BRT Management LLC v. Malden Storage LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRT Management LLC
Defendant: Malden Storage LLC, Plain Avenue Storage LLC and Banner Drive Storage LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv10005
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Plymouth
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The Court has awarded prejudgment interest as reflected in the final judgment. So Ordered.(McDonagh, Christina)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Defendants’ Motion for Injunctive Relief [Docket No. 208 ] and Motion for Real Estate Attachment and Seizure of Vehicles [Docket No. 210 ] are GRANTED in part and DENIED in pa rt. Defendants’ Motion to Reach and Apply Interests in LLCs [Docket No. 217 ] is DENIED without prejudice. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff BRT Management, LLC, and all persons or entities with knowledge of this Order acting in concert with it, are hereby enjoined from any sale, transfer, conveyance, or encumbrance of its property or other assets, other than in the ordinary course of business, such as payments to sub-contractors, government entities, lenders , employees, and vendors. BRT Management, LLC will not be permitted to make any payments or transfers to Brian Wallace, or any other members of BRT Management, LLC, any of Brian Wallace’s family members, or any persons or entities controlled by or affiliated with them. Such actions will, however, be permitted if BRT Management, LLC’s unencumbered net assets, after any such sale, transfer, conveyance, or encumbrance, not including good will, would total not less than $8,000,000.< /BLOCKQUOTE> 2. Plaintiff Brian Wallace, and all persons or entities with knowledge of this Order acting in concert with him, are hereby enjoined from any sale, transfer, conveyance, or encumbrance of his property or other assets t hat would have the effect of reducing the value of his unencumbered net assets below $378,828.25. 3. Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P., Rule 4.1, a writ of attachment shall issue as to real property and vehicles of Brian Wallace in Massachusetts, with the exception of his Volkswagen Touareg, in the amount of $378,828.25, in order to satisfy the likely final judgment in this case. SO Ordered.(McDonagh, Christina)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR DIRECTED VERDICT (Halley, Taylor)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Halley, Taylor)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 98 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Halley, Taylor)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE USE OF LATE-PRODUCED DOCUMENTS (Halley, Taylor)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. (Schultz, Allison)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRT Management LLC v. Malden Storage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRT Management LLC
Represented By: John S. Davagian, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malden Storage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plain Avenue Storage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Drive Storage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?