 Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1072 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Reply))(Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1071 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence Of Events Occuring On Or After May 27, 2014 by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1070 STIPULATION Regarding Section 2 Claims by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation. (Refsin, Barry)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1069 NOTICE to Counsel. Please find attached a jury questionnaire the Court will handout to potential jurors on Monday morning. Please contact the clerk by email if there are any questions or concerns. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1068 RESPONSE to Motion re #1057 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1067 Proposed Jury Verdict by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
October 16, 2014 Filing 1066 Filing fee/payment: $ 300.00, receipt number 1BST046046 for #1062 Notice of Appearance, #1060 Notice of Appearance, #1061 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice - Martinez, Hilliard, and Duke) (Paine, Matthew)
October 16, 2014 Filing 1065 Proposed Jury Verdict by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 16, 2014 Filing 1064 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1059 Motion in Limine (Paine, Matthew)
October 16, 2014 Filing 1063 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1040 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements by Former Ranbaxy Executive filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1137 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing re pre charge held on 10/15/2014. The Court reviews the verdict form and proposed jury instructions with counsel. The Court reviews pending motions in limine - without rulings. The Stipulated Facts (#1049) will be treated as a joint exhibit. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1062 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Bryce Duke on behalf of Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund (Paine, Matthew)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1061 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Martinez on behalf of Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund (Paine, Matthew)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1060 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund (Paine, Matthew)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1059 MOTION in Limine Re: Wholesaler Assignments by American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Perwin, Scott)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1058 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1057 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1057 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motion in Limine by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1056 MOTION for Leave to File Motion For Leave To Exceed Page Limit For Omnibus Brief in Lieu of Multiple Briefs by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1055 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1054 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence Regarding Alleged Lack of Standing of Named Plaintiffs Based on Their Assignments filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1054 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence Regarding Alleged Lack of Standing of Named Plaintiffs Based on Their Assignments by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1053 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1052 MOTION in Limine Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motions In Limine Relating to Opening Statements and Evidence filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Giant Eagle, Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1052 MOTION in Limine Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motions In Limine Relating to Opening Statements and Evidence by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Giant Eagle, Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Walgreen Co..(Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1051 Proposed Jury Instructions by All Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1050 MOTION for Hearing Request for Oral Argument by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1049 STIPULATION of Facts by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1048 STIPULATION re #114 Amended Complaint,,,, -Stipulation Regarding Certain Claims- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Orenstein, Nathaniel)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1047 STIPULATION Regarding Section 2 Claims by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1046 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1044 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Various Topics filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Weingarten, James)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1045 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1044 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Various Topics filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Weingarten, James)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1044 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Various Topics by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Weingarten, James)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1043 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1042 AFFIDAVIT of Benjamin M. Greenblum in Support re #1040 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements by Former Ranbaxy Executive filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1041 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1040 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements by Former Ranbaxy Executive filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1040 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements by Former Ranbaxy Executive by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 13, 2014 Filing 1039 Proposed Jury Verdict by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1038 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2409 dated 10/9/14 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge William G. Young for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1037 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Hearing re charge is reset for 10/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1036 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing Re: Charge set for 10/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 9, 2014 Filing 1035 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc. Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rebuck, Monica)
October 8, 2014 Filing 1034 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST045815 for #1007 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice - Ellen T. Noteware) (Paine, Matthew)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1033 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST045799 for #1032 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice of Maureen Smith Lawrence) (Paine, Matthew)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1032 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen S. Lawrence on behalf of CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation (Paine, Matthew)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1031 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1030 Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference held on September 30, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 10/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1029 REPLY to Response to #1027 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TIMOTHY C. HESTER. (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1028 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1027 MOTION for Leave to File Reply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1027 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TIMOTHY C. HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (reply))(Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 2, 2014 Filing 1026 Response by Plaintiffs OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED ON TIMOTHY C. HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Thomas M. Sobol Declaration in Support of Hester Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Declaration of Brianna Hearn)(Sobol, Thomas)
September 30, 2014 Filing 1136 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/30/2014. The Court inquires as to settlement. After a brief recess, the parties are not in agreement to postpone hearing. Pretrial conference proceeds in the courtroom on the record. Jury trial is set for October 20, 2014 at 9:00 AM. Jury of 12 to be selected with each side getting six challenges. Trial to last six (6) weeks. The Court goes over the schedule with counsel and trial procedures, i.e. empanelment, days of trial, time limits on opening statements. The Court adopts the defendants' position re: use of deposition and sequestration of witnesses. Exhibit books for the jury are discouraged because they will not be edited during the trial. The parties shall notify the Court the experts that will be called to testify. The motion to exclude re: Morrison is denied. The Court notifies counsel that he will not read anything that is redacted. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 30, 2014 Filing 1025 NOTICE by Plaintiffs of Filing of Omnibus Opposition to Motions to Quash in Related Matter (Sobol, Thomas)
September 30, 2014 Filing 1024 Response by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to #1010 Response, by Plaintiffs' to Teva's and Astrazeneca's Supplemental Trial Management Submission. (Schoen, Laurence)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1023 BRIEF by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. to #1000 Pretrial Memorandum (DRL's Summary of the Evidence). (Resnik, Stephanie)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1022 Response by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to #1001 Response, (Ranbaxy Submission in Response to Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Trial Management). (Baldridge, James)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1021 BRIEF by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to #1000 Pretrial Memorandum (Ranbaxy Defendants' Summary of the Evidence). (Baldridge, James)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1020 Filing fee/payment: $ 300.00, receipt number 1BST045734 for #1017 Notice of Appearance, #1018 Notice of Appearance, #1019 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vic) (Paine, Matthew)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1019 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Janow on behalf of TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (Paine, Matthew)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1018 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Katz on behalf of TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (Paine, Matthew)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1017 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Van Wart on behalf of TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (Paine, Matthew)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1016 BRIEF by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to #1000 Pretrial Memorandum (Teva Defendants' Summary of the Evidence). (Schoen, Laurence)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1015 Response by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to #1001 Response, by Plaintiffs' to Supplemental Trial Management Brief. (Schoen, Laurence)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1014 BRIEF by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB to #1000 Pretrial Memorandum (AstraZeneca Summary of Evidence). (Greenblum, Benjamin)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1013 DECLARATION re #1011 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS AND OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS CHERYL BLUME AND JAMES MORRISON (Declaration of Sarah Choi) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Baldridge, James)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1012 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1011 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS AND OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS CHERYL BLUME AND JAMES MORRISON filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Baldridge, James)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1011 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS AND OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS CHERYL BLUME AND JAMES MORRISON by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldridge, James)
September 29, 2014 Filing 1010 Supplemental Response by Plaintiffs to #992 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission in Response to Notice by AstraZeneca and Teva Defendants of Supplemental Trial Management Submission Based on Summary Judgment Opinion. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 26, 2014 Filing 1009 STIPULATION CONCERNING THE APPEARANCE AT TRIAL OF VENTKATACHALAM (VENKAT) KRISHNAN, DEFENDANT RANBAXY INC.S SENIOR VICE-PRESIDENT & REGIONAL DIRECTOR OF NORTH AMERICA by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 26, 2014 Filing 1008 STIPULATION of Facts by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 25, 2014 Filing 1007 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen T. Noteware on behalf of Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
September 25, 2014 Filing 1006 Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Complaint, docketed in 1:14-cv-11788) by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
September 25, 2014 Filing 1005 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #988 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas G. McGuire (Paine, Matthew)
September 25, 2014 Filing 1004 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #985 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool (Paine, Matthew)
September 24, 2014 Filing 1003 DECLARATION re #1002 MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence concerning the Accolate litigation Declaration of Jonathan Berman in Support of DRL's Motion in Limine by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Resnik, Stephanie)
September 24, 2014 Filing 1002 MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence concerning the Accolate litigation by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Resnik, Stephanie)
September 23, 2014 Filing 1001 Response by Plaintiffs to #992 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Submission in Response to Notice by AstraZeneca and Teva Defendants of Supplemental Trial Management Submission Based on Summary Judgment Opinion. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 23, 2014 Filing 1000 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Greenblum, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2014: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew).
