Satish Emrit v. National Grid, Inc & Community Action Partnership of Providence (CAPP)
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: National Grid, Inc and Community Action Partnership of Providence (CAPP)
Case Number: 1:2014cv14769
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Halley, Taylor) (Main Document 32 replaced on 6/30/2017) (Halley, Taylor).
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: OPINION and ORDER entered granting 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Halley, Taylor) (Main Document 24 replaced on 7/20/2016 due to incorrect filing date on ORDER) (Halley, Taylor). Modified on 7/20/2016 (Halley, Taylor).
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is ALLOWED; Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 5) is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment (Docket No. 6) is DENIED;Plaintiff's Motion to Subpoena Witnesses (Docket No. 7) is DENIED;Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Docket No. 8) is DENIED;Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 9) i s DENIED;As a pro se litigant, Plaintiff may not represent the interests of his roommate;The Court DECLINES to appoint pro bono counsel;The Clerk shall issue summonses as to National Grid, Inc. and Community Action Partnership of Providence; The Cler k shall send the summonses, a copy of the Complaint, and this Memorandum and Order to the plaintiff, who must thereafter serve the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). The plaintiff may elect to have service made by th e United States Marshal Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summonses, Complaint, and this Memorandum and Order upon the defendants, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of ser vice to be advanced by the United States Marshal Service. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 120 days from the date of issuance of summonses to complete service. Failure to effect timely service may result in a dismissal of this action.(PSSA, 1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satish Emrit v. National Grid, Inc & Community Action Partnership of Providence (CAPP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Action Partnership of Providence (CAPP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?