Diaz v. Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Luis Diaz
Defendant: Jeremy Drew, Steven Adam, Burns, Julie Flanagan, Kasprzak, Sawash, Any all Officials Involved in the Proceedings of Disciplinary Tickets and Grievances, D.D.U Director, John Does and William Harrold
Case Number: 1:2016cv11579
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Norfolk
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. In accordance with the foregoing, defendants motion to dismiss for failure to comply with a court order (Docket No. 88 ) is ALLOWED and plaintiffs motions (Docket Nos. 64 , 72 , 75 , 84 , 85 and 90 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint in compliance with the memorandum and order on or before April 30, 2018. So ordered.(Franklin, Yvonne)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "For all the reasons stated, Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement (# 66 ) is ALLOWED. Diaz shall, within 60 days of this Order, file an amended complaint (s tyled as the "First Amended Complaint") in which all defendants, facts, alleged wrongdoing, grounds for relief, and specific relief sought are to be identified in a way that comports with this Order and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. "(Moore, Kellyann)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 48 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Luis Diaz, denying as moot 27 MOTION for Hearing filed by Luis Diaz, 57 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Luis Diaz, granting 52 MOTION for Exemption from Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) filed by Burns, Jeremy Drew, William Harrold, D.D.U Director, Kasprzak, Sawash, denying 45 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Luis Diaz, granting 51 M OTION for Extension of Time to May 12, 2017 to Respond to the Complaint filed by Burns, Jeremy Drew, William Harrold, D.D.U Director, Kasprzak, Sawash, denying 53 MOTION for Hearing re 45 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Luis Diaz, and taking under advisement 64 Motion for Injunctive Relief to preserve video footage. (Lima, Christine)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summonses as to all defendants except Any all Officials Involved in the Proceedings of Disciplinary Tickets and Grievances, and John Does." The plaintiff shall ensure that each defendant as to whom a summons issues is served with (1) the summons; (2) the complaint; (3) the motion for injunctive relief and su pplement thereto; and (4) this order. Service must be within 90 days of the date the summonses issue. Service must be made in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 4.1. Because the plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have the United States Marshals Service complete service with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. (PSSA, 3)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. Within 21 days of this Procedural Order, plaintiff either shall (1) pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees; or (2) file an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified pri son account statement. Failure of the plaintiff to comply with this directive may result in the dismissal of this action. (Copy of order and form IFP application mailed to plaintiff on 8/11/2016; copy of order sent to MCI Cedar Junction treasurer on 8/11/2016.)(PSSA, 3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasprzak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any all Officials Involved in the Proceedings of Disciplinary Tickets and Grievances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.D.U Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Harrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?