Worman et al v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Nicholas Andrew Feld, Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, David Seth Worman, On Target Training, Inc. and Anthony Linden
Defendant: Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey and Charles D. Baker
Case Number: 1:2017cv10107
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2018 105 Letter from James Murray. (Paine, Matthew)
July 27, 2018 104 Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Significant Documents by James Murray. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Paine, Matthew)
June 19, 2018 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM / REPORT by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman for proceedings held on February 9, 2018 Judge Judge William G. Young.. (Sweeney, John)
June 11, 2018 102 USCA Case Number 18-1545 for #100 Notice of Appeal filed by David Seth Worman, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Jason William Sawyer, Anthony Linden. (Paine, Matthew)
June 8, 2018 101 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #100 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
June 7, 2018 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 98 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, #94 Judgment, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-7175724 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 6/27/2018. (Sweeney, John)
May 18, 2018 99 Letter from James Murray to Judge William G. Young. (Paine, Matthew)
May 9, 2018 98 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #96 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
May 2, 2018 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
May 2, 2018 96 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Sweeney, John)
April 6, 2018 95 In light of the Memorandum and Order entered on April 5, 2018 and Judgment having entered for the Defendants, the Final Pretrial Conference set for April 9, 2018 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 18 on the 5th Floor is hereby CANCELLED. (Paine, Matthew)
April 6, 2018 94 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT for the Defendants Maura Healey, Daniel Bennett, and Colonel Kerry Gilpin (Paine, Matthew)
April 5, 2018 93 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "For the foregoing reasons, the Court DISMISSES Count Two of the Plaintiffs complaint and GRANTS summary judgment for the Defendants on Counts One and Three. The Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on those counts is DENIED. SO ORDERED.The AR-15 and its analogs, along with large capacity magazines, are simply not weapons within the original meaning of the individual constitutional right to bear Arms.Both their general acceptance and their regulation, if any, are policy matters not for courts, but left to the people directly through their elected representatives. In the absence of federal legislation, Massachusetts is free to ban these weapons and large capacity magazines. Other states are equally free to leave them unregulated and available to their law-abiding citizens. These policy matters are simply not of constitutional moment. Americans are not afraid of bumptious, raucous, and robust debate about these matters. We call it democracy.Justice Scalia would be proud."(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
March 28, 2018 92 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 15, 2018 91 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 15, 2018 90 Transcript of Summary Judgment Hearing held on February 9, 2018, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 3/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 9, 2018 89 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2018 at Boston University Law School re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Seth Worman, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Jason William Sawyer, Anthony Linden, #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. After hearing from counsel, the Court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Sweeney, Nardone, Woodward and Campbell for the plaintiffs, Attorneys Kobick, Porter and Klein for the defendants) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 25, 2018 88 REPLY to Response to #75 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts Christopher Colwell, Robert Spitzer and James Yurgealitis LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED ON JANUARY 25, 2018 filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply in Support of Motion to Strike)(Sweeney, John)
January 25, 2018 87 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #86 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Strike; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
January 24, 2018 86 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Strike by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike)(Sweeney, John)
January 22, 2018 85 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #68 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Undisclosed Witness Declarations. Motion allowed in part and denied in part. The defendant shall not rely on these challenged declarations in pressing their motion for summary judgment. The motion is otherwise denied. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 22, 2018 84 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #75 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts Christopher Colwell, Robert Spitzer and James Yurgealitis. Motion denied insofar as these affidavits are profferred in opposition to the plaintiffs motion for summary judgment. The Court presently expresses no opinion as to whether the challenged portions of these affidavits, or any portion of them, may be considered in support of the defendants motion for summary judgment. (Paine, Matthew)
January 19, 2018 83 Opposition re #75 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts Christopher Colwell, Robert Spitzer and James Yurgealitis filed by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from deposition of J. Yurgealitis, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from deposition of C. Colwell, #3 Exhibit C - ABA Formal Opinion)(Kaplan, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2018 82 REPLY to Response to #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Declaration of Elizabeth Kaplan, with Exhibits 96 and 97)(Kobick, Julia)
