Spencer v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Barry Spencer
Defendant: Mr. Lewis and City of Boston Police Department
Case Number: 1:2013cv11528
Filed: June 19, 2013
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Marianne B. Bowler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2016 162 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motion to Appoint Counsel (Docket Entry # 149 ). The motion to appoint counsel (Docket Entry # 149 ) is DENIED without prejudice. (Patton, Christine)
November 6, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. In accordance with the foregoing discussion, the City's motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry # 107 ) is ALLOWED as to the claim brought against them under the MTCA . The partial motions for summary judgment brought by defendant officers (Docket Entry ## 93 , 95 , 97 , 99 , 101 , 103 , 105 ) are ALLOWED as to the false arrest, malicious prosecution and the conspiracy claims as well as the denial of and in adequate medical care claims under section 1983 and the MTCA. The remaining claims consist of the assault and battery claim and the excessive force claim against defendant officers. The deadline to file dispositive motions has passed and there will be no extension of the deadline in this 2013 case. This court will conduct a status conference on December 3, 2015 at 2:45 p.m. to set a trial date. (Patton, Christine)
April 4, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: MOTION FOR JOINDER OF PARTIES (DOCKET ENTRY #29)is DENIED.(Feeney, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?