September 23, 2014 Filing 999 DECLARATION re #998 Opposition to Motion, #997 Opposition to Motion Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to McCool and McGuire Exclusion by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sobol, Thomas)
September 23, 2014 Filing 998 Opposition re #988 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas G. McGuire filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 23, 2014 Filing 997 Opposition re #985 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 23, 2014 Filing 996 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #993 Emergency MOTION To Centrally Enforce Trial Subpoenas (Paine, Matthew)
September 22, 2014 Filing 995 DECLARATION re #993 Emergency MOTION To Centrally Enforce Trial Subpoenas ---Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Sobol, Thomas)
September 22, 2014 Filing 994 MEMORANDUM in Support re #993 Emergency MOTION To Centrally Enforce Trial Subpoenas filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 22, 2014 Filing 993 Emergency MOTION To Centrally Enforce Trial Subpoenas by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
September 17, 2014 Filing 992 NOTICE by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. - Supplemental Trial Management Submission Based on the Court's Summary Judgment Opinion - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Teva's and Astrazeneca's Proposed] Special Jury Verdict Form)(Schoen, Laurence)
September 15, 2014 Filing 991 STIPULATION of Facts by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 990 DECLARATION re #988 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas G. McGuire (Declaration of Laurence A. Schoen) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schoen, Laurence)
September 15, 2014 Filing 989 MEMORANDUM in Support re #988 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas G. McGuire filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
September 15, 2014 Filing 988 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas G. McGuire by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
September 12, 2014 Filing 987 DECLARATION re #985 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool (Declaration of Laurence A. Schoen) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Schoen, Laurence)
September 12, 2014 Filing 986 MEMORANDUM in Support re #985 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
September 12, 2014 Filing 985 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of W. Shannon McCool by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
September 10, 2014 Filing 984 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Donald W. Myers on behalf of absent member of the putative direct purchaser class AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Myers, Donald)
September 10, 2014 Filing 983 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 10, 2014 Filing 982 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Jury Trial Day One set for 10/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 9, 2014 Filing 981 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST045409 for #980 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice ) Schumacher (Paine, Matthew)
September 9, 2014 Filing 980 NOTICE of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) by David A. Schumacher on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Paine, Matthew)
September 4, 2014 Filing 979 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: MOTION DENIED. See opinion issued this day. re #973 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Paine, Matthew)
September 4, 2014 Filing 978 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #971 MOTION to Compel Defendant Ranbaxy to Make a Limited Supplemental Production of Documents. (Paine, Matthew)
September 4, 2014 Filing 977 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to motions for summary judgment. (Paine, Matthew)
September 3, 2014 Filing 976 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rebuck, Monica) (Modified on 9/4/2014 to Update Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
September 2, 2014 Filing 975 Opposition re #971 MOTION to Compel Defendant Ranbaxy to Make a Limited Supplemental Production of Documents filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
August 25, 2014 Filing 974 MEMORANDUM in Support re #973 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
August 25, 2014 Filing 973 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
August 19, 2014 Filing 972 MEMORANDUM in Support re #971 MOTION to Compel Defendant Ranbaxy to Make a Limited Supplemental Production of Documents filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Sobol, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D Redacted, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F Redacted, #8 Exhibit G Redacted, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I Redacted)(Sobol, Thomas)
August 19, 2014 Filing 971 MOTION to Compel Defendant Ranbaxy to Make a Limited Supplemental Production of Documents by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Compel)(Sobol, Thomas)
August 15, 2014 Filing 970 ANSWER to Complaint of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD..(Baldridge, James)
July 25, 2014 Filing 969 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 25, 2014 Filing 968 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 11, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. COA Case No. 14-1521, 14-1522. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 8/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 17, 2014 Filing 967 Set/Reset Hearings: Ready for Trial on 10/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 15, 2014 Filing 965 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Thomas G. Shapiro (Shapiro, Thomas)
July 11, 2014 Filing 966 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2014 re #921 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #593 MOTION (Direct Purchaser and End Payor Class Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Testimony of Gregory K Bell) filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Value Drug Company, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #830 MOTION - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Value Drug Company, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, #844 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Astrazeneca AB. After hearing from counsel the Court enters an Order denying #593 Motion (Direct Purchaser and End Payor Class Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Testimony of Gregory K Bell); granting #830 Motion Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission; see transcript as to #844 Motion in Limine To Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege; see transcript as to #917 Motion in Limine Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorney; denying #921 Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert, however, only one (1) expert per discipline will be allowed. Plaintiff shall disclose which expert on or before Monday, July 14, 2014. A hearing will be held in September regarding the charge and verdict slip. Trial scheduled for October 2014. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 11, 2014 Filing 964 Response to Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority ECF No. #962 Concerning Plaintiffs Motion for Live Trial Testimony via Contemporaneous Transmission ECF No. #830 (Sobol, Thomas) (Modified on 7/14/2014 to Correct Docket and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
July 10, 2014 Filing 963 Response by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. to #958 Notice (Other) (Teva's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Expert Opinion of W. Shannon McCool). (Schoen, Laurence)
July 10, 2014 Filing 962 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #830 MOTION - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greenblum, Benjamin)
July 3, 2014 Filing 961 REPLY to Response to #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
July 2, 2014 Filing 960 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company re #955 Notice of Supplemental Authorities, DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS-LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED ON JULY 2, 2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Opper, Joseph)
July 2, 2014 Filing 959 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #957 MOTION for Leave to File RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
July 1, 2014 Filing 958 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs - Notice of Service of the Expert Opinion of W. Shannon McCool (Sobol, Thomas)
July 1, 2014 Filing 957 MOTION for Leave to File RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A)(Opper, Joseph)
June 30, 2014 Filing 956 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Adam R. Tarosky terminated. (Paine, Matthew)
June 25, 2014 Filing 955 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #647 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy, #594 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Resnik, Stephanie)
June 13, 2014 Filing 954 Opposition re #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 D. Foley Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Decl.)(Baldridge, James)
June 13, 2014 Filing 953 DECLARATION re #952 Opposition to Motion, by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Weingarten, James)
June 13, 2014 Filing 952 Opposition re #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
June 13, 2014 Filing 951 DECLARATION re #950 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Laurence A. Schoen) by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schoen, Laurence)
June 13, 2014 Filing 950 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
June 13, 2014 Filing 949 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Resnik, Stephanie)
June 13, 2014 Filing 948 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief)(Weingarten, James)
June 10, 2014 Filing 947 REPLY to Response to #921 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
June 10, 2014 Filing 946 Ranbaxy's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Complaint, docketed in 1:14-cv-11788) by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Baldridge, James) (Modified on 6/11/2014 to Correct Filer Party) (Paine, Matthew).
