In Re: Fresenius Granuflo/Naturalyte Dialysate Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Richard Price, Sr., Antonio McCollum, Henry C Wiggins, Donna Thomas, Dwain Cox, Amber N. Gordon, Nidra DIllon, Monica McVey, Elia Ehnot, Mary L. Ford, Michael Peterson, Bobby Thomas, Stella Trubilla, DIANE PAGE, Michael Buckley, Barbara Wilcutt, Clara Harris, Lilian MacGregor, Earnest Bernard Jett, Mervyn Boyd, Frank Ford, Larry Powell, Joyce Burton, Connie G Stott, Phillip Mulkins, Sheila Lovern, Janice Train, Charity Faulkner, Wanda Clark, David Roy, Toni Geren, Denise Hampton, William Shelby, James R Smith, Amelia West, Beth Politi, Jackie Wilson, Lois Harris, David Brown, Sr., Bobby Williams, Autumn Glenn, Kathleen Jane Ferguson, MELINDA ROCKWELL, Martin Moreno, Dory Gutierrez, Joe Apikian, Linda McDowell, Monique Oliver-Manning, Herbert Roundtree, Shertrice Daniels, Boyd Townsend, Ted Campbell, Anahid Akhaian, Shelia Sims, Rose Cathey, Melissa Martin, Rosa Munoz, Helarena Lewis, Lola Marie Hearn, Anticipated Personal Representative of the Estate of Lola Mae McBride, Steven Mitchell, Corrina Riley, Cecil Cox, LORI STOKES, Cheryl McKeithen, Yeranoush Shahmirian, Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP, Geraldine Gaines, Charles Snell, Mrs. Roberta Cosby, Tamika Banks, MICHAEL V. TOZZI, Alice Champagne, Katrina Carter, Pamela Holman, Jeffrey Allen Cooke, Clarence L. Dubose, Treneice L Emerson, Maria Guzman, Latasha Young, Monica Burton, Joseph Brasfield, Charles Roby, James Scott, Deloris Jackson, Maxine McGinnis, Delores Blanchard, personal rep of the Estate of Tawana Blanchard, dec., Yvonne Evans, James Dean, Alysha Marissa Brown, Dapthay Willis, Shirley Thurman, Sheila Williams, Carolyn Schweppenheiser, Wendy Horner, Kerry Queiroz, Tigran Aytayan, Sophia Walker, Imari Porter, Billy Peters, Grigor Demirchyan, Ivan Faulks, Constance Lee Smith, Phyllis Price, Charlotte Guffey, Kirk M Pratt, Mikel Harris, Aidelina Camacho, Jerry Pittock, Vivian Buchanon, Shirley Digiannurio, James Triplet, Dona Ronzone, Opal Irene Mischke, Delbert Hicks, Angel Rivera, Betty Mauro, Lavonne M. Patterson, Austin P Jeter, Stella Winterman, Susanna Jean Mays, Joyce Marie Clark, Patrick Pollard, Madison M. Peyatte, Jr., Latoya Carter, Sandra Rutledge, Roxanne Rychly, Anait Ajaryan, Elizaveta Galachyan, Ruzanna Danielyan, Lida Shamorodian, Wilhelmina Bumpers, Lisa Holck, Brenda Fenwick, Brian Adams, Fannie Mitchell, Cynthia Judkins, Estate of Frances Bell Scott, Aprel Atkins, Betty Jo Nunn, ESTATE OF R D CLEMMONS, Kimberly Stephens, Stacy Payne, Connie Voigt, Kenneth Wright, Kolosifilo Pino, Doroty Ringold, Gregory Pierce, Teresa Evans, Timothy Ciscell, Marie Daugherty, Janice McGhee, Heather Moore-Brandon, Ocie B. Jackson, Carolina Defacio, Theresa Marino, Mable Neither, Kimberly Ross, Eve Gavin, Angelos Zachery, Dwaine Haerinck, Lashane Williams, Christopher Parich, Christina Wilmer, Diane Dickerson, Barbara Sanders, Rosetta Garries, Wendy Johnson, Gloria Boyce, H. Van Z Lawrence, as personal representative of the Estate of Alicia Lawrence, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Tootsie Pollard, Lakenya Nolden, SHEENA JOYCE, Patricia Pernell, Brian Gooden, Mary Bland, Patricia J. Anderson, Barbara Myrick, Johnnie Mae Estelle, Beulah Williams, Shirley Allen, Brian Campbell, Clarence Askew, Pamela Manning, Carolyn Reynolds, Vicky Buggs, Michael McNulty, Linda Lucas, Carol Solow, Tyonda Tinner, Marcus Brown, Billy Wheeler, Tony Montanez, Annie Paige, Don Gillespie, Eva Gonzalez, Melissa Lewis, Thomas Bankston, Della Jean Rogers, Michele Folk, Clarence Swanigan, Florence Harmon, Delores Brown, Shandranicka Wyche, Jerry Weaver, Eoline L Stoudamire, BERNIS E. TEAGUE, Sherman George, Alvin Sexton, Danny Davis, Rosemary Holder, Estate of Emily Louise Geren, Trina Williams, Mary Lou Rainsberger, Kimberly Jones Harris, Susan Sanders, Wesley Davis, Jr., Michael Travis Davis, Glenda Knighton, Kathleen Palmaccio, Megan Queiroz, The State of Louisiana, shirley mccloud, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Sunny Jefferson, Antoine Deon Johnson, Jimmy Brooks, Jimmy Sweet, Jack Gress, Jr., Armenak Ovnanyan, Jackson Robertson, Walker McCullom, Gladys Brown, David Mineo, Charlene Stauber, Laurine Nicholson, Valerie Espinoza, Rosemary Allen, Nakeisha Wolfe, Darrington Morris, Larry Thompson, John F. Oberhausen, Jr., Verba L. Wesley, Ronald Baldwin, Albert Jones, Lola Hearn, Barbara Cohen, Laine Dennison, Rosemary Davis, Debra S Clevenger, Jim Hood, Mae Johnson, Dorothy Johnson, Kathy Dennis, Guy Benoit, Rhonda Cox, Valerie D. Brown, Michelle Rowell, Kimberly Bedford, Sylvia Braddock, Miriam Carrion, Jacqueline Borge, Anneray Hopkins, Charlene Hampton, Jeanette Pelfrey, Danny L. Howard, Jeffrey Eidelberg, Ronald Pemberton, Sr, Karita Jackson, Amanda Virgin, Patricia Maus, Mary Brown, Bettyann Hagerty-Long, Melissa Adler, Melissa Mott Harvey, Jeffrey Alex Meeks, Kathy Munsey, David Dixon, Rosa Valadez, Michael Hite, Karen Bibens, Otis Bradley, Lari Parich, Billie Joe Smith, Charles Cameron, Ann Cannon, Barbara Harper, Mary Roby, Adrienne Grace, Brian Steinkirchner, Daisy Shaver, Linda Gray Thompson, Suzan Stitchick, Helene Weiner, Brent Lambert, Kristine Staver, Shirlene Smith, Mr. Jeffrey Alex Meeks, Juanita Olivas, Shalonda May, Vanessa H. Moore, Thomas Rogers, Nicole Montibello, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Tina Molle, Debbie Boswell, Jacqueline Bowens, Clinton Young, Kevin Jefferson, Karensee Johnson, Patricia Thomas, Thomas Majors, Yolanda Endres, Ronald Brewer, Roberto Alicea, Anne Gevorgyan, SANDRA WHITNEY, Sylvia Queiroz, Rose Bailey, Evelyn Windham, Torrance Robins, Alexia Beard, Calvin Boswell, Alex Kazos, Mary Cox, Marlene Harrison, Annette Jefferson, Billy Earby, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC, Herbert Farmer, Ruby Davis, Lorene Armstrong, Keisha Joseph, Lisa Silvas, Todd Medley, Pamela Triplett, Rosa Vasquez, Carol J Pieczonka, Judith L. Rice, Minnie Smith, Gloria Cothern Dunaway, Sherrill Moore, Barbara Colwell, David Brown, Jr., Terrence Williams, Anne Roberts, Machelle Lewis, Wayne Pearce, Aaron W. Porterfield, Tonya Peyatte Ferguson, Florella Dial, CARLOS STOKES, Tina Nunn, Kevin Michael Parsons, Robert Caffey, Sr., Henry payton, Mary Sexton, George Martin, Clotee Downs, Geraldine mosley, Kenya Cook, Robert Queiroz, Kathy Scott, Roy McDonald, Max Riben, Paula Vaughn, Velta Loredo, Margaret Zinerco, Annie Sherwood, Nicola Jordan, Jewel Ford, Betty Clark, Aida Taldabanian, JENNIE SAMUELS, Edward J. Lastorka, Karen Green, Robert Richardson, Deborah Lowry, Shelly Harrison, Administrator Kelly Ludington, Daphne James, Larry D Wiegand, Virginia Allen, IRMGARD NELSON, Norma Jean Smallwood, Eric L. Womble, Jr., Florence Payton, Valerie Jones, Hazel M. Smith, Anthony Floyd, Anthony Yates, Pamela Thomas, Natalie Hannah, Stephanie Payne, Mattie Crain Lee, Shirley Quick, Sharron McLean, Patricia Gould, Andy Lettas, Vikki Johnson-Smith, James D. Mills, Anna Maglione, Beverly Dubin, Carol Riva, Antoinette Teresa Lee, Julianne Knapp, Lillie Harris, David Lorenz, Lisa Weiner-Cashman, Marvin McKenzie, Emma Hernandez, Dorothy B. Council, Carlotta Jerry, Charles Ervin, Tamika Smith, James Benton Jackson, Barbara Shamesman, Cherry Gallon, Martha Brunson Small, State of Louisiana, Barbara Ellison, Randy Evans, Renato Gutierrez, Jessie Hallums, LaFacadia Henderson, Arpik Mzrakyan, Sharon Randall, Lilian Bray, Irma Burton, Aaron Metcalf, Joan Ornoski, Deborah Swigert, Victor Jones, Dorothy Mason, Kathy McDougal, Milta Kyles, Eric Young, Anthony Tarricone, Katherine Spivey, Alan Waterstreet, Madonna D. Bailey, George Butler, Valorie Jenkins, Tony Fontenot, SONJIA SIMPSON, Minnie Carter, Larry York, CoraDena Batiste, Debra Patterson, Betty J. Taylor, Vanessa Presley, Janice Harris, Victoria S. Walter, Shawn A. Howard, Doris McCullom, Stephanie Macy, Rickie Deboard, VALERIE HOPKINS, Deborah Moman, Latoya Ulmer, Michael Hughes, Eric Johnson, Brandon Keffer, Willa Craig, Sydell Green, Angelita Nelson, Ella Cox, Consuella Williams, Victor Bolden, Johnnie Odessa White, Osborn Lumpkin, Jr., Regina Washington, Geraldine Dillingham, Barbara Reed, Cindy Cox, Sam Macaluso, Bettye B Alexander, Janice Bradley, Sorita Harris, Tara Hill, Margie McFall, Glenda Goins, Bernice Gregory, Evelyn McCann, Deborra K. Harper, Anthony Thomas, Minnie Chesney, Marcella Tearson, Kathleen Ferguson, Debbie Sprouse, Mamie Hallmark, Marilyn Sybalski, Wendy Child, Nella Greco, Paul Sybalski, Arthur Hill, Alice Cox, Mahalie White and Daniel Carter
Defendant: Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Dialysis Clinic, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Management, AG, Walter L. Weisman, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius SE & Co. KGAA, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Management, AG, Fresenius Management SE, Fresenius USA, Inc., Selma Nephrology Associates, P.A., Renal Advantage, Inc. and Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Not Yet Classified: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, Plaintiffs' Federal-State Liaison Counsel for Massachusetts, Plaintiffs' Federal-State Liaison Counsel for California, Dr. Paul Miller and James D. Gotz
Intervenor Plaintiff: Louisiana Health Service and Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
In Re: Fresenius Granuflo/Naturalyte Dialysate Products Liability Litigation
Consolidated Plaintiff: Consolidated Plaintiffs
Case Number: 1:2013md02428
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 2024 STATUS REPORT re Settlement Program by James D. Gotz. (Gotz, James)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2023 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC PROCEDURAL ORDER - In light of the Defendant FMCNAs Third Omnibus Motion (ECF# 2013) to Dismiss following the failure of the plaintiffs in the eight (8) cases identified therein to properly comply with Case Management Order No.17 (ECF#1825), the Clerk is directed to enter a Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice on May 28, 2019, in each such case in the absence of further order of this court for good cause shown. (Beatty, Barbara)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2022 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2428 dated 4/2/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2021 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff: Counsel, having filed entries 2014-2020 on March 12, 2019, is directed to file these documents in member case 1:18-cv-12231-DPW. (Kinsella, Devan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2020 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC re #2014 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CCC, #2 Exhibit DDD, #3 Exhibit EEE, #4 Exhibit GGG, #5 Exhibit FFF)(Jagolinzer, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2019 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC re #2014 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WW, #2 Exhibit XX, #3 Exhibit YY, #4 Exhibit ZZ, #5 Exhibit AAA, #6 Exhibit BBB)(Jagolinzer, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2018 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC re #2014 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MM, #2 Exhibit NN, #3 Exhibit OO, #4 Exhibit PP, #5 Exhibit QQ, #6 Exhibit SS, #7 Exhibit TT, #8 Exhibit UU, #9 Exhibit VV)(Jagolinzer, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2017 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC re #2014 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB, #3 Exhibit CC, #4 Exhibit DD, #5 Exhibit EE, #6 Exhibit FF, #7 Exhibit GG, #8 Exhibit HH, #9 Exhibit II)(Jagolinzer, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2016 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC re #2014 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N, #6 Exhibit O, #7 Exhibit P, #8 Exhibit Q, #9 Exhibit R, #10 Exhibit S, #11 Exhibit T, #12 Exhibit U, #13 Exhibit V, #14 Exhibit W, #15 Exhibit X, #16 Exhibit Y, #17 Exhibit Z)(Jagolinzer, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2015 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC re #2014 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Jagolinzer, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2014 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jagolinzer, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2013 Third MOTION to Dismiss by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Durant, Maria)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2011 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2010 Transcript of Status Conference held on February 26, 2018, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com Redaction Request due 3/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:15-cv-12376-DPW, 1:16-cv-11035-DPW, 1:18-cv-11224-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2012 Clerk's Notes for Status Conference held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: 18cv11224 (Hernandez/Gallardo) Plaintiff Rebecca Gallardo, Attorneys Bill Woolsey and Griesenbeck not present in person or via phone. To date, plaintiff(s) have not retained counsel but filed a pro se response to the pending motions. Court GRANTS 28 motion to sever the medical malpractice claims and takes under advisement the 31 motion for summary judgment. 2) 15cv12376 (Kazos) Court addresses motion for summary judgment which is currently pending and no opposition has been filed. There being no objection from plaintiffs counsel (Burgin), summary judgment to be entered for the defendants. 3) 16cv11035 (Louisiana AG) Attorney Scalia, representing BC/BS (on phone) will submit by 3/1/2019, his clients specific position on whether severance is appropriate and if additional briefing or if a further hearing is necessary. 3) Kentucky cases Reported as almost complete through settlement. 4) 14cv12384 (Mississippi cases) - Motion to reconsider was denied. Experts to be designated by 3/8/2019. Counsel to notify this Court if there are any cross designation of experts. 5) 18cv12231 (MSP Recovery) Court await the filings to be submitted by 3/11/2019. 6) Court briefly addresses the status of this litigation and remaining cases with attorneys. 7) Michael Hugo cases Attorney Gotz reported 15cv12847 (Brooks) and 15cv12849 (Weathers) have accepted the settlement, but 15cv12848 (Dorn) has not accepted the settlement and is looking into hiring a lawyer. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Durant, Castle, Bennett. ON PHONE - Bergin, Gotz, Scalia, Hawthorne, Miles, Block) (Beatty, Barbara)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2009 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2008 Transcript of Status Conference held on February 7, 2019, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com Redaction Request due 3/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:18-cv-11224-DPW, 1:18-cv-12231-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, (1707) Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicative Filing (docketed as a motion in MDL 13cv2428). Stipulation to be filed in Individual case docket #13cv11721. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:13-cv-11721-DPW(Beatty, Barbara)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2006 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL Concerning Pending Motions for Summary Judgment by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2005 Clerk's Notes for Status Conference held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: 18cv11224 - Plaintiff Rebecca Gallardo, Attorneys Woolsey and Griesenbeck participating by phone. Court inclined to allow severance and remand. Plaintiff still appearing pro se and states an attorney is in the process of reviewing the case. Court ORDERS a response/opposition to the Motion to Sever and Remand 28 and the Motion for Summary Judgment 31 to be filed no later than 2/14/2019. If no opposition is filed to the Motion to Sever and Remand 28 , the Court will allow the motion and remand the applicable claims to Southern District of Texas. 2) 18cv12231 Court addresses the Defendants Motion to Dismiss #21 . Plaintiffs need to identify with specificity the individuals and causes of action in an amended complaint. Amended complaint to be filed no later than 3/11/2019. Defendants Motion to Dismiss #21 DENIED without prejudice, subject to the filing of the amended complaint. The statute of limitation issue will also need to be addressed. Motion to Leave to File Reply Brief #27 MOOT in light of the denial of the motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs counsel to file Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and obtain local counsel. Filing fee for pro hac vice motion is WAIVED per CMO#7. 3) Kentucky and Louisiana cases New trial date of 3/18/2019. Mediation continued to 2/20/2019. Counsel will provide a further update at the status hearing on 2/26/2019 at 3:30 p.m. 4) Alabama cases- Cases continuing in the discovery phase. 5) Mississippi case Status conference scheduled for 2/15/2019. No trial date set. 6) California case JPML hearing scheduled for 3/28/2019 on the petition for transfer. 7) This Courts rulings on Learned Intermediary (summary judgment motion) could have an impact on the pending Louisiana cases. Attorney Castle to make further submission by 2/11/2019. 8) Miscellaneous matters Counsel provides update on Hugo cases (15cv12848, 15cv12847, 15cv12849), and the status of the remaining cases and filings of the Stipulations of Dismissal. 9) Further status hearing scheduled for 2/26/2019 at 3:30 p.m. CALL IN INSTRUCTIONS FOR COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY PHONE: Call USA Toll-Free: 888-675-2535 using Access Code: 9326241. Once the call is made and access code is given, the system will ask if the call is the host. Please bypass this part, as your call is being placed as a participant. The Court is the host. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Counsel present Fernandez, Durant, Castle. Counsel on phone Griesenbeck, Bill Woolsey, Hawthorne, Miles, Block, Gotz. Pro se on phone Gallardo Hernandez)) (Beatty, Barbara)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2004 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:18-cv-11224-DPW, 1:18-cv-12231-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2003 Transcript of Status Conference held on December 20, 2018, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net Redaction Request due 1/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:18-cv-11224-DPW, 1:18-cv-12231-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2002 Clerk's Notes for Status Conference held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: 1) 18cv11224 Plaintiff Rebecca Gallardo, Attorneys Bill Woolsey and Griesenbeck participating by phone. To date, plaintiff(s) have not retained counsel. Defendants counsel will file a motion to sever the medical malpractice claims no later than 1/10/2019. Fresenius defendants to file motion for summary judgment no later than 1/24/2019. Further status conference scheduled for 2/7/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Participants may phone in for the conference. 2) 18cv12231 Plaintiffs counsel not present in person or on phone. Court will issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Hearing on Order to Show Cause scheduled for 2/7/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Defendants to file motion to dismiss no later than 1/10/2019. Hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 2/26/2019 at 3:30 p.m. Motions pro hac vice #6 and #16 GRANTED. 3) RE: Michael Hugo cases 15cv12848, 15cv12847,15cv12849- Attorney Barton participates by phone. Counsel has been in contact with these plaintiffs and continue to work toward a resolution. 4) Counsel updates the Court on the statuses of cases in other jurisdictions. (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: Gotz, Helinski, Bennett, Durant, Castle ON PHONE: Woolsey, Barton, Griesenbeck, Gallardo (pro se)) (Beatty, Barbara)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2001 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 21 (DEEMING SETTLEMENT-RELATED STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL TO BE NOTICES OF APPEARANCE RE #2000 . (Beatty, Barbara)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2000 Joint MOTION for Order by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Case Management Order Deeming Settlement-Related Stipulations of Dismissal as Notices of Appearance)(Durant, Maria) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2018) (Beatty, Barbara).