January 19, 2018 81 Reply to Defendants' Response by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman to #59 Statement of facts,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45 - Zani Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 46 - McKeon MSP Response to INTs, #3 Exhibit 47 - Spitzer Dep Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 48 - NRA articles, #5 Exhibit 49 - Yurgealitis Dep Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 50 - Colwell Dep Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 51 - Klein Dep Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 52 - Defendants' Initial Disclosures, #9 Exhibit 53 - Gius Report, #10 Exhibit 54 - ATF Data Analysis)(Sweeney, John)
January 19, 2018 80 REPLY to Response to #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
January 18, 2018 79 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2018 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. LOCATION CHANGE ONLY. THIS HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE AT BOSTON UNIVERSITY LAW SCHOOL, 765 Commonwealth Avenue, 6th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 8, 2018 78 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #77 Response #72 Opposition to Motion, #75 MOTION to Strike #76 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #73 Opposition to Motion, #74 Response. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine Docket Clerk Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
January 5, 2018 77 RESPONSE re #57 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 filed by Charles D. Baker, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Excerpts of Klein Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2: Excerpts of Dunne Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3: Redacted Curcuruto Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4: Redacted Roberts Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5: Redacted Rossi Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6: Excerpts of EOPSS Interrogatory Responses, #7 Exhibit 7: Excerpts of Solet Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8: Excerpts of Halpin Deposition Transcript)(Porter, William) (Modified on 1/8/2018 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Dcoument Link as Counsel Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
January 5, 2018 76 MEMORANDUM in Support re #75 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts Christopher Colwell, Robert Spitzer and James Yurgealitis filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
January 5, 2018 75 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts Christopher Colwell, Robert Spitzer and James Yurgealitis by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Colwell Declaration, #2 Exhibit Colwell Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Spitzer Expert Report, #4 Exhibit Spitzer Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Spitzer Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit Expert Report of Yurgealitis, #7 Exhibit Yurgealitis Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Yurgealitis Deposition Excerpts)(Sweeney, John)
January 5, 2018 74 RESPONSE re #63 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 30 - Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 31 - Responses to Public Inquires, #4 Exhibit 32 - Bennett Letter, #5 Exhibit 33 - Baker Letter, #6 Exhibit 34 - Letter from Healey to firearms dealers, #7 Exhibit 35 - Allen Depo Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 36 - Colwell Depo Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 37 - Koper Depo Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 38 - Roberts Depo Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 39 - Spitzer Depo Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 40 - Yurgealitis Depo Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 41 - Zani Depo Excerpt, #14 Exhibit 42 - Koper 1997 Report, #15 Exhibit 43 - Federal Register Proposed Rule - Bumpstocks, #16 Exhibit 44 - News articles)(Sweeney, John) (Modified on 1/8/2018 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Dcoument Link As Counsel Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
January 5, 2018 73 Opposition re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
January 5, 2018 72 Opposition re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Kobick, Julia)
January 3, 2018 71 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Undisclosed Witness Declarations by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Undisclosed Witness Declarations, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Reply)(Sweeney, John)
January 3, 2018 70 Opposition re #68 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Undisclosed Witness Declarations filed by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kobick, Julia)
December 20, 2017 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re #68 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Undisclosed Witness Declarations filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Required Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Required Expert Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26)(Sweeney, John)
December 20, 2017 68 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Undisclosed Witness Declarations by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Sweeney, John)
December 19, 2017 67 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 18, 2017 66 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #64 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal.MOTION DENIED. Redacted documents may be filed that omit personal information and disclosures about ownership (or not) (Paine, Matthew)
December 15, 2017 65 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14 of Kaplan Declaration, #2 Exhibit 15 of Kaplan Declaration, #3 Exhibit 16-25 of Kaplan Declaration, #4 Exhibit 26-29 of Kaplan Declaration, #5 Exhibit 30-35 of Kaplan Declaration, #6 Exhibit 36 Part I of Kaplan Declaration, #7 Exhibit 36 Part II of Kaplan Declaration, #8 Exhibit 37 of Kaplan Declaration, #9 Exhibit 38 of Kaplan Declaration, #10 Exhibit 39 of Kaplan Declaration, #11 Exhibit 40-45 of Kaplan Declaration, #12 Exhibit 46-56 of Kaplan Declaration, #13 Exhibit 57 of Kaplan Declaration, #14 Exhibit 58 Part I of Kaplan Declaration, #15 Exhibit 58 Part II of Kaplan Declaration, #16 Exhibit 59-69 of Kaplan Declaration, #17 Exhibit 70-76 of Kaplan Declaration, #18 Exhibit 77-80 of Kaplan Declaration, #19 Exhibit 81 of Kaplan Declaration, #20 Exhibit 82-95 of Kaplan Declaration)(Kobick, Julia)
December 15, 2017 64 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kobick, Julia)
December 15, 2017 63 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Kobick, Julia)
December 15, 2017 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Kobick, Julia)