June 10, 2014 Filing 945 AstraZeneca's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Complaint, docketed in 1:14-cv-11788) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB.(Weingarten, James)
June 10, 2014 Filing 944 DRL's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Complaint, docketed in 1:14-cv-11788) by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc..(Resnik, Stephanie)
June 10, 2014 Filing 943 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #941 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion [ECF No. 921] to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
June 10, 2014 Filing 942 Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Complaint, docketed in 1:14-cv-11788) by TEVA USA, INC..(Schoen, Laurence)
June 9, 2014 Filing 941 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion [ECF No. 921] to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Memorandum of Law)(Schoen, Laurence)
June 4, 2014 Filing 940 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re 902 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Upon further consideration, this Court makes the following clarification to the 4/17/2014 Order on Motions for Reconsideration: Order entered GRANTING #864 Motion for Reconsideration regarding #600 Tevas Motion for Summary Judgment, #644 AstraZenecas Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent it concerns the Teva settlement, and #604 Tevas Motion to Exclude as to McGuires testimony; and DENYING with opinion to follow #867 Motion for Reconsideration regarding #641 Ranbaxys Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Causation. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 29, 2014 Filing 939 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #937 Motion to Intervene (Paine, Matthew)
May 28, 2014 Filing 938 Opposition re #921 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert --- Plaintiffs' Opposition to Teva Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' New Reasonable Royalty Expert (ECF 921) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
May 27, 2014 Filing 937 MOTION to Intervene by Christopher Wirth, Christopher Donnelly, James Jared Thule, Jonathan Rich, Terry Lynn Nicholas, Edward Breivik.(Paine, Matthew)
May 21, 2014 Filing 936 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re #932 Stipulation filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB (Paine, Matthew)
May 21, 2014 Filing 935 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #593 MOTION (Direct Purchaser and End Payor Class Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Testimony of Gregory K Bell), #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne, #830 MOTION - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - , #921 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert, #844 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege : Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 20, 2014 Filing 934 Filing fee/payment: $ 505.00, receipt number 1BST043702 for #928 Notice of Appeal,,,, (Adam, Lucien)
May 20, 2014 Filing 933 Filing fee/payment: $ 505.00, receipt number 1BST043701 for #926 Notice of Appeal,,,, (Adam, Lucien)
May 20, 2014 Filing 932 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Concerning Briefing of ECF Nos. 844 and 917 by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
May 20, 2014 Filing 931 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #928 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
May 20, 2014 Filing 930 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #926 Notice of Appeal (Paine, Matthew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 929 USCA Case Number 14-1522 for #928 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Astrazeneca AB. (Paine, Matthew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 928 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 6/4/2014. (Paine, Matthew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 927 USCA Case Number 14-1521 for #926 Notice of Appeal filed by AstraZeneca LP, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Inc., Aktiebolaget Hassle, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA USA, INC., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca AB. (Paine, Matthew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 926 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 6/4/2014. (Paine, Matthew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 925 JUDGMENT of the USCA: (No. 13-8046) Petitioners have failed to demonstrate or even explain how certification of a class of 24 class members with large claims and rights to opt-out materially creates a pressure to settle that would not otherwise exist were joinder employed instead of certification. The petition for interlocutory review is therefore denied, and we offer no comment on the merits of the certification order itself. (Paine, Matthew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 924 JUDGMENT of the USCA: We grant the petitioners in Nos. 13-8043 and 13-8044. These appeals will proceed under Nos. 14-1521 and 14-1522. Appellants shall file their briefs by June 5, 2014. Appellees shall file their briefs by June 26. Any reply briefs shall be filed by July 3. Oral argument can be expected during the week of July 28. (Paine, Matthew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 923 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel --- Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Joint List of Motions for Which the Parties Seek Early Pre-Trial Decisions Pursuant to the Court's April 17, 2014 Order (ECF 902). (Sobol, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 Filing 922 MEMORANDUM in Support re #921 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
May 14, 2014 Filing 921 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs from Untimely Disclosing a New Reasonable Royalty Expert by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Schoen, Laurence)
May 14, 2014 Filing 920 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #918 Memorandum in Support of Motion #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne, #919 Affidavit in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
May 13, 2014 Filing 919 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas M. Sobol in Support re #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne, #844 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege --- Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Sobol, Thomas)
May 13, 2014 Filing 918 MEMORANDUM in Support re #917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorne, #844 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege --- Plaintiffs (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Opposition to Defendants Motion In Limine to Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege (ECF No. 844) and Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics For Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorney-Client Privilege or Work Product Protection (ECF No. 917) --- filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
May 13, 2014 Filing 917 Cross MOTION in Limine - Plaintiffs' (Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Classes and Retailer Plaintiffs) Cross-Motion In Limine to Preclude Defendants' Selective Introduction of Evidence on Topics for Which They Purport to Invoke the Attorney-Client Privilege or Work Product Protection by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
May 12, 2014 Filing 915 NOTICE by Eckerd Corporation, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rebuck, Monica)
May 9, 2014 Filing 916 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Motion denied after thorough consideration. re #905 Motion for Reconsideration (Paine, Matthew)
May 6, 2014 Filing 914 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #905 MOTION for Reconsideration re #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to DRL's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF 905) - filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
May 6, 2014 Filing 913 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #909 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter Colwell terminated (Paine, Matthew)
May 6, 2014 Filing 912 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher K. Albert (Albert, Christopher)
May 6, 2014 Filing 911 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brian T. Moriarty (Moriarty, Brian)
May 5, 2014 Filing 910 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lawrence M. Kraus (Kraus, Lawrence)
May 5, 2014 Filing 909 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Peter Colwell) by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB.(Paine, Matthew)
April 30, 2014 Filing 907 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Marcucci on behalf of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. (Marcucci, Michael)
April 22, 2014 Filing 906 MEMORANDUM in Support re #905 MOTION for Reconsideration re #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Resnik, Stephanie)
April 22, 2014 Filing 905 MOTION for Reconsideration re #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Resnik, Stephanie)
April 21, 2014 Filing 904 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel Walker (Walker, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 903 Case Reopened per 902 (Duong, Diep)
April 16, 2014 Filing 902 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 4/16/2014. The Court makes the following rulings: Order entered granting #864 Motion for Reconsideration re 644 MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying with opinion to follow #867 Motion for Reconsideration re 641 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This case will proceed to trial no sooner than the first Monday in October 2014. Further pretrial proceedings will be scheduled in July 2014. A final pretrial conference will be set in September 2014. A joint list of favorites to be filed by May 15, 2014. A motion session will be scheduled regarding the favorites. (Court Reporter: None.)(Attorneys present: Various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 16, 2014 Filing 901 BRIEF by Plaintiffs - Plaintiffs' Submission for April 16, 2014 Pretrial Hearing -. (Sobol, Thomas)