November 21, 2018 Filing 1999 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1998 Transcript of Status Conference held on October 31, 2018, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 12/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1997 Clerk's Notes for Status Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Court addresses cases involving former attorney Michael Hugo with counsel. Defendants to file motions to reopen and set aside stipulations of dismissals as appropriate in four cases (Dorn, Brooks, Weathers, Rardin). Further evaluation of Stipulations of Dismissal, already on file and ones to be filed, conducted by defendants counsel and, as necessary, will undertake appropriate action to rectify any discrepancies. Court willing to accept Notices of Appearance nunc pro tunc to clarify the appropriate parties for executed Stipulations of Dismissal. Counsel provides updates on the status of case(s) in Mississippi, California and Louisiana. Court to sschedule conferences in two cases transferred into the MDL this year, 18cv11224 and 18cv12231. Defendants counsel to report back to the Court with possible conference dates by 11/9/2018. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Barton and Diab on phone, Gotz, Durant, Kettlewell) (Beatty, Barbara)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1996 NOTICE by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. re #1995 MDL Transfer Order - In, (FMCNAS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTATION OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1)(Hodge, Leigh Anne)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1995 Conditional Transfer order number CTO - 108 in MDL 2428 dated 10/25/2018 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1994 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Hearing regarding cases involving Attorney Michael Hugo is SCHEDULED for 10/31/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1993 PROCEDURAL ORDER (adminn, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 1992 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2428 dated 6/6/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) Modified on 6/6/2018 (Jones, Sherry).
June 5, 2018 Filing 1991 SPECIAL MASTER STATUS REPORT (adminn, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 1990 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 20 PROCEDURAL ORDER FOR APPEALS OF THE SETTLEMENT AWARD DETERMINATIONS (adminn, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 1988 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING AWARD AND ALLOCATION OF COMMON BENEFIT FEES re [ECF #1982-1985]. (Beatty, Barbara)
January 31, 2018 Filing 1987 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Megan J. McKenzie (McKenzie, Megan)
January 30, 2018 Filing 1989 Clerk Noted for Status Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Stay remains in place until Court issues Memorandum and Order on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment, James Gotz provides court with an update on the settlement claims process and appeals. If necessary, appeals will be submitted to Judge Woodlock at the end of May. Defendants will withdraw their Bill of Costs in the Dial case (14cv11101). Plaintiffs Motion for Rule 60 Relief from Order of Dismissal #1888 is Withdrawn as MOOT. Parties to file an Assented to Motion to Dismiss product liability counts vs Fresenius in the Garcia case [17cv12105], and thereafter, the case will be ripe for remand to state court in New Mexico. No opposition having been heard, the Court will issue an Order on the Plaintiff Leaderships Petition for Award and Allocation of Common Benefit Fees #1982 . No further hearing necessary to be set at this time. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (Beatty, Barbara)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1985 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Order re: Plaintiff Leadership's Petition for Award and Allocation of Common Benefit Fees. (Gotz, James)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1984 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1982 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Philip A. Garrett, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gotz, James)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1983 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Brief in Support of Plaintiff Leadership's Petition for Award and Allocation of Common Benefit Fees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gotz, James)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1982 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Plaintiff Leadership's Petition for Award and Allocation of Common Benefit Fees. (Gotz, James)
November 29, 2017 Filing 1981 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 29, 2017 Filing 1980 Transcript of Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on November 21, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 12/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 21, 2017 Filing 1986 Clerk's Notes for Hearing on outstanding matters and pending motions held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Defendants to file opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Sever and Remand to State Court [ECF #13] in 17cv12105 and further address the issue of remand to state court for claims as to which this Court allegedly lacks jurisdiction by 11/30/2017. Replies to the opposition shall be filed by 12/11/2017. Defendants counsel states there is a possibility that approximately 20 cases may be transferred from the State of California. PEC to develop protocol to handle appeals of settlement determinations and file a motion re common benefit fees by mid-December. Court hears argument on the pending Motions for Summary Judgement #1906 #1913 #1923 #1933 and takes the motions under advisement. Discovery stayed pending the Courts rulings on the motions for summary judgment. Further hearing scheduled for 1/30/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (Beatty, Barbara)
November 16, 2017 Filing 1979 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered, granting #1977 PEC Motion for Qualified Protective Order Concerning Production of Certain Information Maintained by Government Third Party Payors for Global Settlement Lien Resolution Administration. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 2, 2017 Filing 1978 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER REGARDING THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS' EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COMMON BENEFIT EXPENSES re #1949 . (Beatty, Barbara)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1977 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Production of Certain Information Maintained by Government Third-Party Payors for Global Settlement Lien Resolution Administration by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Qualified Protective Order)(Gotz, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1970 REPLY to Response to #1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis, #1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels, #1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte, #1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine (Reply to Plaintiff Riben's Statement of Facts filed at Doc. 1956-2) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (under seal))(Bennett, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1969 REPLY to Response to #1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis, #1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels, #1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte, #1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine (reply to plaintiff Riben's response filed at Doc. 1956) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1968 REPLY to Response to #1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine (reply to plaintiffs' response filed at Doc. 1954) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1967 REPLY to Response to #1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis (reply to plaintiffs' response filed at Doc. 1952) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Graham))(Bennett, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1966 REPLY to Response to #1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels (reply to plaintiffs' response filed at Doc. 1955) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1965 REPLY to Response to #1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte (reply to plaintiffs' response filed at Doc. 1953) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1964 Conditional Transfer order number 106 in MDL 2428 dated 10/26/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1963 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1962 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1962 MOTION for Leave to File under Seal (summary judgment replies and related materials) by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
October 19, 2017 Filing 1957 NOTICE by Mervyn Boyd, Charles Cameron, Daniel Carter, Joyce Marie Clark, Kathy Dennis, Gloria Cothern Dunaway, Janice McGhee, Michael McNulty, Kimberly Ross, Sophia Walker, Beulah Williams re #1956 Response to Motion,,, NOTICE OF JOINDER (Watt, Dunbar)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1956 RESPONSE to Motion re #1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis, #1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels, #1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte, #1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine filed by Max Riben. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Molly A. Booker, #2 Affidavit Statement of Undisputed Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Omnibus Response to FMCNAs Motions for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Booker, Molly)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1955 Opposition re #1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels Redacted filed by Mervyn Boyd, Daniel Carter, Joyce Marie Clark, Gloria Cothern Dunaway, Janice McGhee, Michael McNulty, Kimberly Ross, Beulah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted, #2 Exhibit Redacted, #3 Exhibit Redacted, #4 Exhibit Redacted, #5 Exhibit Redacted, #6 Exhibit Redacted, #7 Exhibit Redacted Death Certificate, #8 Affidavit)(Watt, Dunbar)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1954 Opposition re #1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine Redacted filed by Mervyn Boyd, Charles Cameron, Daniel Carter, Joyce Marie Clark, Kathy Dennis, Gloria Cothern Dunaway, Janice McGhee, Michael McNulty, Kimberly Ross, Sophia Walker, Beulah Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted, #2 Exhibit Redacted, #3 Exhibit Redacted, #4 Exhibit Redacted, #5 Exhibit Redacted, #6 Exhibit Redacted, #7 Exhibit Redacted, #8 Exhibit Redacted, #9 Affidavit)(Watt, Dunbar)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1953 Opposition re #1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte Redacted filed by Charles Cameron, Daniel Carter, Sophia Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted, #2 Exhibit Redacted, #3 Exhibit Redacted, #4 Exhibit Redacted, #5 Exhibit Redacted, #6 Exhibit Redacted, #7 Exhibit Redacted, #8 Affidavit)(Watt, Dunbar)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1952 Opposition re #1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis REDACTED filed by Mervyn Boyd, Daniel Carter, Joyce Marie Clark, Kathy Dennis, Gloria Cothern Dunaway, Janice McGhee, Michael McNulty, Kimberly Ross, Sophia Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted, #2 Exhibit Redacted, #3 Exhibit Redacted, #4 Exhibit Redacted, #5 Exhibit Redacted, #6 Exhibit Redacted, #7 Exhibit Redacted, #8 Exhibit Affidavit)(Watt, Dunbar)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1951 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Order re: PEC Motion for Reimbursement of Common Benefit Expenses. (Gotz, James)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1950 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1949 MOTION for Order to Reimburse from the Granuflo Common Benefit Account of Capital Assessment Contributions and Held Expenses filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip A. Garrett, #2 Exhibit 1 to Garrett Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 to Garrett Affidavit, #4 Affidavit of Anthony Tarricone, #5 Affidavit of Robert Jenner)(Gotz, James)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1949 MOTION for Order to Reimburse from the Granuflo Common Benefit Account of Capital Assessment Contributions and Held Expenses by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Gotz, James)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1948 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kathleen Palmaccio. (Tabatabaie, Tara)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1947 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Geraldine Dillingham. (Tabatabaie, Tara)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1946 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Carlotta Jerry. (Tabatabaie, Tara)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1945 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alex Kazos.(Sill, Matthew)
October 6, 2017 Filing 1944 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER denying #1938 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Responses/oppositions to the motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on 10/16/2017. Any reply briefs by the Defendants' shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on 10/26/2017. The Hearing on the Motions for Summary Judgment is hereby RESCHEDULED from 10/25/2017 to 11/21/2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Beatty, Barbara)
October 4, 2017 Filing 1943 OPPOSITION to #1938 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/14/17 to File Response/Reply to FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by FMCNA. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
October 2, 2017 Filing 1942 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 2, 2017 Filing 1941 Transcript of Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on August 30, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 10/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 2, 2017 Filing 1940 AFFIDAVIT of James D. Gotz re #1938 Notice (Other), In Response to Motion for Extension of Time by James D. Gotz. (Gotz, James)
September 28, 2017 Filing 1939 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER: On September 27, 2017, Dowdy Cockerham & Watt filed a Motion for Extension of Time seeking an extension of the October 16th deadline to file oppositions to the pending motions for summary judgment. In order for the Court to address the issue in a timely manner, any opposition to this Motion shall be filed no later than October 4, 2017. In addition, Attorney James Gotz shall file an affidavit in response to the paragraphs of the Motion addressing the actions of the PEC, no later than October 4, 2017. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1938 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/14/17 to File Response/Reply to FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by: Mervyn Boyd 13-cv-11717; Charles Cameron 13-cv-12446; Daniel Carter 13-cv-12459; Joyce Marie Clark 13-cv-12460; Kathy Dennis 13-cv-12467; Gloria Cothern Dunaway 13-cv-11714; Janice McGhee 13-cv-13172; Michael McNulty 13-cv-12403; Kimberly Ross 13-cv-12478; Sophia Walker 13-cv-12487; and Beulah Williams 13-cv-12486. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 15, 2017 Filing 1935 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries Not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 - 56)(Bennett, James) Modified to add defendants on 9/15/2017 (Beatty, Barbara).
September 15, 2017 Filing 1934 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis Memorandum in Support of FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries Not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
September 15, 2017 Filing 1933 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Involving Non-Arrhythmia Events or Injuries not Proximate in Time to the Last Dialysis by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
September 15, 2017 Filing 1932 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #1931 FMCNA'S Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 14, 2017 Filing 1931 MOTION for Leave to File FMCNA's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
September 11, 2017 Filing 1927 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 19 REGARDING POST-LONE PINE LEADERSHIP RESPONSIBILITIES OF THE PLAINTIFFS' EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 11, 2017 Filing 1926 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 18 PERMITTING SETTLING CASES TO SUBSTITUTE NAMED PLAINTIFF IN SETTLEMENT-RELATED STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 8, 2017 Filing 1925 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33-81)(Bennett, James) Modified to edit docket text and party selection on 9/12/2017 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
September 8, 2017 Filing 1924 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine Memorandum in Support of FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
September 8, 2017 Filing 1923 MOTION for Summary Judgment FMCNA's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs that are Barred by the Learned Intermediary Doctrine by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James) Modified to edit docket text and party selection on 9/12/2017 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
September 8, 2017 Filing 1922 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #1921 FMCNAS Amended Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 8, 2017 Filing 1921 MOTION for Leave to File FMCNA's Amended Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
September 8, 2017 Filing 1920 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1919 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 7, 2017 Filing 1919 MOTION for Leave to File FMCNA's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
August 30, 2017 Filing 1930 Status conference and motion hearing held. Defendants to file two additional motions for summary judgment. Motion for summary judgment re learned intermediary to be filed no later than 9/8/2017; Plaintiffs' Opposition to be filed no later than 10/16/2017; and, Defendants reply brief to be filed no later than 10/20/2017. Motion for summary judgment re specific/general causation to be filed by 9/15/2017; Plaintiffs' Opposition to be filed no later than 10/16/2017; and, Defendants reply brief to be filed no later than 10/20/2017. Hearing on motions for summary judgment scheduled for 10/25/2017 at 2:30 p.m. Decision re Louisiana sovereign case anticipated to be issued before 10/25 hearing. Court adopts proposed discovery and trial schedule and sets the following deadlines: Fact discovery to be completed by 2/27/2018; Depositions of case specific experts to be completed by 5/12/2018; Daubert motions and other pretrial motions to be filed by 6/2/2018; and, trials to begin 7/17/2018. Scheduled to be revisited by the Court at the 10/25/17 hearing. Proposed Orders to be modified and entered re ECF #1896 PECs Motion to Revise CMO 1 and ECF#1902 Motion re Substitution of Named Plaintiff in Settlement Cases. Defense counsel advises of possibility of approx. 25 cases being transferred to this jurisdiction from California pursuant to the Bristol Myers. Plaintiff to file Motion for Stay the First Circuit case in Dial (14cv11101) by the end of the week then Defendants will withdraw the Bill of Costs currently pending. Motion to Dismiss in Hearn (14cv14404) ALLOWED, Judgment of Dismissal to enter. PEC to file a motion re Common Benefit Expenses. Parties to file a report on the status of the settlement cases by the end of September. Court allows ECF #83 Motion to Withdraw the Motion for Summary Judgment in the Burkes case (14cv10712). Motion (ECF #49) to Amend Short Form Complaint in Zachery (14cv13150) MOOT in light of Notice of Dismissal which will be revised and refiled.(Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (Beatty, Barbara) Modified on 9/12/2017 (Beatty, Barbara).
