Ivymedia Corporation v. Ilikebus, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ivymedia Corporation
Defendant: Ilikebus, Inc., Alan Zou, Tong Wei and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2015cv11918
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 11:548
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. re 127 Objection filed by Tong Wei, Ilikebus, Inc., Alan Zou, 110 MOTION in Limine filed by Tong Wei, Ilikebus, Inc., Alan Zou SEE ATTACHED ORDER(Caruso, Stephanie)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered In accordance with the foregoing, defendant's motion for sanctions (Docket No. 107 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Defendants may renew their motion if plaintiff attempts to offer at trial any evidence of damages not disclosed to defendants as required herein. So Ordered. (Caruso, Stephanie)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDERIn accordance with the foregoing, defendants motion for summary judgment is, with respect to 1) the claim that defendants infringed the 2005 copyright and 2) plaintiffs request for statutory damages and attorneys fees, ALLOWED but is otherwise DENIED. So ordered.(Caruso, Stephanie)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. re 99 MOTION to Compel Disclosure and Document Production filed by Tong Wei, Ilikebus, Inc., Alan Zou In accordance with the foregoing, defendants motion to compel is ALLOWED but their request for reimbursement of the expense of filing the motion is DENIED without prejudice.(Caruso, Stephanie)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDERIn accordance with the foregoing, plaintiffs motion to amend the complaint (Docket No. 80) is ALLOWED and defendants motion to strike (Docket No. 88) is DENIED.The current pre-trial schedule is modified as follows:02/28/2017 Additional discovery on the amendments to the complaint shall be completed;03/14/2017 Supplement to defendants memorandum in support of their motion for summary judgment due (10 pages or less);03/21/2017 Supplement to plaintiffs opposition to summary judgment motion due (10 pages or less);05/09/2017 Motions in limine due;05/16/2017 Responses to in limine motions, lists of witnesses and exhibits, due; Final pretrial conference set for 5/24/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton;Jury Trial set for 5/30/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton (Caruso, Stephanie)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 68 Motion for Protective Order "defendant's motion for a protective order (Docket No. 68) is ALLOWED. Plaintiff must either depose the corporate officers 1) in Virginia or Maryland or within 100 miles of where they live, work or regularly transact business or 2)in Massachusetts and reimburse defendants for the reasonable expenses incurred. Plaintiff may also consider taking the depositions by video teleconference, telephone or other remote electronic means." See attached Order. (Caruso, Stephanie)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED MEMORANDUM & ORDER entered 1) plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the complaint (Docket No. 47 ) is DENIED,2) defendants motion for leave to amend the answer (Docket No. 48 ) is DENIED,3) defendant s motion to amend the scheduling order (Docket No. 49 ) is DENIED, and4) the joint motion to amend the scheduling order (Docket No. 58 ) is ALLOWED.The case will proceed with IvyMedias claim of copyright infringement. The pre-trial sc hedule is amended as follows:all fact discovery shall be completed by June 15, 2016; plaintiffs experts, if any, shall be designated and Rule 26 reports exchanged on or before June 30, 2016;defendants experts, if any, shall be designated and Rule 26 reports exchanged on or before July 31, 2016; expert depositions shall be completed by August 31, 2016; dispositive motions shall be filed by September 30, 2016; oppositions to dispositive motions shall be filed by October 31, 2016;the final pretrial conference will be held on Thursday, February 2, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.; and trial shall commence on Monday, February 6, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.If the parties choose to continue the Alternative Dispute Resolution hearing, they may make such a request to Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. (Caruso, Stephanie)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MEMORANDUM & ORDER entered. The defendants 16 motion to dismiss, with respect to Counts II through VI, is ALLOWED, but is otherwise DENIED; the defendants 16 motion for a more definite statement is DENIED; and the plaintiff's 2 motion for a temporary restraining order and for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. (Danieli, Chris)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivymedia Corporation v. Ilikebus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivymedia Corporation
Represented By: Ye Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilikebus, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary C. Kleinsasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Zou
Represented By: Zachary C. Kleinsasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tong Wei
Represented By: Zachary C. Kleinsasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?