April 11, 2014 Filing 900 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 11, 2014 Filing 899 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on April 4, 2014, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 5/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 9, 2014 Filing 898 NOTICE by Plaintiffs - Notice of Filing Chart Provided to the Court at the April 4, 2014 Hearing and Supporting Endnotes - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit A -)(Sobol, Thomas)
April 4, 2014 Filing 897 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #893 Motion to Compel -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mediation. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 4, 2014 Filing 896 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2014 re #864 MOTION for Reconsideration, #867 MOTION for Reconsideration. Oral arguments heard on pending motions for reconsideration. After hearing from counsel the Court takes the matter under advisement and sets a pretrial conference for 4/16/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. If one or both of the motions are allowed, this case will go to trial no earlier than September 2014. If the Court denies both motions for reconsideration the case is over but judgment will not enter until a written decision enters. The pending motion to compel mediation is denied. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Sobol and Shadowen for the plaintiffs, Berman and Walker for the defendants) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 31, 2014 Filing 895 DECLARATION re #893 MOTION to Compel -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mediation-, #894 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, -Declaration of Glen DeValerio in Support of End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mediation- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(DeValerio, Glen)
March 31, 2014 Filing 894 MEMORANDUM in Support re #893 MOTION to Compel -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mediation- filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (DeValerio, Glen)
March 31, 2014 Filing 893 MOTION to Compel -End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mediation- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeValerio, Glen)
March 31, 2014 Filing 892 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #869 Declaration, #882 Opposition to Motion, #889 Reply to Response to Motion,, #890 Reply to Response to Motion,, #868 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #871 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matt Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These copies must be submitted in unredacted form. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
March 27, 2014 Filing 891 DECLARATION re #889 Reply to Response to Motion,, #890 Reply to Response to Motion,, Declaration of James J. Nicklaus by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1 -, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit 2 -)(Sobol, Thomas)
March 27, 2014 Filing 890 REPLY to Response to #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera - Redacted Plaintiffs' Reply To AstraZeneca's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Reconsideration As To AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Motions For Summary Judgment Due To Lack Of Causation Based On New Evidence - filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 27, 2014 Filing 889 REPLY to Response to #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera - Redacted Plaintiffs' Reply To Ranbaxy's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Reconsideration As To AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Motions For Summary Judgment Due To Lack Of Causation Based On New Evidence - filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 27, 2014 Filing 888 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Their (1) Motion Under Rule 6(b)(1)(B) and (2) Motion for Reconsideration as to Tevas Motion for Summary Judgment based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva (ECF No. 600) and AstraZenecas Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising from AstraZenecas Settlements with Teva and DRL (ECF No. 644) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit A -, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit B -, #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order -)(Sobol, Thomas)
March 27, 2014 Filing 887 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #886 MOTION for Leave to File - Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Reply Memoranda in Further Support of Their Motion for Reconsideration as to AstraZenecas and Ranbaxys Motions for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation Based on New Evidence ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
March 26, 2014 Filing 886 MOTION for Leave to File - Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Reply Memoranda in Further Support of Their Motion for Reconsideration as to AstraZenecas and Ranbaxys Motions for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation Based on New Evidence - by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit A -, #2 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit B -, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit C -, #4 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order -)(Sobol, Thomas)
March 21, 2014 Filing 885 Letter/request (non-motion) from John Schmidtlein regarding courtesy copies of recent filings. (Weingarten, James)
March 21, 2014 Filing 884 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #881 Opposition to Motion, #882 Opposition to Motion, #877 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #880 Declaration, #883 Declaration, #878 Declaration,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matt Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
March 20, 2014 Filing 883 DECLARATION re #882 Opposition to Motion, for Reconsideration Based on New Evidence by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Baldridge, James)
March 20, 2014 Filing 882 Opposition re #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera filed by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
March 20, 2014 Filing 881 Opposition re #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
March 20, 2014 Filing 880 DECLARATION re #879 Opposition to Motion, by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weingarten, James)
March 20, 2014 Filing 879 Opposition re #864 MOTION for Reconsideration re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #855 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence o filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
March 20, 2014 Filing 878 DECLARATION re #877 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Laurence A. Schoen) by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Schoen, Laurence)
March 20, 2014 Filing 877 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #864 MOTION for Reconsideration re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #855 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence o filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
March 12, 2014 Filing 876 DECLARATION re #869 Declaration, #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera - Corrected Declaration of A. Luke Smith - by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 10, 2014 Filing 875 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, #864 MOTION for Reconsideration re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #855 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence o : Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2014 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will take place at Boston University Law School, 765 Commonwealth Avenue, 6th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 7, 2014 Filing 874 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re motions for reconsideration. (Paine, Matthew)
March 3, 2014 Filing 873 Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas Sobol - Letter from Thomas Sobol regarding courtesy copies of recent filings -. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 3, 2014 Filing 872 MOTION for Joinder -End-Payor Plaintiffs' Joinder in Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion For Reconsideration of Astrazeneca's and Ranbaxy's Motions For Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation- by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund.(DeValerio, Glen)