August 28, 2017 Filing 1916 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: Joint Suggested Hearing Agenda. (Durant, Maria)
August 28, 2017 Filing 1915 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 thru 52)(Bennett, James)
August 28, 2017 Filing 1914 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
August 28, 2017 Filing 1913 MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Claims of Opt-Out Cases Lacking Evidence of Elevated Serum Bicarbonate Levels by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
August 28, 2017 Filing 1912 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1911 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1911 MOTION for Leave to File FMCNA's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
August 23, 2017 Filing 1908 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28 thru 60)(Bennett, James)
August 23, 2017 Filing 1907 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
August 23, 2017 Filing 1906 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Claims of Opt-Out Plaintiffs Involving Naturalyte by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc..(Bennett, James)
August 22, 2017 Filing 1905 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #1904 FMCNA'S Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Beatty, Barbara)
August 22, 2017 Filing 1904 MOTION for Leave to File FMCNA's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James) (Main Document 1904 replaced on 8/22/2017) (Gioia, AnaMaria).
August 11, 2017 Filing 1903 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1902 Assented to MOTION for Order to ALLOW SETTLING CASES TO SUBSTITUTE NAMED PLAINTIFF IN SETTLEMENT-RELATED STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE . (Gotz, James)
August 11, 2017 Filing 1902 Assented to MOTION for Order to ALLOW SETTLING CASES TO SUBSTITUTE NAMED PLAINTIFF IN SETTLEMENT-RELATED STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gotz, James)
August 2, 2017 Filing 1901 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kevin C. Newsom (Newsom, Kevin)
July 31, 2017 Filing 1900 RESPONSE to Motion re #1899 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2017 to to file a Response to FMCNA's Census Report and Proposed Discovery/Trial Schedule for Surviving Cases Opting Out of Global Settlement filed by Lola Marie Hearn, Anticipated Personal Representative of the Estate of Lola Mae McBride, Max Riben. (Booker, Molly)
July 24, 2017 Filing 1899 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2017 to to file a Response to FMCNA's Census Report and Proposed Discovery/Trial Schedule for Surviving Cases Opting Out of Global Settlement by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP.(Booker, Molly)
July 10, 2017 Filing 1898 Recommendations for Scheduling Order for Surviving Cases Opting Out of Global Settlement and Census Report. (Durant, Maria)
July 7, 2017 Filing 1897 AFFIDAVIT of James D. Gotz, Esq. re #1880 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit in Response to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion to Extend Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine CMO and Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Gotz, James)
July 7, 2017 Filing 1896 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Order on PEC's Motion to Revise CMO 1 re: Post-Lone Pine Leadership Responsibilities (Relates to Doc. No. 1889). (Gotz, James)
June 26, 2017 Filing 1895 Clerk's Notes for Motion Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Hagens Berman to identify the legal issues in the Dial appeal by 7/10/2017. Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment #62 in 14cv10712 (Burkes) scheduled for 8/30/2017 at 2:30 p.m. Defendants to file a list of opt out cases that are subject to remand and a schedule for remaining discovery that would be necessary in the opt out cases by 7/10/2017; plaintiff to respond by 7/24/2017. Court DENIES without prejudice #1889 PEC's Motion to Revise CMO1 re Post Lone Pine Leadership, subject to renewal providing proposed language and/or modification of the CMO1. If motion is resubmitted, Court will address at the 8/30/2017 hearing. Counsel for Beverly Hansberry unavailable today to discuss #35 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Court will conduct phone conference tomorrow to discuss the motion by phone. Court GRANTS #75 Assented to Motion for Relief from Judgment in 13cv11144 (Patton). Court addresses the duplicative actions, 13cv10596 and 13cv11996 (Dennison), and Orders Hagens Berman to file its position on the duplicative actions no later than 7/10/2017. Court ORDERS the PEC to file a supplemental affidavit addressing the three additional plaintiffs (Roy, Weaver, Steinkircher) and the chronology of the extensions given for plaintiffs to opt in to the settlement. Court GRANTS #1856 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion to Extend Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine Order, to the extent that plaintiffs shall determine no later than 7/28/2017, whether to opt in to the settlement or comply with the Lone Pine Order. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:13-cv-10596-DPW, 1:13-cv-11996-DPW, 1:14-cv-10712-DPW, 1:14-cv-12871-DPW(Beatty, Barbara)
June 19, 2017 Filing 1893 NOTICE by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. Defendants' List of Potential Summary Judgment Motions for Remaining Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durant, Maria)
June 16, 2017 Filing 1892 RESPONSE to Motion re #1889 MOTION to Amend CMO No. 1 RE: Lone Pine Leadership Responsibilities filed by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. (Booker, Molly)
June 15, 2017 Filing 1891 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC PROCEDURAL ORDER - In light of the Defendant FMCNA's Second Omnibus Motion (ECF# 1890) to Dismiss following the failure of the plaintiffs in the 33 cases identified therein to properly comply with Case Management Order No.17 (ECF# 1825), the Clerk is directed to enter a Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice on July 6, 2017, in each such case in the absence of further order of this court for good cause shown. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
June 14, 2017 Filing 1890 Second MOTION to Dismiss by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Durant, Maria)
June 7, 2017 Filing 1889 MOTION to Amend CMO No. 1 RE: Lone Pine Leadership Responsibilities by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.(Tarricone, Anthony)
June 1, 2017 Filing 1888 MOTION for Reconsideration re 1863 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 60 Relief from Order of Dismissal by David Roy, Brian Steinkirchner, Jerry Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Booker, Molly)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1887 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Christopher Gilreath on behalf of Earnest Bernard Jett (Gilreath, R.)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1886 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Bonner on behalf of Evelyn Windham (Bonner, Zachary)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1885 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 1182, 1883, and 1884 were erroneously filed in the main MDL case. Please see individual docket #14-cv-10712-DPW Burkes v. Fresenius. Counsel is reminded not to file motions pertaining to individual cases in the main MDL docket. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1884 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 1882 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Sylvester Burkes filed by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 15, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 20)(Bennett, James)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1883 MEMORANDUM in Support re 1882 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Sylvester Burkes filed by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Dial Signed Verdict Form)(Bennett, James)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1882 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Sylvester Burkes by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Bennett, James)
May 15, 2017 Filing 1880 AFFIDAVIT of James D. Gotz In Response to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion to Extend Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Compel by James D. Gotz. (Gotz, James)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1879 NOTICE of Appearance by William Monroe Quin, II on behalf of Evelyn Windham (Quin, William)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1878 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Paikoff on behalf of Sunny Jefferson, Christopher Parich, Lari Parich (Paikoff, Lawrence)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1877 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1875 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Affidavit in Response to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1876 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Stewart on behalf of Delores Blanchard, personal rep of the Estate of Tawana Blanchard, dec. (Stewart, David)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1875 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Affidavit in Response to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion by James D. Gotz.(Gotz, James)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1874 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #1873 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Joint Submission on Communications Regarding Requests for Medical Record Information and Motion for One Day Extension of Time. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1873 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Joint Submission on Communications Regarding Requests for Medical Record Information and Motion for One Day Extension of Time by Frank Ford, Nella Greco, Lola Hearn, Dorothy Johnson, Heather Moore-Brandon, Angelita Nelson, Billy Peters, Jerry Pittock, Beth Politi, Torrance Robins, Barbara Sanders, Alvin Sexton, Lisa Silvas, Regina Washington.(Booker, Molly)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1872 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Walker, Jr on behalf of Mattie Crain Lee, Constance Lee Smith (Walker, John)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1871 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sobieray on behalf of Delores Blanchard, personal rep of the Estate of Tawana Blanchard, dec. (Sobieray, Michael)
May 4, 2017 Filing 1869 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #1868 Plaintiffs' Motion for Three Day Extension of Time to File Joint Submission Regarding Records Requests and Production Spreadsheet, with the exception of the three additions to Exhibit A (15cv11269, 15cv11301, 13cv12307) as to which the plaintiffs must show good cause for their belated inclusion. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 3, 2017 Filing 1868 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 10, 2017 to File Joint Submission by Frank Ford, Nella Greco, Lola Hearn, Dorothy Johnson, Heather Moore-Brandon, Angelita Nelson, Billy Peters, Jerry Pittock, Beth Politi, Torrance Robins, David Roy, Barbara Sanders, Alvin Sexton, Lisa Silvas, Brian Steinkirchner, Regina Washington, Jerry Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Booker, Molly)
May 3, 2017 Filing 1867 Remark: Document entry #1866 was refiled by the Clerk's office into its appropriate individual case number. Please see case #13-cv-11996-DPW, Dennison v. Fresenius. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
May 2, 2017 Filing 1866 RESPONSE to Motion re #1862 MOTION to Dismiss "Defendant FMCNA's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss" filed by Laine Dennison. (Booker, Molly)
April 25, 2017 Filing 1865 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 25, 2017 Filing 1864 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on April 19, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 5/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 19, 2017 Filing 1870 Clerk's Notes for Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock re #1856 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File A Motion to Compel. Court requests counsel to file joint spreadsheet identifying all relevant communications involving requests made by the plaintiffs and Mr Goetz to submit an Affidavit re the process for making such requests by 5/5/2017. Plaintiff to file motion to stay further trials pending the appeal in Dial by 5/19/2017; opposition/response to be filed no later than 6/2/2017 in addition to filing a proposed schedule for further proceedings. Plaintiffs to file a reply no later than 6/16/2017. Hearing set for 6/26/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Booker (phone), Durant, Goetz) (Beatty, Barbara)
April 12, 2017 Filing 1863 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC PROCEDURAL ORDER - In light of the Defendant's Omnibus Motion (ECF#1862) to Dismiss following the failure of the plaintiffs in the 631 cases identified therein to properly comply with Case Management Order No.17 (ECF#1825), the Clerk is directed to enter a Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice on May 3, 2017, in each such case in the absence of further order of this court for good cause shown. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
April 11, 2017 Filing 1862 MOTION to Dismiss "Defendant FMCNA's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss" by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Durant, Maria)
April 11, 2017 Filing 1861 MOTION to Dismiss by H. Van Z Lawrence, as personal representative of the Estate of Alicia Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flanigan, Michael)
April 11, 2017 Filing 1860 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: Hearing on #1856 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File A Motion to Compel rescheduled until for 4/19/2017 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
April 7, 2017 Filing 1859 Opposition re #1856 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File A Motion to Compel filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1858 NOTICE OF HEARING: Hearing on Motion #1856 for Extension of Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File A Motion to Compel scheduled for 4/11/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1856 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File A Motion to Compel by Frank Ford, Nella Greco, Lola Hearn, Dorothy Johnson, Heather Moore-Brandon, Angelita Nelson, Billy Peters, Jerry Pittock, Beth Politi, Torrance Robins, Barbara Sanders, Alvin Sexton, Lisa Silvas, Regina Washington, shirley mccloud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - DECLARATION OF MOLLY A. BOOKER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLY WITH LONE PINE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER)(Carey, Robert)
March 29, 2017 Filing 1857 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #1846 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Extend Time to Comply with the Lone Pine Case Management Order. Plaintiffs shall file its Consolidated Motion no later than 3:00 p.m. on 4/3/2017. Defendant shall respond no later 3:00 p.m. on 4/7/2017. A Hearing is scheduled for 4/11/2017 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel may participate by phone. (Beatty, Barbara)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1846 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion to Extend Time to Comply with the Lone Pine Case Management Order by Frank Ford, Nella Greco, Lola Hearn, Dorothy Johnson, Heather Moore-Brandon, Angelita Nelson, Billy Peters, Jerry Pittock, Beth Politi, Torrance Robins, Barbara Sanders, Alvin Sexton, Lisa Silvas, Regina Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carey, Robert)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1845 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Roberto Alicea, Guy Benoit, Michael Buckley, Aidelina Camacho, Minnie Chesney, Willa Craig, Rosemary Davis, David Dixon, Barbara Ellison, Yolanda Endres, Randy Evans, Teresa Evans, Tonya Peyatte Ferguson, Cherry Gallon, Charlotte Guffey, Maria Guzman, Denise Hampton, Deloris Jackson, Valerie Jones, Nicola Jordan, Keisha Joseph, Brandon Keffer, Julianne Knapp, Pamela Manning, Dorothy Mason, Doris McCullom, David Mineo, Fannie Mitchell, Kathy Munsey, Tina Nunn, Juanita Olivas, Madison M. Peyatte, Jr., Gregory Pierce, Dona Ronzone, Norma Jean Smallwood, Debbie Sprouse, Rosa Vasquez, Consuella Williams, Lashane Williams, Trina Williams, Christina Wilmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wilson, Joshua)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1844 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 17 (LONE PINE ORDER. Issued in all Associated Cases.(Beatty, Barbara)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1843 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1842 Transcript of Day Fourteen of Jury Trial held on March 3, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1841 Transcript of Day Thirteen of Jury Trial held on March 2, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1840 Transcript of Day Twelve of Jury Trial held on March 1, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1839 Transcript of Day Eleven of Jury Trial held on February 28, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom, Kelly Mortellite and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1838 Transcript of Day Ten of Jury Trial held on February 27, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1837 SEALED Transcript of Day Nine of Jury Trial held on February 24, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1836 REDACTED Transcript of Day Nine of Jury Trial held on February 24, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahstrom and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1835 Transcript of Day Eight of Jury Trial held on February 23, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1834 Transcript of Day Seven of Jury Trial held on February 22, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahsltrom and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1833 Transcript of Day Six of Jury Trial held on February 21, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1832 Transcript of Day Five of Jury Trial held on February 16, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom, Kelly Mortellite and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1831 Transcript of Day Four of Jury Trial held on February 15, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1830 Transcript of Day Three of Jury Trial held on February 14, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1829 Transcript of Day Two of Jury Trial held on February 10, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom, Kelly Mortellite and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
March 8, 2017 Filing 1828 EXCERPT Transcript of Day One of Jury Trial (after Jury Selection, including Opening Statements) held on February 8, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 16, 2017 Filing 1827 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 16, 2017 Filing 1826 Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on February 6, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah) (Scalfani, Deborah).
