Boston Copyright Associates, Ltd. v. U-Haul International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Boston Copyright Associates, Ltd.
Defendant: U-Haul International, Inc., U-Haul Co. of Massachusetts and Ohio, Inc, Amerco, Inc., Pregis Corporation and Pregis Innovative Packaging, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv12826
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Stearns
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re: production of documents. SEE attached Order. (MacDonald, Gail)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SEE attached ORDER. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. For the reasons set forth in the attached MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the court DENIES Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 75 . (MacDonald, Gail)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the court treats Defendants Motion to Dismiss PlaintiffsSecond Amended Complaint [#48] as directed at the superseding complaint and allows themotion insofar as it seeks dismissal of Counts 2 and 3. (MacDonald, Gail)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Copyright Associates, Ltd. v. U-Haul International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul Co. of Massachusetts and Ohio, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pregis Corporation
Represented By: Todd Michael McGrath
Represented By: Brian Michaelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pregis Innovative Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Michael McGrath
Represented By: Brian Michaelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Copyright Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: Henry Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?