February 28, 2014 Filing 871 MEMORANDUM in Support re #870 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for - Direct Puchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of AstaZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Motions for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation (ECF No. 641, 645) Based on a Payment-Free Settlement - filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 - Attachment A -)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 870 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration as to AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Motions for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation (ECF No. 641, 645) Based on a Payment-Free Settlement - by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 869 DECLARATION re #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera - Declaration of A. Luke Smith - by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 868 MEMORANDUM in Support re #867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera - Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration as to AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Motions for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation (ECF # 641, 645) Based on New Evidence - filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 867 MOTION for Reconsideration re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration as to AstraZeneca's and Ranbaxy's Motions for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation (ECF:641, 645) Based on New Evidence - by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 866 DECLARATION re #865 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #864 MOTION for Reconsideration re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #855 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence o - Declaration of John D. Radice - by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 865 MEMORANDUM in Support re #864 MOTION for Reconsideration re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #855 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence o - PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF (1) A MOTION UNDER RULE 6(b)(1)(B) AND (2) A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AS TO TEVAS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON ABSENCE OF REVERSE PAYMENT TO TEVA (ECF NO. 600) AND ASTRAZENECAS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS ARISING FROM ASTRAZENECAS SETTLEMENTS WITH TEVA AND DRL (ECF NO. 644); AND PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO TEVAS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF BASED ON THE NEW MCGUIRE REPORT (ECF NO. 855) - filed by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
February 28, 2014 Filing 864 MOTION for Reconsideration re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #855 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva, #857 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, - Plaintiffs Motion (1) Under Rule 6(b)(1)(B) and (2) for Reconsideration as to Teva's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva (ECF No. 600) and AstraZeneca's Motion for Summary Judgment on all Claims Arising from AstraZeneca's Settlements With Teva and DRL (ECF No. 644); and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Teva's Supplemental Brief Based on the New McGuire Report (ECF No. 855) by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
February 25, 2014 Filing 863 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Notice of Non-Filing of Oppositions to Two of Defendants' Submissions (Sobol, Thomas)
February 25, 2014 Filing 862 DECLARATION re #714 Order by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sorensen, David)
February 14, 2014 Filing 861 DECLARATION re #860 Notice (Other) - Declaration of Thomas M. Sobol - by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit 1 - Email Serving McGuire Report -)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 14, 2014 Filing 860 NOTICE by Plaintiffs - Notice of Filing the Supplemental Report of Thomas G. McGuire - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit A - Supplemental Report of Thomas G. McGuire -)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 12, 2014 Filing 859 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In accordance with the Order entered this date Docket entry #857 , the Pretrial conference set for 2/13/2014 at 2:00 PM and the Ready for Trial deadline are terminated. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 12, 2014 Filing 858 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR CLOSURE(Paine, Matthew)
February 12, 2014 Filing 857 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered: When a judge is faced with an unfocused mass of largely sympathetic but substantially immaterial evidence, he is wont to say to other judges, I have a case in search of a theory. Here it is the reverse. Here there is a theory indeed a strong theory recently endorsed by the Supreme Court, F.T.C. v. Actavis, Inc., 133 S. Ct. 2223 (2013) - searching for a case, or at least sufficient evidence to support each necessary element of the theory. This multidistrict litigation case is on the eve of what the parties estimate will be a six-week trial. The final pre-trial conference is scheduled for tomorrow afternoon at 2 p.m. with the liability trial to follow, commencing on Monday, March 3, 2014. Counsel have worked diligently and with admirable cooperation in preparing this case for trial in a years time. The Court is faced with a plethora of motions for summary judgment which necessarily must be addressed before the case can move forward. Accordingly, after due consideration and careful review of the summary judgment materials and the able arguments of counsel, the Court rules: 1. AstraZenecas Motion for Summary Judgment Against the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Actual Injury and to Exclude the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Experts Damages Opinions [ECF No. 648] was DENIED on January 13, 2014. AstraZenecas Motion for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Statute of Limitations [ECF No. 649] was DENIED on January 13, 2014. 2. AstraZenecas Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Assigned Claims [ECF No. 650] is DENIED as premature. The 30-day Direct Purchaser Class opt-out period is still pending and the Retailer Plaintiffs still have an opportunity to file an exclusion from the certified class. Further, the Retailer Plaintiffs have presented sufficient evidence, including identifying their purchases on which their partial assignments are based, thus minimizing concerns of duplicative recovery under Illinois Brick Co. v. Illinois, 431 U.S. 720 (1977). 3. AstraZeneca, Ranbaxy, and Tevas Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy [ECF No. 647] and the portion of Dr. Reddys Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 594] regarding the Plaintiffs conspiracy claims is DENIED. There is sufficient circumstantial evidence, primarily due to the contingent launch provisions of the respective agreements, for the jury reasonably to infer a conspiracy among the Defendants in violation of Sections 1 and 2 of the Sherman Act and analogous state laws.4. Tevas Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva [ECF No. 600] is GRANTED, primarily on the basis that the Plaintiffs fail to demonstrate the existence of a large, unjustified reverse payment under Actavis, and have not taken the additional opportunity provided by this Court for their expert, Dr. Thomas McGuire, to prepare a proper reasonable royalty damages calculation under accepted methodologies. Teva may, however, still be liable under the overarching conspiracy theory. 5. Tevas Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Causation [ECF No. 606] is DENIED. Teva relies too broadly on the theory that governmental regulatory schemes break the chain of causation in antitrust cases, by using Ranbaxys first-filer 180-day exclusivity right under the Hatch-Waxman Act as a shield against causation. Because the Plaintiffs evidence tends to support an inference that Teva deliberately slowed its Nexium ANDA process as a result of the Teva-AstraZeneca settlement agreement, and because of the existence of genuine disputes of material facts over Tevas readiness and intent to engage in an earlier generic launch, it is appropriate that the determination of antitrust causation be reserved for a jury. 6. Dr. Reddys Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 594] is GRANTED in part. The Plaintiffs fail to demonstrate that the DRL-AstraZeneca settlement agreement constituted a large, unjustified reverse payment under Actavis. With the lack of economic evaluation of the so-called payment, and the insufficient amount of evidence indicating Dr. Reddys readiness to engage in an earlier generic launch, the Plaintiffs are unable to survive this motion. The portion of this motion for summary judgment based on participation in the conspiracy is, however, DENIED. 7. AstraZenecas Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZenecas Settlements with Teva and DRL [ECF No. 644] is GRANTED, primarily on the basis that the Plaintiffs fail to demonstrate that Teva and DRLs settlements with AstraZeneca constituted large, unjustified reverse payment[s] under Actavis which would trigger antitrust concerns. The Plaintiffs also face issues with the admissibility and quality of expert opinions in their Actavis analysis and, in regards to Teva, they fail to provide a proper reasonable royalty analysis from Dr. Thomas McGuire although they were provided an opportunity to do so. 8. AstraZeneca and Ranbaxy Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZenecas Settlement with Ranbaxy [ECF No. 642] must, however, be DENIED on the basis that the Plaintiffs are able to support a reasonable inference of a large, unjustified reverse payment under Actavis, with proper economic valuation and factual support to suggest that Ranbaxy was induced into delaying its generic Nexium in exchange for lucrative side agreements and an exclusive license agreement. A reasonable jury could determine from the evidence that a payment was made from AstraZeneca to Ranbaxy under the rule of reason standard outlined in Actavis for establishing antitrust liability. 9. The great judge, Richard Arnold, said, [t]he simplest way to decide a case is often the best. Chambers v. Bowersox, 157 F.3d 560, 564 n.4 (8th Cir. 1998). Ranbaxys Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation [ECF No. 641] must be GRANTED, primarily because there is here no adequate evidence that Ranbaxy would have launched at risk. Conclusory statements that Ranbaxy could have launched at risk had only it wanted to move more urgently are insufficient. Moreover, the Plaintiffs are unable to support an argument that earlier generic entry would have been feasible due to Ranbaxys continuing, and well-documented difficulties with obtaining FDA approval. 10. Accordingly, AstraZenecas Motion for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation [ECF No. 645] must likewise be GRANTED with respect to its agreements with Ranbaxy and Dr. Reddys, and DENIED with respect to its agreement with Teva. In light of these rulings, tomorrows final pre-trial conference and the March 3rd trial are continued without day. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(a) (The court should state on the record the reasons for granting or denying the motion.), the parties deserve to have these rulings fully explicated in a thorough written opinion. In a case as complex as this, such composition and writing will take time. As the case is fully prepared for trial, it is important to minimize wasteful transaction costs. Accordingly, save for motions for reconsideration, this case is ordered administratively closed while the Court prepares its full written opinion. It may be reopened upon the motion of any party, upon the first of any of the following events to occur: (1) the Court asks for further briefing upon a motion for reconsideration; (2) any two or more of the parties seek Court approval for a settlement; (3) a generic version of Nexium is launched; or (4) the Court issues its written opinion. SO ORDERED... (Paine, Matthew)