January 26, 2017 Filing 1825 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 17 (LONE PINE ORDER). Issued in All Associated Cases. (Beatty, Barbara)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1824 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1823 Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on January 19, 2017, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 2/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
January 9, 2017 Filing 1821 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Sam Macaluso. (Kassan, Randi)
January 9, 2017 Filing 1820 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sam Macaluso (Kassan, Randi)
January 6, 2017 Filing 1819 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
January 6, 2017 Filing 1818 Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on September 19, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 1/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 23, 2016 Filing 1817 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: PEC and Fresenius Defendants' Joint Motion for Further Extension of Settlement Program's Opt-In and Voiding Deadlines #1813 ALLOWED and adopted as follows: January 13, 2017 - Date by which plaintiffs may opt in to the settlement program; January 18, 2017 - Date by which all opt in data and documents will be supplied to Fresenius; May 10, 2017 - Date by which Fresenius may elect to void pursuant to the terms of the MSA; and, May 17, 2017 - Date by which Fresenius shall fund the settlement if not voided.(Beatty, Barbara)
December 23, 2016 Filing 1816 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Defendant FMCNA's motion for entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order #1797 ALLOWED in principle requiring submissions under oath on or before March 29, 2017 by plaintiff's counsel, who must attest to use of defendant's product prior to the patient's alleged injury, and by a qualified medical expert, who most explain any opinion testimony regarding specific causation of plaintiff's alleged injury by defendant's product. A more detailed Case Management Order will issue following the holidays, outlining the specific obligations of plaintiff's counsel and the medical expert(s) in this regard. (Beatty, Barbara)
December 22, 2016 Filing 1815 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 22, 2016 Filing 1814 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 14, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 1/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
December 20, 2016 Filing 1813 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Settlement Program's Opt-in and Voiding Deadline by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.(Ferraro, Julie)
December 14, 2016 Filing 1812 Clerk's Notes for Hearing held re #1797 Defendant FMCNA'S Motion for Entry of Lone Pine Case Management. Court hears argument for an allowance of a Lone Pine Order and discussion for the appropriate time frame. Further submissions to be filed by 12/20/2016.(Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (Beatty, Barbara)
December 8, 2016 Filing 1811 REPLY to Response to #1797 MOTION for Order filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
December 7, 2016 Filing 1810 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1809 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara)
December 7, 2016 Filing 1809 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Durant, Maria)
December 7, 2016 Filing 1808 NOTICE OF HEARING: Hearing on #1797 Defendant FMCNA's Motion for Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order set for 12/14/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
December 6, 2016 Filing 1807 RESPONSE to Motion re #1797 MOTION for Order filed by James Dean, Deborah Moman, Alan Waterstreet. (Ekonen, Mark)
December 5, 2016 Filing 1806 EXHIBIT re #1804 Opposition to Motion for Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. (Carey, Robert)
December 2, 2016 Filing 1805 Opposition re #1797 MOTION for Order filed by Sherman George, Jessie Hallums, Sorita Harris, Mahalie White, Angelos Zachery. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
December 2, 2016 Filing 1804 Opposition re #1797 MOTION for Order filed by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. (Carey, Robert)
December 2, 2016 Filing 1803 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1797 MOTION for Order filed by Brian Adams. (Watt, Dunbar)
December 2, 2016 Filing 1802 Opposition re #1797 MOTION for Order filed by Melissa Adler. (Balefsky, Lee)
December 1, 2016 Filing 1801 Opposition re #1797 MOTION for Order of Lone Pine Case Management Order filed by Geraldine Dillingham, Charles Ervin, Carlotta Jerry, Alex Kazos, Kathleen Palmaccio, Shirley Quick, Sharon Randall, Tamika Smith, Clarence Swanigan. (Tabatabaie, Tara)
December 1, 2016 Filing 1800 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1796 Motion for Further Extension of Settlement Programs Opt-in Deadline to December 30, 2016. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
November 22, 2016 Filing 1799 Remark: The notice of withdrawal of appearance referenced as document entry no. #1793 on the main mdl docket has been moved into individual case no. 1:15-cv-11363 Estate of Katherine Herron v. Fresenius, reference as document entry no. 20. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:15-cv-11363-DPW(Gioia, AnaMaria)
November 22, 2016 Filing 1798 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Plaintiff Executive Committee PEC's Reservation of Rights and Statement Concerning FMCNA's Motion for Entry of Lone Pine Case Management Order by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Ferraro, Julie)
November 18, 2016 Filing 1797 MOTION for Order by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durant, Maria)
November 16, 2016 Filing 1796 Assented to MOTION for Further Extension of Settlement Programs Opt-in Deadline by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.(Ferraro, Julie)
November 8, 2016 Filing 1794 Conditional Transfer order number 105 in MDL 2428 dated 11/8/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
November 1, 2016 Filing 1793 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Darrell L. Cochran (Cochran, Darrell)
November 1, 2016 Filing 1792 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kelly Ludington. (Joven, Carol)
October 28, 2016 Filing 1791 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret E. Cordner on behalf of Roberta Cosby, Rosemary Holder, Thomas Majors, Phillip Mulkins, Marilyn Sybalski, Paul Sybalski (Cordner, Margaret)
October 26, 2016 Filing 1790 Conditional Transfer order number 104 in MDL 2428 dated 10/26/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 25, 2016 Filing 1789 Conditional Transfer order number 103 in MDL 2428 dated 10/21/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 22, 2016 Filing 1788 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered in case 1:12-cv-12022-DPW; granting (1780) Motion to establish Qualified Settlement Fund in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Woodlock, Douglas)
October 13, 2016 Filing 1787 Remark: Counsel are reminded that Stipulations of Dismissals should not be filed in the main MDL case. Stipulations of Dismissals are to be filed in the individual cases. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1786 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Velta Loredo. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1785 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Michael Hughes. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1784 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ella Cox. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1783 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Karen Green. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1782 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Patricia Gould. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1781 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Connie G Stott. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1780 MOTION Establish Qualified Settlement Fund and to Appoint QSF Administrator by Consolidated Plaintiffs, Anthony Tarricone. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferraro, Julie)
October 5, 2016 Filing 1779 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Victoria S. Walter. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 5, 2016 Filing 1778 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Bobby Thomas. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 4, 2016 Filing 1777 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by James Benton Jackson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 4, 2016 Filing 1776 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Marlene Harrison. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 4, 2016 Filing 1775 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Valerie Espinoza. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 4, 2016 Filing 1774 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lillie Harris. (Whitehead, Clarence)
September 27, 2016 Filing 1773 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Alice Cox. (Jones, Robert)
September 16, 2016 Filing 1772 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:16-cv-11035-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
September 16, 2016 Filing 1771 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 23, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 10/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:16-cv-11035-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1770 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1765 Motion for Modification; granting #1767 Motion for Extension of Time (Hohler, Daniel)
September 9, 2016 Filing 1769 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 14 [MODIFIED AS TO PARAGRAPHS 38 AND 47 ONLY}entered. (Woodlock, Douglas) Modified on 9/12/2016 (Hohler, Daniel). (Main Document 1769 replaced on 9/12/2016) (Hohler, Daniel).
August 25, 2016 Filing 1768 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order Re: Modifying CMO 14. (Tarricone, Anthony)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1767 MOTION for Extension of Time For Settlement Program Opt-In Deadline (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
August 23, 2016 Filing 1766 NOTICE of Appearance by David Scott Scalia on behalf of Louisiana Health Service and Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana (Scalia, David)
August 8, 2016 Filing 1765 MOTION to Modify CMO 14 Relating to the Percentage Holdback to be Paid into the Granuflo MDL 2428 Common Benefit Account by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
August 2, 2016 Filing 1764 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1722 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ronald L. Castle. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
June 28, 2016 Filing 1763 AFFIDAVIT of Eric Green filed pursuant to the Court's 6/21 Electronic Order by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Tarricone, Anthony)
June 27, 2016 Filing 1762 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM ANDORDER entered granting #1746 Motion to Appoint Eric D. Greene as Settlement Special Master (Woodlock, Douglas)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1761 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1760 Transcript of Status/Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on June 10, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 7/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 21, 2016 Filing 1759 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC PROCEDURAL ORDER entered in anticipation of the entry of a formal order appointing Professor Eric D. Green, Esq. as Settlement Special Master, in accordance with Federal Rule of Procedure 53(b), Professor Green shall file on or before July 1, 2016 an affidavit "disclosing whether there is any ground for disqualification under 28 U.S.C. sec. 455". If such a ground appears, the parties shall propose a schedule to undertake to secure approval of an appropriate waiver of the disqualification grounds. (Woodlock, Douglas)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1758 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. After consideration of the parties' positions, it is hereby ORDERED that the claims of the listed plaintiffs against the listed healthcare-provider defendants are SEVERED from the other claims in the identified cases and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW; Hawk (1:15-cv-10298); Bodnar (1:15-cv-10303); Disney (1:15-cv-12693); Prather (1:15-cv-12699); Ervin (1:15-cv-12720); Holt (1:15-cv-12792); Brown (1:15-cv-12794); Dillingham (1:15-cv-12796); and Jerry (1:15-cv-14121) (Gioia, AnaMaria)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1757 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. Plaintiffs in the Baldwin matter are severed and separate case numbers shall be assigned by the Clerk' s Office to each plaintiff. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:16-cv-10585-DPW(Gioia, AnaMaria)
June 17, 2016 Filing 1755 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order. (Newsom, Kevin)
June 17, 2016 Filing 1754 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
June 17, 2016 Filing 1753 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order Severing Plaintiffs. (Newsom, Kevin)
June 10, 2016 Filing 1756 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 6/10/2016. 1) Parties address Supplemental Motion to Appoint Professor Green as Special Master. Court indicates intention to formally appoint Professor Green as Special Master for settlement by an order. 2) Parties address the status of the reported settlement in principle. The Court is satisfied that the parties are moving with all necessary speed to resolve the outstanding issues regarding settlements, and allows the parties' request to move the opt-in or opt-out date to September 15, 2016. As a consequence of the change in the opt-in or opt-out date, parties propose, and Court agrees, to continue Bellwether trial of Lastorka (docket no: 13-cv-13066) until sometime after January 2017, and leave unchanged the Dial (docket no: 14-cv-11101) trial date of November 16, 2016. The Court will consider additional adjustments to the schedule in consultation with Judge Kirpalani. 3) Parties address the Oklahoma cases, listed on exhibit B of docket entry no. #1743 . Parties propose the plaintiffs consolidated in the Baldwin matter (docket no: 16-cv-10585) be severed. The Court allows and orders the severance of the Baldwin case. 4) The parties are to inform the Court whether they want an order and memorandum remanding the rest of the Oklahoma cases, or whether the parties file motions to dismiss without prejudice in each individual Oklahoma cases. The parties are directed to file their response by June 17, 2016. 5) Parties address the Louisiana sovereign case (docket no: 16-cv-11035). Defendants may file a supplemental memorandum as to the motion to remand (docket entry no. 4) of Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, at the same time it files its response to the Louisiana sovereign's motion to remand (docket entry no. 57). Such responses shall be due on July 11, and replies thereto by July 25. A Motion Hearing with respect to remand is scheduled for Tuesday, August 23, 2016, at 2:30 pm. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Multiple) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW; Lastorka (1:13-cv-13066); Dial (1:14-cv-11101); Hawk (1:15-cv-10298); Bodnar (1:15-cv-10303); Disney (1:15-cv-12693);Prather (1:15-cv-12699); Ervin (1:15-cv-12720); Holt (1:15-cv-12792); Brown (1:15-cv-12794); Dillingham (1:15-cv-12796); Jerry (1:15-cv-14121); Baldwin (1:16-cv-10585); Louisiana (1:16-cv-11035).(Gioia, AnaMaria)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1752 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6142942 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kelly Ludington.(Joven, Carol)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1751 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Nemeth Joven on behalf of Kelly Ludington (Joven, Carol)
June 3, 2016 Filing 1750 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2428 dated 6/2/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 3, 2016 Filing 1749 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/10/2016 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Hohler, Daniel)
May 24, 2016 Filing 1748 RESPONSE to Motion re #1746 Supplemental MOTION to Appoint Expert Professor Eric D. Green, Esq. as Special Master filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1747 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Order Appointing Eric D. Green as Global Settlement Special Master. (Tarricone, Anthony)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1746 Supplemental MOTION to Appoint Expert Professor Eric D. Green, Esq. as Special Master by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric D. Green, #2 Curriculum Vitae of Eric D. Green)(Tarricone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2016: #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D1, #7 Exhibit D2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G) (Gioia, AnaMaria).
May 19, 2016 Filing 1745 Conditional Transfer order number 101 in MDL 2428 dated 5/19/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 18, 2016 Filing 1744 Conditional Transfer order number 100 in MDL 2428 dated 5/18/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 6, 2016 Filing 1743 STATUS REPORT by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kettlewell, William)
May 5, 2016 Filing 1742 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 5, 2016 Filing 1741 Transcript of Status Conference held on April 29, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 5/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1740 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 4/29/2016. Court is in session. Parties address appointment of Eric Green, inquiry regarding procedures developed during MDL by parties that might be shared with court. Court inquires as to status of Oklahoma cases. Parties to submit further information by 5/6/16. Court is in recess. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Tarricone, Durant) (Hohler, Daniel)
April 25, 2016 Filing 1739 Conditional Transfer order number 99 in MDL 2428 dated 4/25/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 18, 2016 Filing 1738 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Order Appointing Eric D. Green as Global Settlement Special Master. (Tarricone, Anthony)
April 15, 2016 Filing 1737 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of duplicate filing by Doroty Ringold. (Gibson, Edward)
April 15, 2016 Filing 1736 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1734 Motion to Appoint Expert. "The motion is conditionally allowed. The plaintiff shall submit a fully detailed proposed order by 4/29/2016." (Hohler, Daniel)
April 5, 2016 Filing 1735 NOTICE by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Hodge, Leigh Anne)
April 1, 2016 Filing 1734 MOTION to Appoint Expert Professor Eric D. Green, Esq. as Special Master by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tarricone, Anthony)
March 25, 2016 Filing 1733 Conditional Transfer order number 98 in MDL 2428 dated 3/25/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 24, 2016 Filing 1732 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/29/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
March 23, 2016 Filing 1731 Conditional Transfer order number 97 in MDL 2428 dated 3/23/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 21, 2016 Filing 1730 Conditional Transfer order number 96 in MDL 2428 dated 3/21/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 10, 2016 Filing 1729 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick Barreca on behalf of Roberta Cosby, Rosemary Holder, Thomas Majors, Phillip Mulkins, Marilyn Sybalski, Paul Sybalski (Barreca, Rick)
March 10, 2016 Filing 1728 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (CMO) NO. 16: Rules and Procedures Relating to the Authorization for Release of Protected Health Information Relating to Claimants. (Attachments: #1 HIPPA Release)(Gioia, AnaMaria)
March 10, 2016 Filing 1727 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1724 Motion for Order. See Case Management Order No. 16. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
March 8, 2016 Filing 1726 First MOTION to Withdraw by James Triplet.(Cloon, Bryson)
March 4, 2016 Filing 1725 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order No. 16 (Rules and Procedures Relating to the Authorization for Release of Protected Health Information Relating to Claimants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tarricone, Anthony)
March 4, 2016 Filing 1724 MOTION for Order to Enter Proposed CMO 16 re: Medical Record Authorization by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tarricone, Anthony)
March 3, 2016 Filing 1723 Joint MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings and for Continuance by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Rosenthal, Kara)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1722 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ronald L. Castle Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5983707 by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Motion)(Silva, Sara)
February 17, 2016 Filing 1721 Conditional Transfer order number 95 in MDL 2428 dated 2/17/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2016 Filing 1720 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 15, 2016 Filing 1719 Transcript of Day Three of Final Pretrial Conference held on February 11, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 3/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 11, 2016 Filing 1718 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 11, 2016 Filing 1717 Transcript of Day Two of Final Pretrial Conference held on February 9, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 3/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 11, 2016 Filing 1716 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 11, 2016 Filing 1715 Transcript of Daubert and Motions Hearing held on February 5, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 11, 2016 Filing 1714 Transcript of Motions Hearing held on February 2, 2016, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 3/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
February 10, 2016 Filing 1713 Opposition re #1710 MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN MISSISSIPPI CASES, #1708 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Tarricone, Anthony)
February 10, 2016 Filing 1712 Opposition re #1708 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Tarricone, Anthony)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1711 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1710 MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN MISSISSIPPI CASES filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Newsom, Kevin)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1710 MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN MISSISSIPPI CASES by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1709 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1708 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Newsom, Kevin)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1708 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1707 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice of duplicate filing by Dunbar Watt.(Watt, Dunbar)
February 1, 2016 Filing 1706 RESPONSE to Motion re #1678 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Newsom, Kevin)
February 1, 2016 Filing 1705 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Graziano on behalf of Florella Dial (Graziano, Christina)
January 31, 2016 Filing 1704 Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases Duplicate MDL Filings by Anthony Yates.(Elkins, Allan)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1703 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Rosetta Garries. (Anderson, Sara)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1702 MOTION to Stay and Consolidate Duplicate MDL Filing by Wilhelmina Bumpers.(Pieksen, John)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1701 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Annie Sherwood. (Elkins, Allan)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1700 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Michael Travis Davis. (Anderson, Sara)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1699 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #1695 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal an Emergency Motion to Compel (relates to Dial v. FMCNA) filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee *** Defendants shall file their opposition to the Emergency Motion to Compel (relates to Dial v. FMCNA) by 2/1/2016 5:00 p.m. A hearing on the motion will be held on 2/2/2016 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1. ***(Hohler, Daniel)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1698 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs Cogill_Mtn to Consolidate Duplicate MDL Filings (Liebhard, Sandy)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1697 NOTICE by Consolidated Plaintiffs Cogill_Mtn to withdraw and substitute counsel (Liebhard, Sandy)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1696 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1695 Motion for Leave to File Document (Hohler, Daniel)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1695 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal an Emergency Motion to Compel (relates to Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1694 Withdrawal of motion: #1693 Notice (Other) filed by Delbert Hicks.. (Liebhard, Sandy)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1693 NOTICE by Delbert Hicks (Liebhard, Sandy)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1692 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (1687) Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to FMCNA's Motions to Dismiss (relates to Sims v. FMCNA 15-cv-13605, and Ware v. FMCNA 15-cv-10491) 1:13-md-02428-DPW. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:15-cv-10491-DPW, 1:15-cv-13605-DPW(Gioia, AnaMaria)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1691 Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Duplicate MDL Filings) by Katherine Spivey.(Nelson, Scott)
January 22, 2016 Filing 1690 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (1683) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting (1684) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting (1689) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW; granting (104) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting (105) Motion to Seal; granting (106) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:14-cv-11101-DPW Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Gioia, AnaMaria)
January 22, 2016 Filing 1689 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Case-Specific Motions in Limine (Relates to Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 20, 2016 Filing 1687 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to FMCNA's Motions to Dismiss (relates to Sims v. FMCNA, Ware v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1686 Assented to MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings by Danny Davis.(Diab, Ahmed)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1685 Assented to MOTION to Stay MDL Proceedings by Arpik Mzrakyan.(Diab, Ahmed)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1684 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to FMCNA's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Testimony, and Argument that Refers to the "Hakim Memo" (Relates to Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1683 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Oppositions to Case-Specific Motions in Limine (Relates to Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 12, 2016 Filing 1682 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1670 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting #1674 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting #1675 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. Any sealed matters should be hand delivered to the Clerk's Office. (Nicewicz, Craig)