December 15, 2017 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Bolcome, #2 Affidavit of Michaela Dunne, #3 Affidavit of Chief Brian A. Kyes, #4 Affidavit of Chief Mark K. Leahy, #5 Affidavit of Robert J. Spitzer, #6 Affidavit of James Yurgealitis, #7 Affidavit of Dr. Christopher Colwell, #8 Affidavit of Kristen Rand)(Kobick, Julia)
December 15, 2017 60 EXHIBIT re #59 Statement of facts,,,, by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
December 15, 2017 59 STATEMENT of facts re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 2 to Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit 3 to Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit 4 to Statement of Facts, #5 Exhibit 5 to Statement of Facts, #6 Exhibit 6 to Statement of Facts, #7 Exhibit 7 to Statement of Facts, #8 Exhibit 8 to Statement of Facts, #9 Exhibit 10 to Statement of Facts, #10 Exhibit 11 to Statement of Facts, #11 Exhibit 12 to Statement of Facts, #12 Exhibit 13 to Statement of Facts, #13 Exhibit 14 to Statement of Facts, #14 Exhibit 15 to Statement of Facts, #15 Exhibit 16 to Statement of Facts, #16 Exhibit 17 to Statement of Facts, #17 Exhibit 18 to Statement of Facts, #18 Exhibit 19 to Statement of Facts, #19 Exhibit 20 to Statement of Facts, #20 Exhibit 21 to Statement of Facts, #21 Exhibit 22 to Statement of Facts, #22 Exhibit 23 to Statement of Facts, #23 Exhibit 24 to Statement of Facts, #24 Exhibit 25 to Statement of Facts, #25 Exhibit 26 to Statement of Facts, #26 Exhibit 27 to Statement of Facts, #27 Exhibit 28 to Statement of Facts)(Sweeney, John)
December 15, 2017 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
December 15, 2017 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Sweeney, John)
December 8, 2017 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Kaplan on behalf of Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon (Kaplan, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2017 55 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #53 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; denying #54 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Paine, Matthew)
December 6, 2017 54 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Summary Judgment Brief Exceeding 20 Pages by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Sweeney, John)
December 6, 2017 53 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon.(Kobick, Julia)
October 26, 2017 52 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time (Paine, Matthew)
October 25, 2017 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Collins on behalf of Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon (Collins, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2017 50 MOTION for Extension of Time by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Sweeney, John)
October 10, 2017 49 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 6, 2017 to Complete Production of Documents. (Paine, Matthew)
September 29, 2017 48 Opposition re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 6, 2017 to Complete Production of Documents Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Period for Production of Documents by Three Weeks filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration)(Sweeney, John)
September 20, 2017 47 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 20, 2017 to Disclose One Expert Report (Paine, Matthew)
September 15, 2017 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 6, 2017 to Complete Production of Documents by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon.(Kobick, Julia)
September 14, 2017 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 20, 2017 to Disclose One Expert Report by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kobick, Julia)
September 1, 2017 44 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #43 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Connor M. Blair. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 24, 2017 43 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Connor M. Blair Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6767029 by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, James)
August 12, 2017 42 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER as modified. (Paine, Matthew)
August 11, 2017 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Nicholas Feld by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
August 7, 2017 40 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Richard D. McKeon. Document received: Stipulated Protective Order. (Kobick, Julia)
July 28, 2017 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants Governor Baker and Massachusetts State Police by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Sweeney, John)
July 28, 2017 38 Withdrawal of motion: #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon, Charles D. Baker, #37 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon, Charles D. Baker.. (Kobick, Julia)
July 17, 2017 37 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by Charles D. Baker, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon.(Kobick, Julia)
July 17, 2017 36 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #34 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 14, 2017 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles D. Baker, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon. (Kobick, Julia)
July 14, 2017 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Charles D. Baker, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon.(Kobick, Julia)
July 14, 2017 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia E. Kobick on behalf of Charles D. Baker, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon (Kobick, Julia)
April 13, 2017 32 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Scheduling Conference held on 4/13/2017. The Court explains the requirements of the session. The parties do not wish to proceed before a magistrate judge. Due to the nature of this matter, counsel do not wish to participate in mediation. The case is placed on the running trial list as of May 2018. A final pretrial conference will be set for the month of April 2018. A joint pretrial memo is due the first Monday of the month preceding trial month. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed atleast three months prior to trial month. (Ready for Trial on 5/7/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 23, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6463880 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Campbell, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/24/2017) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/24/2017) (Coppola, Katelyn).