February 12, 2014 Filing 856 DECLARATION re #855 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (Declaration of Laurence A. Schoen) by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Schoen, Laurence)
February 12, 2014 Filing 855 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #604 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire, Shashank Upadhye and John Thomas Relating to Prilosec Litigation, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva -- Teva's Supplemental Brief Based on The New McGuire Expert Report in Support of its Motion to Exclude McGuire's Testimony and Motion for Summary Judgment -- filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
February 12, 2014 Filing 854 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST042030 for #852 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) (Paine, Matthew)
February 12, 2014 Filing 853 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST042029 for #851 Notice of Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) (Paine, Matthew)
February 12, 2014 Filing 852 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi K. Hubbard on behalf of Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB (Paine, Matthew)
February 12, 2014 Filing 851 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Livingston on behalf of Giant Eagle, Inc (Paine, Matthew)
February 11, 2014 Filing 850 Filing fee/payment: $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST042011 for #849 (Pro Hac Vice) Notice of Appearance. (Paine, Matthew)
February 11, 2014 Filing 849 NOTICE of Appearance by Yechiel Michael Twersky on behalf of Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)
February 11, 2014 Filing 848 NOTICE by Giant Eagle, Inc Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cain-Mannix, Moira)
February 7, 2014 Filing 847 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Version), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schoen, Laurence)
February 6, 2014 Filing 845 MEMORANDUM in Support re #844 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Weingarten, James)
February 6, 2014 Filing 844 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Argument or Evidence Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Attorney-Client Privilege by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weingarten, James)
February 5, 2014 Filing 843 MOTION for Leave to File - Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File A Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission ECF 831 - by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit A -)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 4, 2014 Filing 842 Opposition re #830 MOTION - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Resnik, Stephanie)
February 4, 2014 Filing 841 Opposition re #830 MOTION - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Weingarten, James)
February 3, 2014 Filing 840 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "The Court has not set a date" re #839 MOTION for Clarification - Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification of In Limine Motions Due Date (Paine, Matthew)
January 31, 2014 Filing 839 MOTION for Clarification - Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification of In Limine Motions Due Date - by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company.(Sobol, Thomas)
January 27, 2014 Filing 838 NOTICE by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Filing Under Seal with Certificate of Service (Su, Leslie)
January 27, 2014 Filing 837 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund to #724 Order,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeValerio, Glen)
January 27, 2014 Filing 836 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company to #724 Order,,. (Sobol, Thomas)
January 25, 2014 Filing 835 DECLARATION re #714 Order by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Coslett, Caitlin) (Main Document 835 replaced on 1/27/2014) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2014: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/27/2014) (Paine, Matthew).
January 24, 2014 Filing 834 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 24, 2014 Filing 833 Transcript of Motions Hearing and Pretrial Conference held on January 21, 2013, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com Redaction Request due 2/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Main Document 833 replaced on 1/24/2014) (Scalfani, Deborah).
January 21, 2014 Filing 846 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2014 re #647 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy, #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva, #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims Arising from Settlement with Ranbaxy, #594 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral arguments made as to all motions by the defendants. After a brief recess, the Court hears argument by the plaintiffs. The Court denies Motion for Summary Judgment #647 on no overarching conspiracy. An Order on the motions heard at oral argument to be issued no sooner than 2/11/2014. A lobby conference off the record held to inquire as to settlement. Hearing on the record continued. The Court announces that he finds that Apfel and Meyers will not testify and the two lawyers, Updahye and Thomas will not testify. The Court finds that McGuire is qualified but requires a detailed Georgia-Pacific analysis be filed by 1/31/2013. The defendants have until 2/15/2014 to take further deposition and to file further documents. Pretrial conference held. The trial will be last on the running trial list for March 2014. Trial is expected to last six (6) weeks on liability on all plaintiffs and all defendants. The Court allows one full month after conclusion of trial on liability to hear trial on damages. (Court Reporter: Donald Womack at womack@megatran.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 21, 2014 Filing 832 Ranbaxy Defendants' Submission to Respond to Demonstrative Plaintiffs Provided to Court at Summary Judgment Hearing Response by Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc. . (Baldridge, James)
January 21, 2014 Filing 831 MEMORANDUM in Support re #830 MOTION - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - - Memorandum of Law in Support of Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Sobol, Thomas)
January 21, 2014 Filing 830 MOTION - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission - by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 20, 2014 Filing 829 - Reply Submission - Response by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company - Reply Submission of Direct and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs In Connection With the Court's January 21 Hearing on Trial Issues -. (Sobol, Thomas)
January 20, 2014 Filing 828 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company re #744 Opposition to Motion,,, #584 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Martha Bennett - Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Supplemental Report of James C. Morrison - (Sobol, Thomas)
January 20, 2014 Filing 827 MOTION for Leave to File - Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Richard S. Ruback [ECF 591] - by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 - Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Richard S. Ruback -)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 17, 2014 Filing 826 MOTION for Leave to File - Direct Purchaser And End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion Of Direct Purchaser And End-Payor Class Plaintiffs To Exclude Portions Of The Expert Testimony Of Gregory K. Bell, PH.D. [ECF 593] - by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 - Direct Purchaser And End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Exclude Portions Of The Expert Testimony Of Gregory K. Bell, PH.D. -)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 17, 2014 Filing 825 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Cheryl Blume by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lazerow, Andrew)
January 17, 2014 Filing 824 NOTICE by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB re #805 Notice (Other), AstraZeneca's Response to Retailer Plaintiffs' Submission re: (1) Nexium Patent Merits and (2) Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit A)(Weingarten, James)
January 17, 2014 Filing 823 REPLY to Response to #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Baldridge, James)
January 17, 2014 Filing 822 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #818 Reply to Response to Motion, #820 Reply to Response to Motion, #819 Reply to Response to Motion, #821 Reply to Response to Motion, #814 Reply to Response to Motion, #817 Reply to Response to Motion, #816 Reply to Response to Motion, #815 Reply to Response to Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office Attention Matt Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
January 16, 2014 Filing 821 REPLY to Response to #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
January 16, 2014 Filing 820 REPLY to Response to #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims Arising from Settlement with Ranbaxy filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James)