January 12, 2016 Filing 1681 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1680 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Newsom, Kevin) Modified to edit docket text on 1/12/2016 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
January 12, 2016 Filing 1680 MOTION to Dismiss by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin) Modified to edit docket text on 1/12/2016 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
January 12, 2016 Filing 1679 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1678 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Newsom, Kevin)
January 12, 2016 Filing 1678 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
January 12, 2016 Filing 1677 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Herbert Farmer. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
January 11, 2016 Filing 1676 Opposition re #1657 Assented to MOTION to Seal (LASTORKA PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL CASE-SPECIFIC MOTIONS IN LIMINE) FMCNA's Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 6 filed by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.. (Brooks, Juanita)
January 11, 2016 Filing 1675 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Preliminary Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (relates to Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 8, 2016 Filing 1674 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File LASTORKA PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS CASE-SPECIFIC MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND PRE-TRIAL BRIEFING MATERIALS by Edward J. Lastorka.(Seeger, Christopher)
January 7, 2016 Filing 1673 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Counsel have resolved #1666 the Motion to Compel and it is withdrawn. The hearing set for 2:00 pm on 1/7/2016 is canceled. (Nicewicz, Craig)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1672 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Edward J. Lastorka to #1671 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Seeger, Christopher)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1671 NOTICE by Edward J. Lastorka Plaintiff's Motion allow live trial testimony via contemporaneous transmission (Seeger, Christopher)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1670 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Status Report Concerning Production of Additional CQM Materials and Supporting Materials Ex Parte and Under Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1669 Opposition re #1666 Emergency MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Notice of Deposition of Defendants' Corporate Representative (Dial v. FMCNA) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kettlewell, William)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1668 Witness List by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Brooks, Juanita)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1667 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #1666 Emergency MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Notice of Deposition of Defendants' Corporate Representative (Dial v. FMCNA) : Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Defendants response/opposition due by close of business today, 1/6/2016.(Nicewicz, Craig)
January 5, 2016 Filing 1666 Emergency MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Notice of Deposition of Defendants' Corporate Representative (Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 5, 2016 Filing 1665 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1657 Motion to Seal; granting #1658 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Nicewicz, Craig)
January 5, 2016 Filing 1664 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Della Jean Rogers. (Keys, Suzanne)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1663 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Rosemary Allen. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1662 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:13-cv-13066-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1661 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 22, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 1/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:13-cv-13066-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1660 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 21, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 1/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:13-cv-13066-DPW(Scalfani, Deborah)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1659 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee Clarification to Report of Expert Steven C. Borkan (Relates to Dial v. FMCNA) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Errata Sheet)(Tarricone, Anthony)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1658 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Case-Specific Motions in Limine (Relates to Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
December 30, 2015 Filing 1657 Assented to MOTION to Seal (LASTORKA PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL CASE-SPECIFIC MOTIONS IN LIMINE) by Edward J. Lastorka.(Seeger, Christopher)
December 29, 2015 Filing 1656 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (1653) Motion for Leave to File Oppositions to Case-Specific Daubert Motions under Seal (Dial v. FMCNA); Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting (1654) Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Case-Specific Daubert Motions in Excess of 20 Pages (Dial v. FMCNA) ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW; granting (71) Motion to Seal Oppositions to Dial Case-Specific Daubert Motions in case 1:14-cv-11101-DPW Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:14-cv-11101-DPW(Gioia, AnaMaria)
December 28, 2015 Filing 1655 STIPULATION of Dismissal (without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing) by Martin Moreno. (Nelson, Scott)
December 24, 2015 Filing 1654 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Memoranda in Opposition to Case-Specific Daubert Motions in Excess of 20 Pages (Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
December 24, 2015 Filing 1653 MOTION for Leave to File Oppositions to Case-Specific Daubert Motions under Seal (Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
December 23, 2015 Filing 1652 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DUPLICATE FILING by Latoya Ulmer. (Hoke, Curtis)
December 23, 2015 Filing 1651 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel Extension of Agreement Concerning Duplicate MDL Cases (Tarricone, Anthony)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1650 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Fresenius Management SE, Fresenius SE & Co. KGAA re #1637 Answer to Amended Complaint (Second) and Affirmative Defenses. (Starkey, Carol)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA, Fresenius Medical Care Management, AG re #1636 Answer to Amended Complaint (Second) and Affirmative Defenses. (Starkey, Carol)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1648 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1647 Transcript of Motion Hearing and Pretrial Conference re: Lastorka V FMCNA, etal (13-cv-13066-DPW) held on December 15, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 1/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 21, 2015 Filing 1646 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Delbert Hicks. (Stern, Felecia)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1645 Opposition re #1560 MOTION in Limine to Apply Massachusetts Law to Punitive Damages (Motion In Limine No. 5) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Brooks, Juanita)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1644 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Evelyn McCann. (Nelson, Scott)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1643 Opposition re #1547 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Case-Specific Motions in Limine (Relates to Lastorka v. FMCNA) filed by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Brooks, Juanita)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1642 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Shirley Allen. (Nelson, Scott)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1641 RESPONSE to Motion re #1562 MOTION in Limine for Application of Mississippi Law filed by Edward J. Lastorka. (Seeger, Christopher)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1640 Opposition re #1564 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Other Cases in this Consolidated Litigation, the Massachusetts State Coordinated Proceedings and Related Litigation in Other Jurisdictions filed by Edward J. Lastorka. (Seeger, Christopher)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1639 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Case-Specific Motions in Limine by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
December 17, 2015 Filing 1638 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Paulos on behalf of Michele Folk (Paulos, Christopher)
December 17, 2015 Filing 1637 Master ANSWER to #1232 Amended Complaint (Second) and Affirmative Defenses by Fresenius Management SE, Fresenius SE & Co. KGAA.(Starkey, Carol)
December 17, 2015 Filing 1636 Master ANSWER to #1232 Amended Complaint (Second) and Affirmative Defenses by Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA, Fresenius Medical Care Management, AG.(Starkey, Carol)
December 16, 2015 Filing 1635 Assented to MOTION to Seal (FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S CASE-SPECIFIC MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Edward J. Lastorka.(Seeger, Christopher)
December 15, 2015 Filing 1634 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durant, Maria)
December 15, 2015 Filing 1633 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2015 re 1574 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Court hears argument on the motion to compel and provides guidance. Defendants to provide St. Louis decision to the Court today. Court sets deadline of 1/12/16 for plaintiffs to preliminarily respond to Dial 14-cv-11101 motion for summary judgment. Court addresses preliminary scheduling issues in Lastorka 13-cv-13066. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (Attorneys present: William Kettlewell, Maria Durant, Sara Silva, James Bennett, Megan Heinsz, Anthony Tarricone, David Buchannan, Christopher Tisi and James Gotz) (Gioia, AnaMaria) Modified to edit docket text on 12/15/2015 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
December 14, 2015 Filing 1631 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1628 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting #1629 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
December 14, 2015 Filing 1630 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Verba L. Wesley (Bell, Bobby)
December 14, 2015 Filing 1629 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in FMCNA's Opposition to Motion to Compel by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
December 14, 2015 Filing 1628 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal FMCNA's Opposition to Plaintiff Executive Committee's "Emergency" Motion to Compel and its Exhibits and for In Camera Review of Ex. 20 by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
December 11, 2015 Filing 1627 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Tony Fontenot. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
December 11, 2015 Filing 1626 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Glenda Goins. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 1625 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Lois Harris. (Singleton, W.)
December 9, 2015 Filing 1624 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Lavonne M. Patterson. (Hirsch, Andrea)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1623 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Jeffrey Alex Meeks. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1622 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Ann Cannon. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1621 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Wendy Johnson. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1620 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Betty Clark. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1619 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Minnie Smith. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1618 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Mary Bland. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1617 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Lakenya Nolden. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1616 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Clotee Downs. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1615 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Robert Caffey, Sr. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1614 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Gladys Brown. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1613 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Kathy Scott. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1612 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Clinton Young. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1611 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Patricia Thomas. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1610 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Monica Burton. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1609 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Darrington Morris. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1608 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Gloria Boyce. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1607 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Marcella Tearson. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1606 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Sheila Lovern. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1605 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Daphne James. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1604 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Clara Harris. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1603 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Patricia Pernell. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1602 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Don Gillespie. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1601 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by William Shelby. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1600 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Rose Bailey. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1599 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Melissa Martin. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1598 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Clarence Askew. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1597 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Lorene Armstrong. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1596 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Terrence Williams. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1595 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Irma Burton. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1594 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Tyonda Tinner. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1593 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Otis Bradley. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1592 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Corrina Riley. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1591 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Amanda Virgin. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1590 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Mae Johnson. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1589 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Victor Bolden. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1588 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Kathy McDougal. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1587 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Minnie Carter. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1586 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Ruby Davis. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1585 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Johnnie Odessa White. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1584 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Jimmy Brooks. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1583 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Kenneth Wright. (Nabors, Jason)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1580 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Angel Rivera. (Valentine, Craig)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1579 Transfer Order in MDL 2428 dated 12/8/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
December 8, 2015 Filing 1578 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1569 Motion for Leave to File Case-Specific Daubert Motions Under Seal (Dial v. FMCNA) ; granting #1570 Motion for Leave to File Daubert Memoranda in Excess of Twenty Pages (Dial v. FMCNA); Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1577 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion to Compel FMCNA Clinical Quality Manager Adverse Event Notebooks, Files, and Reports, and to Conduct Expedited Follow-up Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1576 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Dial Case Specific Summary Judgment Memorandum by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1575 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Dial Case-Specific Summary Judgment Motions by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1573 Conditional Transfer order number 94 in MDL 2428 dated 12/2/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1572 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1571 Assented to MOTION to Seal Dial Case-Specific Daubert Motions by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1570 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Daubert Memoranda in Excess of Twenty Pages (Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1569 MOTION for Leave to File Case-Specific Daubert Motions Under Seal (Dial v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
December 4, 2015 Filing 1568 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al. (Colman, Claire)
December 4, 2015 Filing 1567 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1566 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Woodlock, Douglas)
December 3, 2015 Filing 1566 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal an Emergency Motion to Compel FMCNA clinical quality manager adverse event notebooks, files, and reports, and to conduct expedited follow-up discovery by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1564 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Other Cases in this Consolidated Litigation, the Massachusetts State Coordinated Proceedings and Related Litigation in Other Jurisdictions by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc..(Brooks, Juanita)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1563 MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence and Argument Relating to Discovery Issues by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc..(Brooks, Juanita)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1562 MOTION in Limine for Application of Mississippi Law by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc..(Brooks, Juanita)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1561 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1560 MOTION in Limine to Apply Massachusetts Law to Punitive Damages (Motion In Limine No. 5) filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Seeger, Christopher)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1560 MOTION in Limine to Apply Massachusetts Law to Punitive Damages (Motion In Limine No. 5) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Seeger, Christopher)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1559 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1558 Transcript of Day Three of Daubert Hearing held on November 19, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock and Judge Maynard M. Kirpalani (13-cv-3400, State Superior Court). The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 12/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/29/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
November 30, 2015 Filing 1556 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (1529) Motion to Seal; granting (1546) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting (1547) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting (1552) Motion to Seal; granting (1553) Motion to Seal; granting (1555) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW; granting (74) Motion to Seal; granting (75) Motion to Seal; granting (76) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:13-cv-13066-DPW Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:13-cv-13066-DPW(Woodlock, Douglas)
November 29, 2015 Filing 1555 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Lastorka v. FMCHA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Seeger, Christopher)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1553 Assented to MOTION to Seal Lastorka Case-Specific Motions in Limine by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1552 Assented to MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Lastorka Case-Specific Daubert Motion by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1551 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1550 Transcript of Status and Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on November 20, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 12/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
November 24, 2015 Filing 1549 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1534 Revised Joint Proposed Tracking Order. (Nicewicz, Craig)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1548 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Eve Gavin. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
November 23, 2015 Filing 1547 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Case-Specific Motions in Limine (Relates to Lastorka v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
November 23, 2015 Filing 1546 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Case-Specific Daubert Motion by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
November 20, 2015 Filing 1554 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Hearing held on 11/19/2015. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (Hohler, Daniel)
November 18, 2015 Filing 1545 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 18, 2015 Filing 1544 Transcript of Telephonic Status and Scheduling Conference held on October 30, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 12/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
November 18, 2015 Filing 1543 Transcript of Status/Scheduling Confernce and Motion Hearing held on October 7, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 12/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
November 18, 2015 Filing 1542 Transcript of Status and Scheduling Conference held on September 24, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock and Honorable Maynard Kirpalani, Judge, Suffolk Country Superior Court (Case No. 13-CV-3400). The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 12/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
November 17, 2015 Filing 1540 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: Parties' Proposed Agenda for November 20, 2015 Status Conference. (Kettlewell, William) (Main Document 1540 replaced on 11/20/2015) (Gioia, AnaMaria).
November 13, 2015 Filing 1539 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Joint Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Clark Colton and Dr. Andrew Zydney set for 11/19/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
November 12, 2015 Filing 1538 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billy Earby, Fresenius Management SE, Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care Management, AG, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius SE & Co. KGAA, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. (Branch, Turner)
November 12, 2015 Filing 1537 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fresenius Management SE, Fresenius Management, AG, Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care Management, AG, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Geraldine mosley (Branch, Turner)
November 12, 2015 Filing 1536 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fresenius Management SE, Fresenius Management, AG, Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius SE & Co. KGAA, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. (Branch, Turner)
November 5, 2015 Filing 1534 MOTION to Begin the Lastorka Bellwether Trial One Week Later, and Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Revised Joint Proposed Lastorka and Dial Tracking Order. (Tarricone, Anthony) (Main Document 1534 replaced on 11/6/2015) (Gioia, AnaMaria). Modified to edit docket text, replace main document, and edit event selection on 11/6/2015 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
November 2, 2015 Filing 1531 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven B. Rotman on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Rotman, Steven)
October 30, 2015 Filing 1533 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 10/30/2015. Lastorka trial date reset to January 19, 2016. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) Modified on 11/5/2015 (Hohler, Daniel).
October 29, 2015 Filing 1529 Assented to MOTION to Seal Lastorka Case-Specific Daubert Motions by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
October 29, 2015 Filing 1528 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (#1526 in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW ) Plaintiff's Assented to Motion for Leave to File Case-Specific Daubert Motions and Memoranda Under Seal. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:13-cv-13066-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett)
October 29, 2015 Filing 1527 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status/Scheduling Conference (re Daubert and Bellwether) set for 10/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 29, 2015 Filing 1526 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Case-Specific Daubert Motion Under Seal (Lastorka v. FMCNA) by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
October 27, 2015 Filing 1525 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Mary L. Ford. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 27, 2015 Filing 1524 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Rickie Deboard. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
October 27, 2015 Filing 1523 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Joint Proposed Lastorka and Dial Tracking Order. (Tarricone, Anthony)
October 23, 2015 Filing 1522 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/20/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 22, 2015 Filing 1521 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 11/20/2015 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
October 22, 2015 Filing 1520 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2015 (partially ex parte) re #1243 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller filed by Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.; said motion argued and GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE absent further showing by the interested party within two weeks, and to the extent of the directions provided by the Court as stated on the record. (Court Reporter: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com)(Attorneys present: Tarricone, Kettlewell, Castle, Melsheimer, and Webre) (Lovett, Jarrett) Modified text on 10/22/2015 (Lovett, Jarrett).
