Jenkins v. City of Taunton et al
Plaintiff: Rosemary Jenkins
Defendant: City of Taunton, Edward Walsh, Mark Brady, Robert Kramer, Matthew Skwarto, Ralph Schlageter, Jeffrey Martin and Fred Bolton
Case Number: 1:2015cv10003
Filed: January 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: William G. Young
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. The issues having been duly heard and decisions rendered, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that plaintiff Rosemary Jenkins take nothing and that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Patton, Christine)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Defendants' Motion to Correct the Summary Judgment Record (Docket Entry # 76 ); Defendants' Supplemental Motion to Correct the Summary Judgment Record (Docket Entry # 81 ). The motions to correct (Docket Entry ## 76 , 81 ) are DENIED. (Patton, Christine)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry # 58 ). The motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry # 58 ) is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. After num erous extensions of the dispositive motion deadline, there shall be no further extensions in this case, which plaintiff filed in January 2015. The parties shall file the status report relative to Count XIV within 14 days. This court will conduct a status conference on November 9, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. to set a trial date. (Patton, Christine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. City of Taunton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Jenkins
Represented By: Anthony I. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Taunton
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Walsh
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brady
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kramer
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Skwarto
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Schlageter
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Martin
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Bolton
Represented By: Thomas R Donohue
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?