January 16, 2014 Filing 819 REPLY to Response to #594 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit III, #2 Exhibit JJJ, #3 Exhibit LLL)(Gore, John)
January 16, 2014 Filing 818 REPLY to Response to #650 MOTION for Summary Judgment Barring Assigned Claims filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Lazerow, Andrew)
January 16, 2014 Filing 817 REPLY to Response to #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB. (Weingarten, James)
January 16, 2014 Filing 816 REPLY to Response to #647 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Weingarten, James)
January 16, 2014 Filing 815 REPLY to Response to #606 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Causation filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
January 16, 2014 Filing 814 REPLY to Response to #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
January 16, 2014 Filing 813 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Jayne A. Goldstein Change of Firm Name (Goldstein, Jayne)
January 16, 2014 Filing 812 E-Mail Notice re 810 originally issued on January 15, 2014 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Andrew Vasicek. A review of the firm's website does not show this attorney. The attorney's email address has been removed from the court's database. (Hurley, Virginia)
January 15, 2014 Filing 811 Trial Management Submission by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. (Schoen, Laurence) (Modified on 1/16/2014 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
January 15, 2014 Filing 810 Memorandum Concerning Trial Procedure and Plaintiffs' Burden of Proof by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Weingarten, James) (Modified on 1/16/2014 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
January 15, 2014 Filing 809 REPLY to Response to #580 MOTION Motion to Exclude DRL-Related Testimony of Dr. Marilyn Apfel filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T, #2 Exhibit U, #3 Exhibit V)(Resnik, Stephanie)
January 15, 2014 Filing 808 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #806 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude DRL-Related Testimony of Dr. Marilyn Apfel ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
January 15, 2014 Filing 807 NOTICE by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Submission Concerning Evidence Relating to Patent Issues (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schoen, Laurence)
January 14, 2014 Filing 806 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude DRL-Related Testimony of Dr. Marilyn Apfel by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit T, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Exhibit V)(Resnik, Stephanie)
January 14, 2014 Filing 805 NOTICE by Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. Retailer Plaintiffs' Submission Re: (1) Nexium Patent Merits; and (2) Trial (Perwin, Scott)
January 14, 2014 Filing 804 REPLY to Response to #604 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire, Shashank Upadhye and John Thomas Relating to Prilosec Litigation filed by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Schoen, Laurence)
January 14, 2014 Filing 803 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #800 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire, Shashank Upadhye and John Thomas Relating to Prilosec Litigation ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
January 13, 2014 Filing 802 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: "Motion denied. This issue has been fully addressed in the earlier orders of the Court." re #649 Motion for Summary Judgment (Paine, Matthew)
January 13, 2014 Filing 801 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #648 Motion for Summary Judgment (Paine, Matthew)
January 13, 2014 Filing 800 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire, Shashank Upadhye and John Thomas Relating to Prilosec Litigation by TEVA USA, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Reply)(Schoen, Laurence)
January 13, 2014 Filing 799 NOTICE TO COUNSEL. The Court sets an initial pretrial conference for 1/21/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Counsel shall be prepared for a continuation of this hearing on Wednesday, January 22, 2014 at 9:00 AM if necessary. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 13, 2014 Filing 798 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Penelope Abdiel (Abdiel, Penelope)
January 13, 2014 Filing 797 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #647 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy, #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #617 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Keith Leffler , #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva, #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims Arising from Settlement with Ranbaxy, #594 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Corrected Declaration of Anna T. Neill, Esq. in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike (Correcting Docket No. 767). (Neill, Anna)
January 10, 2014 Filing 796 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company re 720 Order on Motion to Seal,,, Hearing (Other),,,,,,,,,,,, #589 MOTION to Exclude DRL-Related Testimony of Patent Infringement Experts , #627 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Bruce Sunstein - DIRECT PURCHASER AND END-PAYOR CLASS PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-FILING OF CERTAIN OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS THAT THE COURT HAS RENDERED MOOT - (Sobol, Thomas)
January 10, 2014 Filing 795 NOTICE by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca AB Letter to the Court re: Courtesy Copies of Briefs Filed on 1/9/14 (Weingarten, James)
January 10, 2014 Filing 794 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #786 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Excluding the Proposed Testimony of Peter Ludwig and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Paine, Matthew)
January 10, 2014 Filing 793 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #782 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #737 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,, #771 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, #735 Opposition to Motion,, #792 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,,, #791 Opposition to Motion,,,, #768 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #765 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #736 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #757 Opposition to Motion, #748 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #734 Opposition to Motion,, #762 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #740 Opposition to Motion, #784 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, #744 Opposition to Motion,,, #767 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,,, #778 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,,,, #761 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #769 Declaration,,, #777 Declaration,,, #753 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #790 Opposition to Motion,,,, #773 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #746 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #775 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,,,, #789 Opposition to Motion,,,, #739 Opposition to Motion, #760 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #752 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #741 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #788 Opposition to Motion,,, #776 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,,,, #755 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, #747 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #770 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, #774 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #772 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, #733 Opposition to Motion,, #779 Opposition to Motion, #780 Opposition to Motion, #783 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,,,, #732 Opposition to Motion, #751 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #759 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, #787 Response to Motion,, #763 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, #764 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #743 Opposition to Motion,, #766 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #781 Opposition to Motion, #754 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #738 Opposition to Motion,, #742 Opposition to Motion, #786 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Excluding the Proposed Testimony of Peter Ludwig and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #745 Opposition to Motion, #731 Opposition to Motion, #758 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, #749 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #750 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #785 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,,,,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matt Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