October 21, 2015 Filing 1519 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 21, 2015 Filing 1518 Transcript of Day Two of Daubert Hearing held on October 15, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock and Judge Maynard M. Kirpalani (13-cv-3400, State Superior Court). The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 11/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
October 21, 2015 Filing 1517 Transcript of Day One of Daubert Hearing held on October 14, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock and Judge Maynard M. Kirpalani (13-cv-3400, State Superior Court). The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock and Kelly Mortellite at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 11/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
October 15, 2015 Filing 1515 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating 1294 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Preclude Defense Experts' Opinions that the Evidence Relied Upon by Plaintiffs' Experts Fails to Establish General Causation, said motion having no specificity; taking under advisement 1307 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Preclude Opinions of Marc Shalek, M.D., and 1311 Plaintiffs' MOTION Preclude Expert Testimony of James J. Zazra, P.H.D. in light of request by counsel for rulings on the papers; taking under advisement 1500 Defendants' MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Richard Goldstein and to Exclude Opinions and Testimony. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 15, 2015 Filing 1514 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock (13-md-2428) and Judge Maynard M. Kirpalani (13-cv-3400, State Superior Court): Joint Daubert Hearing Day 2 held on 10/15/2015; no additional argument given re 1319 Defendants' MOTION Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Clark Colton, and Dr. Andrew Zydney; said motion TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; additional Jury Trial (Bellwether) set for 6/13/16 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock; 1309 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Lee Jen Wei argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; 1296 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Preclude Opinions of Defense Expert Dr. Glenn Chertow - TREATED AS MOOT in light of representation by defense counsel; 1302 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Preclude Opinions of Defense Expert Dr. Franklin Maddux argues and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; 1317 Defendants' MOTION to Limit the Opinions of Regulatory Experts: Dr. Pence; Mr. Ulatowski; Dr. Samaras; and Dr. Barkalow argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; 1298 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Preclude Opinions of Defense Expert Jefferey N. Gibbs, Esq. argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; further hearing to be held in case no. 13-cv-3400, In Re Consolidated Fresenius Cases (State Superior Court cases) on 10/16/2015 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 (U.S.D.C. of Massachusetts) before Judge Maynard M. Kirpalani. (Court Reporters: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com and Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com)(Attorneys present: Tarricone, Ketterer, Rottman, Appel, Brooks, Castle, Kettlewell, Kaplan, Melsheimer, Browne, Janet, Drakulich, and Denning) (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 15, 2015 Filing 1513 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Duplicate Filing by Valorie Jenkins. (Carlson, Craig)
October 14, 2015 Filing 1512 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock (13-md-2428) and Judge Maynard M. Kirpalani (13-cv-3400, State Superior Court): Joint Daubert Hearing Day 1 held on 10/14/2015; indroductions given by the Court; 1313 Defendants' MOTION Exclude Certain Statements in the Hakim Memo argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; 1315 Defendants' MOTION Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Steven C. Borkan argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; 1300 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Ben Lipps argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; 1319 Defendants' MOTION Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Clark Colton, and Dr. Andrew Zydney argued; further hearing set for 10/15/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom before Judges Douglas P. Woodlock and Maynard M. Kirpalani. (Court Reporters: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com and Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com)(Attorneys present: Gotz, Tarricone, Ketterer, Rottman, Appel, Brooks, Castle, Kettlewell, Cummings, Kaplan, Melsheimer, and Denning) (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 14, 2015 Filing 1511 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on #1243 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller : Motion Hearing reset for 10/22/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 14, 2015 Filing 1510 Conditional Transfer order number 93 in MDL 2428 dated 10/14/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 14, 2015 Filing 1509 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #1243 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller : Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 5th Floor before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 12, 2015 Filing 1506 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1505 Motion to Seal (Woodlock, Douglas)
October 12, 2015 Filing 1505 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Durant, Maria)
October 12, 2015 Filing 1504 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall (Wall, Carasusana)
October 12, 2015 Filing 1503 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall (Wall, Carasusana)
October 12, 2015 Filing 1502 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall (Wall, Carasusana)
October 9, 2015 Filing 1501 Opposition re 1500 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Richard Goldstein and to Exclude Opinions and Testimony filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 8, 2015 Filing 1499 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1497 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Motion to Stike Under Seal. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 8, 2015 Filing 1497 Assented to MOTION to Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Durant, Maria)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1498 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status/Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2015; (#77 in 1:13-cv-10597-DPW) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthony Darby, and (#76 in 1:13-cv-10649-DPW) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Julia Booker - GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE; Hearing re #1243 Defendants' Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller set for 10/16/15 at 9:00 AM (courtroom to be determined); Defendants' Motion to Stike Affidavit of Dr. Goldstein re 1486 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Statements in the "Hakim Memo" as well as plaintiffs' Experts' Opinions Based on Those Statements due by 10/8/15; oppositions due 10/12/15; hearing on Motion to Strike set for 10/14/15 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Gotz and Tarricone for the pltffs; Melsheimer, Brooks, Castle, Denning, Hodge, Kettewell and Cummings for the defts) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1483 NOTICE of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall on behalf of Carolina Defacio (Wall, Carasusana)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1482 NOTICE of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall on behalf of Barbara Colwell (Wall, Carasusana)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1481 NOTICE of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall on behalf of Karita Jackson (Wall, Carasusana)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1480 NOTICE of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall on behalf of Mary Lou Rainsberger (Wall, Carasusana)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1479 NOTICE of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall on behalf of Betty Jo Nunn (Wall, Carasusana)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1476 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Sheila Williams (Barton, Kristen)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1475 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Sheila Williams (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1474 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Sheila Williams (Diab, Ahmed)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1473 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1472 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Bobby Williams (Barton, Kristen)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1471 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Bobby Williams (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1470 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Bobby Williams (Diab, Ahmed)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1469 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1468 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Barbara Wilcutt (Barton, Kristen)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1467 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Barbara Wilcutt (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1466 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Barbara Wilcutt (Diab, Ahmed)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1465 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1464 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Pamela Triplett (Barton, Kristen)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1463 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Pamela Triplett (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1462 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Pamela Triplett (Diab, Ahmed)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1461 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1460 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Donna Thomas (Barton, Kristen)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1459 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Donna Thomas (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1458 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Donna Thomas (Diab, Ahmed)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1457 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1456 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Anthony Thomas (Barton, Kristen)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1455 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Anthony Thomas (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1454 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Anthony Thomas (Diab, Ahmed)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1453 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1452 NOTICE of Appearance by Carasusana B. Wall on behalf of Carolina Defacio (Wall, Carasusana)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1451 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Hazel M. Smith (Barton, Kristen)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1450 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Hazel M. Smith (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1449 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Hazel M. Smith (Diab, Ahmed)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1448 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1447 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Roxanne Rychly (Barton, Kristen)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1446 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Roxanne Rychly (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1445 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Roxanne Rychly (Diab, Ahmed)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1444 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1443 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Robert Richardson (Barton, Kristen)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1442 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Robert Richardson (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1441 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Robert Richardson (Diab, Ahmed)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1440 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1438 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Judith L. Rice (Barton, Kristen)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1437 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Judith L. Rice (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1436 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Judith L. Rice (Diab, Ahmed)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1435 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1434 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Richard Price, Sr (Barton, Kristen)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1433 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Richard Price, Sr (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1432 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Richard Price, Sr (Diab, Ahmed)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1431 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1430 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Imari Porter (Barton, Kristen)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1429 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Imari Porter (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1428 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Imari Porter (Diab, Ahmed)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1427 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1425 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1420 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report Under Seal. (Lovett, Jarrett)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1424 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Tony Montanez (Barton, Kristen)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1423 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Tony Montanez (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1422 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Tony Montanez (Diab, Ahmed)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1421 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1420 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Report in Support of Motion to Preclude Opinions of Defense Expert Dr. Franklin Maddux by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1419 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Tina Molle (Barton, Kristen)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1418 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Tina Molle (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1417 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Tina Molle (Diab, Ahmed)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1416 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1415 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Patricia Maus (Barton, Kristen)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1414 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Patricia Maus (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1413 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Patricia Maus (Diab, Ahmed)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1412 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1411 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Stephanie Macy (Barton, Kristen)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1410 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Stephanie Macy (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1409 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Stephanie Macy (Diab, Ahmed)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1408 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1407 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Osborn Lumpkin, Jr. (Barton, Kristen)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1406 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Osborn Lumpkin, Jr. (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1405 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Osborn Lumpkin, Jr. (Diab, Ahmed)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1404 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1403 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Deborah Lowry (Barton, Kristen)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1402 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Deborah Lowry (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1401 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Deborah Lowry (Diab, Ahmed)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1400 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1399 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: FMCNA and PEC's Joint Proposed Schedule for Daubert/Lanigan Hearings. (Durant, Maria)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1398 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Kimberly Jones Harris (Barton, Kristen)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1397 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Kimberly Jones Harris (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1396 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Kimberly Jones Harris (Diab, Ahmed)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1395 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1394 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Wesley Davis, Jr. (Barton, Kristen)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1393 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Wesley Davis, Jr. (Stevens, Lindsay)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1392 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Wesley Davis, Jr. (Diab, Ahmed)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1391 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1390 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Wanda Clark (Barton, Kristen)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1389 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Wanda Clark (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1388 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Wanda Clark (Diab, Ahmed)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1387 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1386 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1380 Assented to Motion to Seal Documents ; granting #1381 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1385 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Ted Campbell (Barton, Kristen)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1384 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Ted Campbell (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1383 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Ted Campbell (Diab, Ahmed)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1382 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1381 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Durant, Maria)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1380 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Daubert Oppositions by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Durant, Maria)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1379 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Vivian Buchanon (Barton, Kristen)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1378 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Vivian Buchanon (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1377 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Vivian Buchanon (Diab, Ahmed)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1376 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1375 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Karen Bibens (Barton, Kristen)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1374 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Karen Bibens (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1373 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Karen Bibens (Diab, Ahmed)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1372 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1371 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Madonna D. Bailey (Barton, Kristen)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1370 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Madonna D. Bailey (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1369 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Madonna D. Bailey (Diab, Ahmed)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1368 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1367 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Aprel Atkins (Barton, Kristen)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1366 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Aprel Atkins (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1365 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Aprel Atkins (Diab, Ahmed)
September 30, 2015 Filing 1364 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1363 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1362 Assented to Motion for Leave to File General Causation Daubert Opposition Memoranda Under Seal by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1362 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File General Causation Daubert Opposition Memoranda Under Seal by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1361 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1360 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Opposition(s) in Excess of Page Limit. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1360 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Daubert Opposition Memoranda by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1359 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Virginia Allen (Barton, Kristen)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1358 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Virginia Allen (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1357 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Virginia Allen (Diab, Ahmed)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1356 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1355 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Melissa Adler, Helene Weiner, Lisa Weiner-Cashman (Barton, Kristen)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1354 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Melissa Adler, Helene Weiner, Lisa Weiner-Cashman (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1353 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Melissa Adler, Helene Weiner, Lisa Weiner-Cashman (Diab, Ahmed)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1352 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1351 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Daisy Shaver (Barton, Kristen)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1350 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Daisy Shaver (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1349 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Daisy Shaver (Diab, Ahmed)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1348 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1347 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Steven Mitchell, Kerry Queiroz, Megan Queiroz, Robert Queiroz, Sylvia Queiroz (Barton, Kristen)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1346 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Steven Mitchell, Kerry Queiroz, Megan Queiroz, Robert Queiroz, Sylvia Queiroz (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1345 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Steven Mitchell, Kerry Queiroz, Megan Queiroz, Robert Queiroz, Sylvia Queiroz (Diab, Ahmed)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1344 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1343 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Pamela Holman (Barton, Kristen)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1342 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Pamela Holman (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1341 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Pamela Holman (Diab, Ahmed)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1340 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1339 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Alysha Marissa Brown. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
September 28, 2015 Filing 1338 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Adrienne Grace. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1337 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock and Judge Maynard M. Kirpalani (Middlesex County Superior Court): Joint Hearing held re Daubert-Lanigan hearing procedures on 9/24/2015; report submitted; deposition of Dr. Smith taken; supplemental reports expected; schedule revised; Daubert Hearings to begin on 10/14/15 at 9:00 AM through 10/15/15 at 9:00 AM (full days) in Courtroom 1 before Judges Douglas P. Woodlock and Maynard M. Kirpalani. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Tarricone, Gotz, Rotman, Jenner, Appel, Castle, Brooks, Kettlewell, Durant, and Melsheimer) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1336 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Natalie Hannah (Barton, Kristen)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1335 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Natalie Hannah (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1334 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Natalie Hannah (Diab, Ahmed)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1333 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1332 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Jack Gress, Jr. (Barton, Kristen)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1331 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Jack Gress, Jr. (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1330 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Jack Gress, Jr. (Diab, Ahmed) (Main Document 1330 replaced on 9/24/2015) (Gioia, AnaMaria).
