Sindi v. El-Moslimany et al

Plaintiff: Hayat Sindi
Defendant: Samia El-Moslimany and Ann El-Moslimany
Case Number: 1:2013cv10798
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2016 211 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT. See attached. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 3, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 26, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re: 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. See attached Order. (MacDonald, Gail)
December 29, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting 72 Motion to Vacate Dismissal; denying 72 Finding of Effective Service; granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall serve the defendant Ann El-Moslimany in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 by no later than January 29, 2015. (Bartlett, Timothy)
December 5, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; adopting Report and Recommendations re 66 Report and Recommendations. (MacDonald, Gail)
March 26, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered denying 4 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 17 Motion to Set Aside Default (Danieli, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sindi v. El-Moslimany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayat Sindi
Represented By: Michael T. Allen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David H. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samia El-Moslimany
Represented By: George R. White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann El-Moslimany
Represented By: George R. White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?