January 9, 2014 Filing 792 AFFIDAVIT of Bruce E. Gerstein in Opposition re #647 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy, #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL, #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva, #594 MOTION for Summary Judgment and In Support of Class Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Facts filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Plaintiffs, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (REDACTED))(Gerstein, Bruce) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #2 Exhibits 78-167, #3 Exhibits 175-273, #4 Exhibits 275-282, #5 Exhibits 283-294, #6 Exhibits 295-366, #7 Exhibits 451-461, #8 Exhibits 608-785, #9 Exhibits 869, #10 Exhibits 969 and 977, #11 Exhibit 1081 - Part 1, #12 Exhibit 1081 - Part 2, #13 Exhibits 1917-2512, #14 Exhibit 2515 - Part 1, #15 Exhibit 2515 - Part 2, #16 Exhibits 2811-2830) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #17 Exhibits 3066-3324) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #18 Exhibit 2580-2794) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #19 Exhibit 2831-2898) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #20 Exhibit 2906-3057) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 791 Joint Opposition re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Opposition to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Peter Kohn)(Kohn, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/1/2014 - Redacted Exhibit Added) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 791 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #3 Exhibits 1-237, #4 Exhibits 238-765, #5 Exhibits 772-1434, #6 Exhibits 1622-1646, #7 Exhibits 1647-1716, #8 Exhibits 1718-1781, #9 Exhibits 1787-1865, #10 Exhibits 1866-1976, #11 Exhibits 1978-2533, #12 Exhibits 2525-3008, #13 Exhibits 3009-3214) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 790 Joint Opposition re #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Peter Kohn)(Kohn, Peter) (Main Document 790 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #3 Exhibits 1-237, #4 Exhibits 238-765, #5 Exhibits 772-1434, #6 Exhibits 1622-1646, #7 Exhibits 1647-1716, #8 Exhibits 1718-1781, #9 Exhibits 1787-1865, #10 Exhibits 1866-1976, #11 Exhibits 1978-2523, #12 Exhibits 2525-3008, #13 Exhibits 3009-3214) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 789 Joint Opposition re #606 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Causation filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Peter Kohn)(Kohn, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #3 Exhibits 1-237, #4 Exhibits 238-765, #5 Exhibits 772-1434, #6 Exhibits 1622-1646, #7 Exhibits 1647-1716, #8 Exhibits 1718-1781, #9 Exhibits 1787-1865, #10 Exhibits 1866-1976, #11 Exhibits 1978-2523, #12 Exhibits 2525-3008, #13 Exhibits 3009-3214) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 788 Joint Opposition re #635 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Cheryl Blume filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter Kohn)(Kohn, Peter) (Main Document 788 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #2 Exhibits 1-6) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 787 RESPONSE to Motion re #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims Arising from Settlement with Ranbaxy DIRECT PURCHASER AND END-PAYOR CLASS PLAINTIFFS LOCAL RULE 56.1 RESPONSE TO ASTRAZENECA AND RANBAXY STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS RELATING TO THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS ARISING FROM ASTRAZENECAS SETTLEMENT WITH RANBAXY (ECF 684) AND STATEMENT OF ADDITONAL MATERIAL FACTS filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Sorensen, David) (Main Document 787 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 786 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Excluding the Proposed Testimony of Peter Ludwig and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Choi, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldridge, James)
January 9, 2014 Filing 785 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #647 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy Class Plaintiffs' Response and Statement of Additional Facts filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Plaintiffs, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce) (Main Document 785 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 784 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #647 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Overarching Conspiracy, #594 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Plaintiffs, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce)
January 9, 2014 Filing 783 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation Retailer Plaintiffs' Response to AstraZeneca Defedant's Statement of Undisputed Facts Relating to Their Motion for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation filed by Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Moira Cain-Mannix, #12 Exhibit 11, #22 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 25,(Cain-Mannix, Moira) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/23/2014) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 783 replaced on 2/13/2014) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2014: #27 Exhibit 1, #28 Exhibit 2, #29 Exhibit 3, #30 Exhibit 4, #31 Exhibit 5, #33 Exhibit 6, #34 Exhibit 7, #35 Exhibit 8, #36 Exhibit 9, #37 Exhibit 10, #38 Exhibit 12, #39 Exhibit 13, #40 Exhibit 14, #41 Exhibit 15, #42 Exhibit 16, #43 Exhibit 17, #44 Exhibit 18, #45 Exhibit 19, #46 Exhibit 20, #47 Exhibit 22, #48 Exhibit 23, #49 Exhibit 24, #50 Exhibit 26, #51 Exhibit 27) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 782 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas Urban in Opposition re #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims Arising from Settlement with Ranbaxy filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 701, 703, 869, #2 Exhibit 969, 1592, #3 Exhibit 1593, 1918-22, #4 Exhibit 1923, 1948, 2813, 3244, 3247, 5005)(Urban, Nicholas) (Main Document 782 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2016: #5 Exhibits 2-37, #6 Exhibits 39-89, #7 Exhibits 120-165, #8 Exhibits 167 and 170, #9 Exhibits 175-222, #10 Exhibits 232-403, #11 Exhibits 404-524, #12 Exhibits 527-730, #13 Exhibits 731-746,1528 and 1679, #14 Exhibits 1777, 1947 and 1975-2512, #15 Exhibits 2515-2794, #16 Exhibits 3243, 3258-3299 and 5006) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: #17 Exhibit 2812 and 2825-2938) (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2016: #18 Exhibits 2944-3034) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 781 Opposition re #645 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Causation filed by Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Cain-Mannix, Moira)
January 9, 2014 Filing 780 Opposition re #596 MOTION Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Certain Portions Of The Expert Testimony Of S. Peter Ludwig, Esq. filed by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories, LTD, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Choi, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of Sarah Choi)(Baldridge, James)
January 9, 2014 Filing 779 Opposition re #642 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims Arising from Settlement with Ranbaxy REDACTED filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Value Drug Company. (Sorensen, David) (Main Document 779 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 778 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #594 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Plaintiffs' Response and Statement of Additional Facts filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Plaintiffs, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce) (Main Document 778 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 777 DECLARATION re #773 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #774 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1,, by Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Supervalu, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 16, # (Cain-Mannix, Moira) (Main Document 777 replaced on 1/23/2014) (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 2/13/2014 (Paine, Matthew). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2014: #17 Exhibit 1, #18 Exhibit 2, #19 Exhibit 3, #20 Exhibit 4, #21 Exhibit 5, #22 Exhibit 6, #23 Exhibit 9, #24 Exhibit 10, #25 Exhibit 11, #26 Exhibit 12, #27 Exhibit 13, #28 Exhibit 14, #29 Exhibit 15, #30 Exhibit 17, #31 Exhibit 18, #32 Exhibit 19, #33 Exhibit 20, #34 Exhibit 21, #35 Exhibit 22, #36 Exhibit 23, #37 Exhibit 24, #38 Exhibit 25, #39 Exhibit 26, #40 Exhibit 27, #41 Exhibit 28, #42 Exhibit 29, #43 Exhibit 30, #44 Exhibit 31, #45 Exhibit 32, #46 Exhibit 33) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 776 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #644 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims Arising From AstraZeneca's Settlements with Teva and DRL Class Plaintiffs' Response and Statement of Additional Facts filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Plaintiffs, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce) (Main Document 776 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 775 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #600 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Absence of Reverse Payment to Teva Class Plaintiffs' Response and Statement of Additional Facts filed by A.F. of L., A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Burlington Drug Company Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund, International Brotherhood Of Electrical Workers Local 595 Health And Welfare Fund, International Union of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 15 Health Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 17 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 345 Health Care Fund, Laborers International Union of North America Local 35 Health Care Fund, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council and Hotel Assoc. of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Plaintiffs, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food Workers and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Value Drug Company. (Gerstein, Bruce) (Main Document 775 replaced on 1/14/2016) (Paine, Matthew).
January 9, 2014 Filing 774 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #641 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Causation Retailer Plaintiffs' Response to Ranbaxy Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Causation filed by Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle, Inc, HEB GROCERY CO. LP, JCG (PJC) USA, LLC, Maxi Drug, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Safeway Inc., Super