September 24, 2015 Filing 1329 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Cecil Cox, Dwain Cox, Rhonda Cox, Mamie Hallmark (Barton, Kristen)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1328 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Cecil Cox, Dwain Cox, Rhonda Cox, Mamie Hallmark (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1327 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Cecil Cox, Dwain Cox, Rhonda Cox, Mamie Hallmark (Diab, Ahmed)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1326 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1325 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Barton on behalf of Marcus Brown, Valerie D. Brown, David Brown, Jr., David Brown, Sr. (Barton, Kristen)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1324 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay R. Stevens on behalf of Marcus Brown, Valerie D. Brown, David Brown, Jr., David Brown, Sr. (Stevens, Lindsay)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1323 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Marcus Brown, Valerie D. Brown, David Brown, Jr., David Brown, Sr. (Diab, Ahmed)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1322 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Sara Poli (Poli, Stephanie)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1321 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Latasha Young. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
September 22, 2015 Filing 1306 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Yvonne Evans. (Holland, Eric)
September 21, 2015 Filing 1305 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing:Hearing re Status of ABChD Study and Deposition of Dr. William Smith set for 9/24/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judges Douglas P. Woodlock and Maynard Kirpalani. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 18, 2015 Filing 1304 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Carol Riva. (Zeman, Amy)
September 18, 2015 Filing 1291 Letter/request (non-motion) from Collora LLP . (Kettlewell, William)
September 16, 2015 Filing 1288 STIPULATION Agreement Concerning Duplicate MDL Cases by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hodge, Leigh Anne)
September 16, 2015 Filing 1287 Letter/request (non-motion) from Anthony Tarricone, MDL Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel . (Tarricone, Anthony)
September 15, 2015 Filing 1286 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Joint Brief in Support of Proposed Initial Bellwether Trial Cases. (Tarricone, Anthony)
September 11, 2015 Filing 1285 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1284 FMCNA's Assented to Motion to File Daubert Filings Under Seal. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 10, 2015 Filing 1284 Assented to MOTION to Seal Daubert Filings by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
September 10, 2015 Filing 1283 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1266 MDL PEC's Motion for Leave to File All General Causation Daubert Motions and Memoranda Under Seal; granting #1267 MDL Pec's Assented to Motion to File Omnibus Daubert Memorandum in Excess of Twenty Pages; granting #1281 Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Proposal for Bellwether Trial Cases to 9/15/15; granting #1282 FMCNA's Assented to Motion for Leave to File Daubert Memoranda in Excess of Twenty Pages. (Lovett, Jarrett)
September 10, 2015 Filing 1282 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Daubert Memoranda in Excess of Twenty Pages by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Durant, Maria)
September 10, 2015 Filing 1281 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Proposal for Bellwether Trial Cases to September 15, 2015 by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Kettlewell, William)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1280 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryson R. Cloon on behalf of James Triplet (Cloon, Bryson)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1279 NOTICE by Aida Taldabanian of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1278 NOTICE by Lida Shamorodian of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1277 NOTICE by Yeranoush Shahmirian of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1276 NOTICE by Arpik Mzrakyan of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1275 NOTICE by Anne Gevorgyan, Armenak Ovnanyan of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1274 NOTICE by Elizaveta Galachyan of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1273 NOTICE by Grigor Demirchyan of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1272 NOTICE by Ruzanna Danielyan of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1271 NOTICE by Tigran Aytayan of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1270 NOTICE by Joe Apikian of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1269 NOTICE by Anahid Akhaian of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1268 NOTICE by Anait Ajaryan of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO., KGaA, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE MANAGEMENT AG., FRESENIUS SE & CO. KGaA, and FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SE. (Fiske, John)
September 8, 2015 Filing 1267 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
September 8, 2015 Filing 1266 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Tarricone, Anthony)
September 8, 2015 Filing 1265 Transcript of Status and Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on August 28, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 9/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
September 8, 2015 Filing 1264 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 2, 2015 Filing 1263 Opposition Response by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Hodge, Leigh Anne)
September 1, 2015 Filing 1262 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial (Bellwether; 3 weeks)) set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jury Trial (Bellwether; 3 weeks)) set for 2/16/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 28, 2015 Filing 1261 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status/Scheduling Conference held on 8/28/2015; pltff reported data not analyzed; Court Orders Dr. William Smith's report due by 9/9/15 by 9:00 a.m.; pltff's completion of depositions by 9/23/15; pltff's supplementations by 10/7/15; defts to respond by 10/9/15; Daubert Hearings set to begin the week of 10/13/15 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1; cases with Home Forum selection issues addressed; such cases out of California are subject to an agreement made between the parties; defts propose a global audit and full census as possible solutions; cases with motions to dismiss based on duplication of pleadings addressed; (#79 in case 13-cv-10836, Dickson v. FMCNA, et al.) Motion to Amend Complaint - GRANTED; (#77 in case 13-cv-10597, Darby v. FMCNA, et al.) and (#76 in case 13-cv-10649, Booker v. FMCNA, et al.) Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice set for hearing on 10/7/15 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock; hearing to be set before October, 2015 re (#1243 in case 13-md-2428, In Re Fresenius/Granuflo) Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Tarricone for the pltffs; Kettlewell, Castle (in-house-counsel), Brooks, Newsom, and Hodge) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1260 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: Defendants' Status Report Regarding Expedited Discovery. (Kettlewell, William)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1259 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Plaintiffs' Executive Committee's Status Report for August 28, 2015 Status Conference. (Tarricone, Anthony)
August 18, 2015 Filing 1258 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 18, 2015 Filing 1257 Transcript of Status and Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on August 7, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
August 17, 2015 Filing 1256 Letter/request (non-motion) from Anthony Tarricone, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel . (Tarricone, Anthony)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1255 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Tamara Fraizer Notice of Withdrawal (Fraizer, Tamara)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1253 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion #1243 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller, filed by Paul Miller. (Gioia, AnaMaria) Modified to edit docket text on 8/14/2015 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
August 11, 2015 Filing 1252 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearings. Status Conference (experts) set for 8/28/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Status Conference (Bellwether) set for 10/7/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Daubert Hearings tentatively set for week of 10/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 7, 2015 Filing 1251 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1212 Motion for Joint Daubert/Lanigan Hearings with Massachusetts Consolidated Action, to the extent of the briefing schedule set at the conference/hearing held 8/7/15. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 7, 2015 Filing 1250 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference/Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2015; (#1212 in case 13-2428-DPW, In re Fresenius) Motion for Joint Daubert/Lanigan Hearing in this MDL and Related Massachusetts State Court Litigation - GRANTED to the extent of filing submissions; opening briefs re generic export reports due 9/14/15; responses due 10/5/15; status report (discovery) due 8/27/15; Status Conference (discovery) set for 8/28/15 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock; Court Ordered Bellwether trial related briefs (recommendations) due by 9/11/15; disputes/response due by 9/25/2015; a hearing re Bellwether cases for trial set for 10/7/15 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock; parties are to hold week of 10/13/15 for joint Daubert/Lanigan hearings; Report on Attorneys General actions pending in Louisiana and Mississippi addressed; Court disclosed ruling to be rendered in case 14-14412-DPW, Cook et al, v. Fresenius, et al.; report re out-of-state cases (physicians/hospital) due by 8/14/15; defts' Ordered to respond to pltffs' discovery request made this date (8/7/15) within 2 weeks; (#42 in case 13-10109-DPW, Sims v. FMCNA, et al.) and (#45 in case 14-11302-DPW, Hall v. FMCNA, et al.) Motions to Quash or for a Protective Order - GRANTED re Protective Order requiring Davita to identify responsive factual witnesses to the topic (non 30(b)(6) witnesses); duplicate filing re case nos. 13-10930-DPW and 15-12282-DPW, Bumpers v. FMCNA, et al. to be resolved by counsel. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Tarricone, Gotz, Tatting, and Pieksen, Jr. for the pltffs; Hopkins for the movant (Davita); Kettlewell, Hodge, Newsom, Hodge, Castle (in-house counsel), Starkey, Cummings, Brook, and Denning for the defts) Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett) Modified text and Regenerated NEF on 8/11/2015 (Lovett, Jarrett).
August 7, 2015 Filing 1249 Conditional Transfer order number 91 in MDL 2428 dated 8/6/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
August 5, 2015 Filing 1248 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Agenda. (Kettlewell, William)
August 5, 2015 Filing 1247 Letter/request (non-motion) from George W. Neville, Special Assistant Attorney General of Mississippi. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
August 5, 2015 Filing 1246 Letter/request (non-motion) from James D. Caldwell, Louisiana Attorney General. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1245 SEALED UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM in Support of #1243 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (SEALED Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9). Leave to file these documents under seal was granted via electronic order no. 1242 (Gioia, AnaMaria)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1244 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1243 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Index)(Silva, Sara)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1243 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony and Responses to Subpoena by Dr. Paul Miller by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1242 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1241 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Memorandum and Exhibits in Support of Motion to Compel. (Lovett, Jarrett)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1241 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara)
July 31, 2015 Filing 1240 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: FMCNA Defendants' Proposed Schedule for Daubert Motion Practice and the Selection of Bellwether Trials. (Kettlewell, William)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1239 Master ANSWER to #1232 Amended Complaint (Second) and Affirmative Defenses by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Kettlewell, William)
July 27, 2015 Filing 1238 Conditional Transfer order number 90 in MDL 2428 dated the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1237 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Stag on behalf of Janice Bradley, Jimmy Sweet, George Martin, Ronald Pemberton, Sr, Rose Cathey, Anneray Hopkins (Stag, Michael)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1236 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Stag on behalf of Karensee Johnson, John F. Oberhausen, Jr., Connie Voigt, Charles Roby (Stag, Michael)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1235 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Stag on behalf of Glenda Knighton, Margie McFall, Sherrill Moore, Thomas Rogers (Stag, Michael)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1234 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Stag on behalf of Cindy Cox, Marie Daugherty, Ivan Faulks, Anna Maglione (Stag, Michael)
July 21, 2015 Filing 1233 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Helene Weiner. (Fiske, John)
July 20, 2015 Filing 1232 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) - Leave to File Granted on 6/19/2015) against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.(Tarricone, Anthony)
July 15, 2015 Filing 1231 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Plaintiffs' Proposed Briefing Schedule to Select Trial Cases. (Tarricone, Anthony)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1230 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered re #1227 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Walter L. Weisman (Gioia, AnaMaria)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1229 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered re #1226 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Walter L. Weisman. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1228 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing: The Status/Conference of 7/24/15 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock is canceled. The next conference is scheduled for 8/7/15 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
July 7, 2015 Filing 1227 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice As To All Claims by Walter L. Weisman. (Starkey, Carol)
July 7, 2015 Filing 1226 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice As To All Claims by Walter L. Weisman. (Starkey, Carol)
July 7, 2015 Filing 1225 RESPONSE to Motion re #1212 MOTION for Joint Daubert/Lanigan Hearings with Massachusetts Consolidated Action filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Tab 1, #2 Tab 2)(Tarricone, Anthony)
July 7, 2015 NOTICE Resetting next Hearing (due to conflict in with Court's schedule): Status/Scheduling Conference reset for 7/24/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
July 7, 2015 Filing 1224 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (CMO) NO. 15 (Bellwether Phase II Discovery Protocol); Discovery to be completed by 7/31/2015.Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
July 7, 2015 Filing 1223 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS.(Lovett, Jarrett)
June 30, 2015 Filing 1220 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 30, 2015 Filing 1219 Transcript of Status and Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on June 19, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 7/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
June 30, 2015 Filing 1218 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #894 Motion to Dismiss (see Memorandum and Order Dkt. No. 46 in case 14-cv-10836-DPW, and Dkt No. 45 in case 14-cv-10848-DPW); finding as moot #896 Motion to Sever (see Memorandum and Order Dkt. No. 71 in case 14-cv-10546-DPW). (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 30, 2015 Filing 1217 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Cummings on behalf of Walter L. Weisman (Cummings, Charles)
June 30, 2015 Filing 1216 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Starkey on behalf of Walter L. Weisman (Starkey, Carol)
June 30, 2015 Filing 1215 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Cummings on behalf of Walter L. Weisman (Cummings, Charles)
June 30, 2015 Filing 1214 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Starkey on behalf of Walter L. Weisman (Starkey, Carol)
June 25, 2015 Filing 1213 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #954 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and Hospital Defendants SUPPLEMENT REGARDING SUBSTITUTION AND CLAIM SEVERANCE filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Newsom, Kevin)
June 24, 2015 Filing 1212 MOTION for Joint Daubert/Lanigan Hearings with Massachusetts Consolidated Action by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Kettlewell, William)
June 23, 2015 Filing 1211 Conditional Transfer order number 89 in MDL 2428 dated 6/23/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 1222 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (#1178) in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW, Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Master Complaint; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document; granting (#1189) in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW,(#43) in case 1:14-cv-12402-DPW, and (#30) in case 1:14-cv-13883-DPW Assented to Motion to Sever Plaintiffs; denying (#1197) in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW, and (#39) in case 1:14-cv-11360-DPW Motion to Withdraw Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; granting (#25) in case 1:14-cv-11360-DPW, Voluntary Motion to Dismiss; granting without prejudice (#36) in case 1:14-cv-11158-DPW, Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss; granting (#17) in case 1:14-cv-14009-DPW, Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; all at the direction of the Court made at the hearing held 6/19/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
June 19, 2015 Filing 1221 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status/Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2015; jointly proposed Case Management Order No. 15 adopted by the Court; #1178 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Master Complaint - GRANTED with recognition of pltffs' agreement to defts' response re experts re #1196 ; Stipulation of Dismissals Without Prejudice for Purpose of Changing "Home Forum" addressed; #1179 Motion to Compel (Kyles v. FMCH, et al., MDL 13-cv-10831-DPW) noted as withdrawn; #1197 Motion to Withdraw Voluntary Motion to Dismiss and Dkt No. 39 in Jones v. FMCNA, et al., MDL No. 14-cv-11360-DPW - DENIED; Voluntary Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. No. 25 in Jones v. FMCNA, et al., MDL No. 14-cv-11360-DPW - GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to pursuit of Jones v. FMCNA, et al., MDL No. 15-cv-11617-DPW; a status report re St. Louis, Missouri case no. 1322-cc-09797-10to be filed; Court is inclined to issue a show cause order re duplicate case filing; (#17 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice in Thames v. FMCNA, et al., MDL 14-cv-14009-DPW) - GRANTED to pursuit of Massachusetts State Court case; Court enters (#12 in Miller v. FMCNA, et al., MDL 15-cv-10218-DPW) Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice to pursuit of St. Louis State Court case; #1189 Assented to Motion to Sever Plaintiffs, (#43 in Brown, et al. v. FMCNA, et al., MDL 14-cv-12402-DPW), and (#30 in Carter, et al. v. FMCNA, et al., MDL 14-cv-13883-DPW) Assented to Motions to Sever Plaintiffs - GRANTED; (#36 in Stockton v. FMCNA, et al., MDL 14-cv-11158-DPW) Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to pursuit of 14-cv-13394-DPW; Notice of Appeal by State of Louisiana and Common Benefit Fund issues addressed; Court Orders further briefing re Cook v. FMCNA, et al., MDL 14-cv-14412-DPW) due by 6/29/15. Barnes, Tarricone, Rasmussen, Shaul, and LeBlanc for the pltffs; Cummings, Starkey, Castle (in-house-counsel), Newsom, Hodge, Kettlewell, and Durant for the defts (adminn, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 1210 Withdrawal of motion: #1179 MOTION to Compel filed by Milta Kyles.. (Millrood, Tobias)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1209 MANDATE of USCA as to #898 Notice of Appeal filed by Jim Hood. Appeal #898 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1208 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Newsom on behalf of Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. (Newsom, Kevin)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1207 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh Anne Hodge on behalf of Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. (Hodge, Leigh Anne)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1206 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Daly on behalf of Milta Kyles (Daly, Michael)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1205 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Holland on behalf of Melissa Lewis (Holland, Eric)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1204 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Holland on behalf of Barbara Harper (Holland, Eric)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1203 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Holland on behalf of Charity Faulkner (Holland, Eric)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1202 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Holland on behalf of Yvonne Evans (Holland, Eric)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1201 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. Document received: Joint Agenda for MDL Status Hearing on June 19, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferraro, Julie)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1200 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Seth Crompton on behalf of Vanessa H. Moore (Crompton, Randall)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1199 Conditional Transfer order number 88 in MDL 2428 dated 6/17/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 16, 2015 Filing 1198 Opposition re #1179 MOTION to Compel the Appearance of Dr. Ramachandran for a Second Deposition and the Production of Documents filed by Fresenius Granuflo/Naturalyte Dialysate Products Liability Litigation, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Hodge, Leigh Anne)
June 16, 2015 Filing 1197 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss by Victor Jones.(Rasmussen, Kristian)
June 16, 2015 Filing 1196 RESPONSE to Motion re #1178 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Master Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Silva, Sara)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1195 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING CONFERENCE/HEARING (time only): Status/Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing of 6/19/2015 only, rescheduled for 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1194 NOTICE by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. re #1177 MOTION for Relief from CMO11's Rebuttal Expert Report Deadline as Applied to Plaintiffs' Expert Timothy Ulatowski "FMCNA's Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion for Relief from CMO 11's Rebuttal Expert Report Deadline as Applied to Plaintiffs' Expert Timothy Ulatowski" (Durant, Maria)
June 11, 2015 Filing 1193 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell L. Cochran on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Cochran, Darrell)
June 10, 2015 Filing 1192 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alice Cox. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Robert)
June 9, 2015 Filing 1191 NOTICE of Appearance by Tobias Millrood on behalf of Milta Kyles (Millrood, Tobias)
June 9, 2015 Filing 1190 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Matthew Leckman on behalf of Milta Kyles (Leckman, T.)
June 9, 2015 Filing 1189 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
June 8, 2015 Filing 1187 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2428 dated 6/8/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1186 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #954 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and Hospital Defendants (Newsom, Kevin)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1185 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #896 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Northridge Dialysis Center, LLC (Newsom, Kevin)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1184 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS.Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1183 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1182 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS.Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
June 3, 2015 Filing 1181 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW, 1:15-cv-11530-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett)
June 2, 2015 Filing 1179 MOTION to Compel by Milta Kyles. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Pogust, Harris)
June 2, 2015 Filing 1178 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Master Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Master Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Tarricone, Anthony)
May 29, 2015 Filing 1177 MOTION for Relief from CMO11's Rebuttal Expert Report Deadline as Applied to Plaintiffs' Expert Timothy Ulatowski by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kettlewell, William)
May 28, 2015 Filing 1176 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell L. Cochran on behalf of Consolidated Plaintiffs (Cochran, Darrell)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1175 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kerry Queiroz. (Fiske, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1174 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Daisy Shaver. (Fiske, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1173 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Roy McDonald. (Fiske, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1172 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Pamela Holman. (Fiske, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1171 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Natalie Hannah. (Fiske, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1170 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Dwain Cox. (Fiske, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1169 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by David Brown, Sr.. (Fiske, John)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1168 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by SANDRA WHITNEY. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1167 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by MICHAEL V. TOZZI. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1166 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by LORI STOKES. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1165 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by CARLOS STOKES. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1164 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by SONJIA SIMPSON. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1163 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by MELINDA ROCKWELL. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1162 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Vanessa Presley. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1161 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by DIANE PAGE. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1160 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cynthia Judkins. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1159 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Phyllis Price. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1158 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by IRMGARD NELSON. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1157 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by SHEENA JOYCE. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1156 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Nicole Montibello. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1155 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Laurine Nicholson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1154 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by VALERIE HOPKINS. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1153 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Patricia Gould. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1152 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by JENNIE SAMUELS. (Seeger, Christopher)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1151 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Shelly Harrison. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1150 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Michele Folk. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1149 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Brian Gooden. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1148 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Mary Brown. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1147 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sydell Green. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1146 Response by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc. To Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Hodge, Leigh Anne)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1145 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Amelia West. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1144 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Deborah Swigert, Aaron W. Porterfield. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1143 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Stacy Payne. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1142 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Emma Hernandez. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1141 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Antonio McCollum. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1140 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Melissa Mott Harvey. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1139 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BERNIS E. TEAGUE. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1138 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Barbara Reed. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1137 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Joan Ornoski. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1136 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Adrienne Grace. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1135 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Andy Lettas. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1134 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Charles Snell. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1133 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Johnnie Mae Estelle. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1132 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Velta Loredo. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1131 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Mary Cox. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1130 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Larry Thompson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1129 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Paula Vaughn. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1128 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kevin Michael Parsons. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1127 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Debra Patterson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1126 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Antoinette Teresa Lee. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1125 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Eric Johnson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1124 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Jointly Proposed Case Management Order No. 15 (Bellwether Phase II Discovery Protocol). (Tarricone, Anthony) (Main Document 1124 replaced on 5/27/2015) (Gioia, AnaMaria). Modified docket text on 5/27/2015 (Gioia, AnaMaria).
