Elliott-Lewis et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ebonia Elliott-Lewis and United States of America
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv13155
Filed: August 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.Abbott's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 159 ) is ALLOWED, and Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 164 ) is DENIED.SO ORDERED. (Lara, Miguel)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING Defendant's 76 Motion to Dismiss Count IV of the First Amended Complaint. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 61 MOTION to Amend Complaint and file First Amended Complaint. See Attached Order.(DaSilva, Carolina)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ALLOWING 53 MOTION from Judgment re: 44 Memorandum & ORDER; DENYING 54 MOTION to Amend Complaint. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott-Lewis et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebonia Elliott-Lewis
Represented By: David P. Angueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Henry J Depippo
Represented By: Peter E. Gelhaar
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Hess
Represented By: Andrew Kassof
Represented By: Timothy H. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?