United States of America v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Scott G. Baker, Robyn Baker and OneWest Bank
Case Number: 1:2013cv11078
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Plymouth
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Stearns
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Amended JUDGMENT - Scott Bakers share of the escrowed IMA funds, $342,539.39, is forfeited to the United States towards satisfaction of his outstanding tax obligations. The balance, $256,539.38, is to be returned to Robyn Baker.(Zierk, Marsha)
October 23, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Zierk, Marsha)
September 28, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: Further ORDER on United States' Proposed Form of Final Judgment entered. (Zierk, Marsha)
August 17, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The Clerk will enter judgment for the United States on Count II of its Complaint. As the prevailing party, the United States will, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, submit a Proposed Form of Final Judgment.(RGS, law1)
January 29, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. re 71 Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America, which resolves Count I of the United States' Complaint. (RGS, law1)
September 30, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM & ORDER entered denying 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The clerk is directed to set the case for trial on the issues identified by the court in the Memorandum & Order. (RGS, law1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael R. Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott G. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?