May 27, 2015 Filing 1123 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Shirley Thurman. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1122 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Linda Lucas. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1121 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1120 Transcript of Status and Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on May 15, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 6/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
May 27, 2015 Filing 1119 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Monica McVey. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1118 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kenya Cook. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1117 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sharron McLean. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1116 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Suzan Stitchick. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1115 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Tamika Banks. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1114 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ronald Brewer. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1113 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Betty Mauro. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1112 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Linda Gray Thompson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1111 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Danny L. Howard. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1110 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Miriam Carrion. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1109 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Patricia J. Anderson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1108 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cheryl McKeithen. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1107 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Autumn Glenn. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1106 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Janice Train. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1105 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Susanna Jean Mays. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1104 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Shalonda May. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1103 Conditional Transfer order number 87 in MDL 2428 dated 5/27/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1102 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Annette Jefferson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1101 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Larry Powell. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1100 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Margaret Zinerco. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1099 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Carolyn Schweppenheiser. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1098 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Albert Jones. (Rasmussen, Kristian) (Main Document 1098 replaced on 5/27/2015) (Gioia, AnaMaria).
May 27, 2015 Filing 1097 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Geraldine Gaines. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1096 USCA Judgment as to #898 Notice of Appeal filed by Jim Hood. (Paine, Matthew)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1095 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by LaFacadia Henderson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1094 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Debbie Boswell. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1093 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Boyd Townsend. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1092 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Shirlene Smith. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1091 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Carolyn Reynolds. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1090 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Monique Oliver-Manning. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1089 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Opal Irene Mischke. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1088 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ocie B. Jackson. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1087 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Janice Harris. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1086 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Theresa Marino. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1085 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Wendy Horner. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1084 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kimberly Bedford. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1083 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by James R Smith. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1081 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jeffrey Allen Cooke. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1080 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Dorothy B. Council. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1079 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by James D. Mills. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1078 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Charlene Hampton. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1077 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Tootsie Pollard. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1076 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Lisa Holck. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1075 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Thomas Rogers. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1074 NOTICE by Thomas Rogers of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1073 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Glenda Knighton. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1072 NOTICE by Glenda Knighton of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1071 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bettyann Hagerty-Long. (Rasmussen, Kristian)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1070 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Margie McFall. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1069 NOTICE by Margie McFall of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1068 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sherrill Moore. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1067 NOTICE by Sherrill Moore of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1066 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Anna Maglione. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 26, 2015 Filing 1065 NOTICE by Anna Maglione of Withdrawal of Motion To Dismiss (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1064 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice for Purpose of Changing "Home Forum" Designation by Karita Jackson. (Borgess, Pamela)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1063 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Holland on behalf of Vanessa H. Moore (Holland, Eric)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1062 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Marie Daugherty. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1061 NOTICE by Marie Daugherty of Withdrawal of Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1060 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ivan Faulks. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1059 NOTICE by Ivan Faulks of Withdrawal of Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1058 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cindy Cox. (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1057 NOTICE by Cindy Cox of Withdrawal of Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice (Cunningham, Merritt)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1056 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1055 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Todd Miller. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lovett, Jarrett)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1055 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd Miller Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5563166 by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silva, Sara)
May 16, 2015 Filing 1180 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (#977) Motion to Sever in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW; granting (#35) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-11484-DPW; granting (#40) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-12023-DPW; granting (#37) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-12106-DPW; granting (#39) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-12107-DPW; granting (#38) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-12128-DPW; granting (#33) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-12460-DPW; granting (#33) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-12461-DPW; granting (#27) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-13551-DPW; granting (#95) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-14412-DPW; granting (#47) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-10298-DPW; granting (#52) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-10299-DPW; granting (#55) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-10300-DPW; granting (#54) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-10301-DPW; granting (#54) Motion to Sever; granting (#55) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-10302-DPW; granting (#57) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-10303-DPW; granting (#57) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-10304-DPW; finding as moot (#40) Motion to Sever; granting (#41) Motion to Sever in case 1:15-cv-11530-DPW. See Dkt Entry #1054 in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
May 16, 2015 Filing 1054 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered to make clear the granting of #973 Motion to Sever; the granting of #978 Motion to Sever; the granting #979 of Motion to Sever and the granting of #989 Motion to Sever. These grants are to facilitate the assignment of separate case numbers for each of the plaintiff's actions and without prejudice to the independent resolution of motions to remand or to dismiss that may attend each of the separate actions. (Woodlock, Douglas)
May 15, 2015 Filing 1188 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status/Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2015; parties report to the Court of an agreement made re Phase II Bellwether Deposition Discovery (Dkt. Nos. 981/982); attachment A to Joint Status Report (Dkt. No. 1053) addressed and in further connection to Church v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14-cv-10836 and Moses v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14-cv-10848; Motions to Sever addressed and an Order shall issue as such; motions to remand and sever in Cook v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14cv14412 (Dkt. Nos. 45/86/89/96/97) TAKEN UNDER ADVISMENT; motion to sever in Arballo v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14-cv-10546 (Dkt. No. 55) TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; motion to dismiss in Jones v. FMCNA (Dkt. No. 25), motion to dismiss in Thames v. FMCNA, et al (Dkt. No. 17), and notice of voluntary dismissal in Miller v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 15-cv-10218 set for hearing on 6/19/15 at 2:30 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock; State of Louisiana trial has been set; next status/scheduling conference and motion hearing set in this matter set for 6/19/15 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Barnes, McCallister, Munson, Griffin, Weinkowitz, and Sill for the pltffs; Castle, Kettlewell, Newsom, Hall, Cummings, Lee, Hull, Jr., and Adams for the deftsAssociated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(adminn, )
May 15, 2015 Filing 1082 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Parties report to the Court of an agreement made re Phase II Bellwether Deposition Discovery (Dkt. Nos. 981/982); attachment A to Joint Status Report (Dkt. No. 1053) addressed and in further connection to Church v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14-cv-10836 and Moses v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14-cv-10848; Motions to Sever addressed and an Order shall issue as such; motions to remand and sever in Cook v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14cv14412 (Dkt. Nos. 45/86/89/96/97) TAKEN UNDER ADVISMENT; motion to sever in Arballo v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 14-cv-10546 (Dkt. No. 55) TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; motion to dismiss in Jones v. FMCNA (Dkt. No. 25), motion to dismiss in Thames v. FMCNA, et al (Dkt. No. 17), and notice of voluntary dismissal in Miller v. FMCNA, et al, case no. 15-cv-10218 set for hearing on 6/19/15 at 2:30 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock; State of Louisiana trial has been set; next status/scheduling conference and motion hearing set in this matter set for 6/19/15 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Barnes, McCallister, Munson, Griffin, Weinkowitz, and Sill for the pltffs; Castle, Kettlewell, Newsom, Hall, Cummings, Lee, Hull, Jr., and Adams for the deftsAssociated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.) (adminn, )
May 13, 2015 Filing 1053 STATUS REPORT Agreed Upon Agenda for May 15, 2015 Status Conference by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Tarricone, Anthony)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1052 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jackie Wilson. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1051 NOTICE by Jackie Wilson re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1050 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Carol Solow. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1049 NOTICE by Carol Solow re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1048 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Eric Young. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1047 NOTICE by Eric Young re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1046 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Barbara Shamesman. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1045 NOTICE by Barbara Shamesman re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1044 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dapthay Willis. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1043 NOTICE by Dapthay Willis re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1042 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Herbert Roundtree. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1041 NOTICE by Herbert Roundtree re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1040 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Charlene Stauber. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1039 NOTICE by Charlene Stauber re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1038 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wayne Pearce. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1037 NOTICE by Wayne Pearce re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1036 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Annie Paige. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1035 NOTICE by Annie Paige re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1034 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rosa Munoz. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1033 NOTICE by Rosa Munoz re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1032 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Barbara Myrick. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1031 NOTICE by Barbara Myrick re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1030 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Latoya Carter. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1029 NOTICE by Latoya Carter re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1028 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lilian MacGregor. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1027 NOTICE by Lilian MacGregor re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1026 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Beverly Dubin. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1025 NOTICE by Beverly Dubin re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1024 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Nakeisha Wolfe. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1023 NOTICE by Nakeisha Wolfe re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1022 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sandra Rutledge. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1021 NOTICE by Sandra Rutledge re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1020 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wendy Child. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1019 NOTICE by Wendy Child re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1018 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jeffrey Eidelberg. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1017 NOTICE by Jeffrey Eidelberg re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1016 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Katrina Carter. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1015 NOTICE by Katrina Carter re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1014 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Delores Brown. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1013 NOTICE by Delores Brown re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1012 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jackson Robertson. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1011 NOTICE by Jackson Robertson re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1010 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Thomas Bankston. (Segars, James)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1009 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Brenda Fenwick. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1008 NOTICE by Brenda Fenwick re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1007 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mary Sexton. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1006 NOTICE by Mary Sexton re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1005 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anne Roberts. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1004 NOTICE by Anne Roberts re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1003 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mable Neither. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1002 NOTICE by Mable Neither re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1001 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aaron Metcalf. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1000 NOTICE by Aaron Metcalf re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 999 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Marvin McKenzie. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 998 NOTICE by Marvin McKenzie re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 997 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Arthur Hill. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 996 NOTICE by Arthur Hill re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 995 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Brian Campbell. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 994 NOTICE by Brian Campbell re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 993 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lilian Bray. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 992 NOTICE by Lilian Bray re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 991 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Vicky Buggs. (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 12, 2015 Filing 990 NOTICE by Vicky Buggs re #952 Stipulation of Dismissal,, Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 3/25/15 (Whitehead, Clarence)
May 11, 2015 Filing 989 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
May 8, 2015 Filing 988 STIPULATION of Dismissal motion to dismiss without prejudice pursuant to the joint proposed CMO No. 7 by Jacqueline Borge. (Presby, Ellen)
May 8, 2015 Filing 987 REPLY to Response to #954 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs and Hospital Defendants filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Newsom, Kevin)
May 4, 2015 Filing 986 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Next Hearings. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Status Conference/Scheduling set for 7/17/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
May 4, 2015 Filing 984 Withdrawal of motion: #960 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Thomas Bankston.. (Segars, James)
April 28, 2015 Filing 982 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. Document received: Memorandum in Support of Proposed Phase II Discovery Protocol. (Kettlewell, William)
April 28, 2015 Filing 981 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Position Re: Scope of Phase II Bellwether Deposition Discovery [Document Relates to Docket No. 939]. (Tarricone, Anthony)
April 27, 2015 Filing 980 MANDATE of USCA as to #899 Notice of Appeal filed by The State of Louisiana. Appeal #899 Terminated (Paine, Matthew)
April 24, 2015 Filing 979 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
April 23, 2015 Filing 978 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 977 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
April 21, 2015 Filing 976 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 21, 2015 Filing 975 Transcript of Status and Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on April 10, 2015, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com Redaction Request due 5/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 12/7/2015 (Scalfani, Deborah).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 974 Order Lifting Stay in MDL 2428 dated 4/17/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 14, 2015 Filing 973 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #971 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Newsom, Kevin)
April 10, 2015 Filing 985 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (#949) Motion to Compel, granting and reserving ruling (#954) Motion to Sever, and granting (#971) Motion to Sever all filed in case 1:13-md-02428-DPW; granting (#55) Assented to Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-10381-DPW; granting (#56) Assented to Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-10383-DPW; granting (#65) Assented to Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-12404-DPW; granting and reserving ruling (#89) Motion to Sever in case 1:14-cv-14412-DPW; as reflected in the Clerk's Notes for the hearing held on 4/10/15. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02428-DPW et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
April 10, 2015 Filing 983 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status/Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2015; (#943) jointly proposed amendment to CMO No. 7 and exhibit A attached thereto, and in this connection, (#34) Stipulation of Dismissal filed in case no. 14-10513, Buggs v. FMCNA, et al., addressed; no action taken at this time; further briefing due 4/24/15; (#971 in 13-2428, In Re Fresenius), (#119 in Nunez et al v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-11986), (#102 in Casian et al v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-12529), (#55 in Rasing et al v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 14-10381), (#56 in Schmidt et al v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 14-10383), and (#65 in Yassin et al v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 14-12404) assented to Motions to Sever - GRANTED; move for severance expected in Pryor et al v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 15-11530; Walter L. Weisman to be dismissed by stipulation in case nos. 14-10381, 14-10383, and 14-12404; (#25 in Jones v. FMCNA, et al., MDL No. 14-11360) Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss tabled for 5/15/15 hearing; (#16 in Thames v. FMCNA, et al. MDL No. 14-14009) Stipulation of Dismissal tabled for 5/15/15 hearing; (#954 in 13-2428, and #89 in 14-14412 Cook v. FMCNA, et al) Motions GRANTED as to severing plaintiffs, and reserved for further hearing as to claim/defendant severance; further briefing by pltffs and hospital/clinic defts by 5/1/15; pltffs reply in support due 5/8/15; motions to remand (Oklahoma plaintiffs) in said cases set for 5/15/15; further hearing set for 5/15/15 in Arballo v. FMCNA et al., MDL No. 14-10546; move for class certification expected in case nos. 14-10413, Rodriguez v. FMCNA, et al., 12-12022 Jones v. FMCNA, et al., 13-10843, Berzas v. FMCNA, et al., 13-11828, Brysten v. FMCNA, et al., and 13-12959, Benoit v. FMCNA, et al.; (#949 in case 13-2428) Plaintiffs Motion to Compel - GRANTED as stated on the record; bellwether case selections addressed (2nd phase discovery) re Avitia v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-12762, Battle v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-12717, Burkes v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 14-10712, Conway v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 14-10594, Dial v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 14-11101, Dickson v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-10836, Hall v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 14-11302, Kyles v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-10831, Lastorka v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-13066, and Sims v. FMCNA et al, MDL No. 13-10109; further briefing to filed; daubert motions remain due by 10/27/15; a hearing will be set if there any discovery disputes arise; scheduling of daubert hearings to be revisited; next Status/Scheduling Conferences set for 5/15/15, 6/19/15, 7/17/15, and 8/7/15 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Tarricone, Gotz, Sices, McAllister, Sill, Bergin and Aumais for the pltffs; Kettlewell, Newsom, Hodge, Cummings, Starkey, Bennett, Castle, and Adams for the defts) (Lovett, Jarrett)
April 8, 2015 Filing 972 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. Document received: Proposed Joint Agenda for Status Hearing on April 10, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ferraro, Julie)
April 8, 2015 Filing 971 Assented to MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.,, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Newsom, Kevin)
April 7, 2015 Filing 970 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2428 dated the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Douglas P. Woodlock for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 3, 2015 Filing 969 SEALED #968 Opposition re #949 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Depositions filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6)(Moore, Kellyann)
April 3, 2015 Filing 968 Opposition re #949 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Depositions filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Letter, #4 Exhibit Under Seal, #5 Exhibit Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Under Seal, #7 Exhibit Letter, #8 Exhibit Order, #9 Exhibit Notice, #10 Exhibit Notice, #11 Exhibit Email, #12 Exhibit Letter)(Silva, Sara)
April 3, 2015 Filing 967 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #965 Assented to Motion to File Under Seal. (Lovett, Jarrett)
April 2, 2015 Filing 966 USCA Judgment as to #899 Notice of Appeal filed by The State of Louisiana (Paine, Matthew)
April 2, 2015 Filing 965 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc..(Silva, Sara) Modified on 4/3/2015 to correct event used (Moore, Kellyann).
March 31, 2015 Filing 964 STATUS REPORT Agreed Upon Dates for Future MDL Status Hearings by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Tarricone, Anthony)
March 27, 2015 Filing 963 COMPLAINT against Henry payton Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5484185 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Henry payton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Edward)
March 27, 2015 Filing 962 ***Filed in MDL case in error. New case 1:15cv11463DPW opened*** COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5484181 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Florence Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Edward)
March 27, 2015