Anderson v. Donahoe
Plaintiff: Diping Y. Anderson
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Case Number: 1:2014cv13380
Filed: August 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Patti B. Saris
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Anderson's motion to amend the judgment (Dkt. No. 191 ) is DENIED and Brady's motion to intervene (Dkt. No. 192 ) is DENIED as moot.SO ORDERED.(Lara, Miguel)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The Court DENIES Anderson's motion to alter or amend the judgment, or, in the alternative, re-open the record on remedies (Docket No. 177 ). See ORDER for Details. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The Court DENIES Anderson's motion for front pay (Docket No. 151 ). The Court ALLOWS Anderson's motion for $286,275 in attorney fees, payable to attorney James Brady (Docket No. 150 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. The Plaintiff's Motion to Alter Judgment (Docket No. 125 ) is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. The Plaintiff's Motion for Assessment of Pre-Judgment Interest (Docket No. 127 ) is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. The Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Untimely Motion for Attorney's Fees (Docket No. 126 ) is ALLOWED. The Defendants Motion for Reconsideration (Docket No. 128 ) is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in par t.Both parties shall, within fourteen days, supplement the record on the appropriate amount of front pay. Anderson shall, within fourteen days, file a petition for attorneys fees. Any opposition to the petition for attorney's fees shall be filed within fourteen days after that. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM and ORDER entered. This Court DENIES the defendant's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 44 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diping Y. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Mazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?