American Academy of Pediatrics et al v. United States Food and Drug Administration
Plaintiff: American Academy of Pediatrics, Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc., American Cancer Society, Inc., American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Inc., American Heart Association, Inc., American Lung Association, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Truth Initiative Foundation, Ted Kremer, Jonathan Winickoff and Lynda Young
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv11985
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. FDA is ordered to submit its final rule mandating colorgraphic warnings on cigarette packs and in cigarette advertisements for publication in the Federal Register by March 15, 2020. SEE attached Order. (MacDonald, Gail)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING extension of time requested in Emergency Motion for Reconsideration 58 as outlined in the attached Order. (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 3/21/2019 (MacDonald, Gail).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ALLOWING Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING FDA's 32 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Academy of Pediatrics et al v. United States Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Chapter of American Academy of Pediatrics, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Cancer Society, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Heart Association, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Lung Association
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truth Initiative Foundation
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Kremer
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Winickoff
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Young
Represented By: Mark E. Greenwold
Represented By: Dennis A. Henigan
Represented By: Scott P. Lewis
Represented By: Jessica A. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?