Citibank, N.A. v. Najda et al
Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Defendant: Renee Anna Najda, Andrew Najda and Any and All Occupants
Case Number: 1:2014cv13593
Filed: September 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered. (Halley, Taylor)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered denying 209 Motion to Continue; granting 211 Motion to Withdraw ; denying 214 Motion to Allow Examination and Testing of a Note ; Allowing nunc pro tunc as to Robert A. Silverman. The deadline s hall be extended to July 3, 2017, for the sole purpose of allowing Mr. Silverman time to complete his expert appraisal report. The Motion is otherwise DENIED 215 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 216 Motion for Clarification ; denying 217 Motion to Strike ; denying 222 Motion for Leave to File Document (Halley, Taylor)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered granting 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 110 Motion for Protective Order; denying 113 Motion to Compel; granting 117 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 121 Motion to Comp el; denying 122 Motion to Compel; denying 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 130 Motion to Compel; denying 131 Motion to Compel; denying 136 Motion to Compel; denying 144 Motion to Compel; denying 152 Motion to Compel; granting 161 Motion to Substitute Party. PennyMac, Corp. and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC terminated; denying 169 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 170 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electron ic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; gr anting 181 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - L eave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting 188 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in acc ordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting 193 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting 194 Motion f or Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted o n (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; denying 195 Motion for Sanctions; granting 197 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; denying 200 Motion for Extension of Time ( Copy of the Opinion and Order mailed out to Renee Anna Najda and Andrew Najda on 3/29/17) (Lyness, Paul)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered granting 90 Motion for Reconsideration ( Copy of Order mailed out to the Najdas). (Lyness, Paul)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered finding as moot 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 72 Motion to S tay; denying without prejudice 76 Motion for Leave to File Document ; finding as moot 78 Motion for Joinder; granting Nunc Pro Tunc 79 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss ( Copy of this Opinion and Order mailed out to defendants). (Lyness, Paul)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citibank, N.A. v. Najda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Anna Najda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Najda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and All Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?