April 12, 2017 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Campbell on behalf of Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman (Campbell, Richard)
April 7, 2017 30 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re #27 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as modified as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE November 15, 2017 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE December 15, 2017. (Paine, Matthew)
April 7, 2017 29 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 as to the Defendants. (Paine, Matthew)
April 7, 2017 28 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 as to the Plaintiffs. (Paine, Matthew)
April 6, 2017 27 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Nardone, Marc) (Main Document 27 replaced on 4/7/2017) (Paine, Matthew).
March 31, 2017 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 20, 2017 25 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 16, 2017 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Charles D. Baker, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon.(Porter, William)
February 14, 2017 23 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Charles D. Baker answer/response due 3/16/2017; Daniel Bennett answer/response due 3/16/2017; Maura Healey answer/response due 3/16/2017; Massachusetts State Police answer/response due 3/16/2017; Richard D. McKeon answer/response due 3/16/2017. (Paine, Matthew)
February 10, 2017 22 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 16, 2017 to File Response as to #1 Complaint,, by Charles D. Baker, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon.(Porter, William)(Modified on 2/14/2017 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
February 3, 2017 21 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James W. Porter, III, John Parker Sweeney, Marc A. Nardone, and T. Sky Woodward. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
February 2, 2017 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Apjohn on behalf of Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman (Apjohn, Eric)
February 2, 2017 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of T. Sky Woodward Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6481743 by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Campbell, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 19 replaced on 2/3/2017) (Paine, Matthew).
February 2, 2017 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marc A. Nardone Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6481735 by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Campbell, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 18 replaced on 2/3/2017) (Paine, Matthew).
February 2, 2017 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Parker Sweeney Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6481724 by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Campbell, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew).
February 2, 2017 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James W. Porter, III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6481704 by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman.(Campbell, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 16 replaced on 2/3/2017) (Paine, Matthew).
February 2, 2017 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massachusetts State Police served on 1/26/2017, answer due 2/16/2017. (Campbell, James)
February 2, 2017 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Richard D. McKeon served on 1/26/2017, answer due 2/16/2017. (Campbell, James)
February 2, 2017 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Daniel Bennett served on 1/26/2017, answer due 2/16/2017. (Campbell, James)
February 2, 2017 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Charles D. Baker served on 1/26/2017, answer due 2/16/2017. (Campbell, James)
February 2, 2017 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Maura Healey served on 1/25/2017, answer due 2/15/2017. (Campbell, James)
January 31, 2017 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary E. Klein on behalf of Charles D. Baker, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon (Klein, Gary)
January 27, 2017 9 Opposition #8 to the Notice of Related Case by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman . (Campbell, James) (Modified on 1/30/2017 to Correct Docket Text)(Paine, Matthew).
January 26, 2017 8 NOTICE by Charles D. Baker, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon of Related Case (Porter, William)
January 26, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Porter on behalf of Charles D. Baker, Daniel Bennett, Maura Healey, Massachusetts State Police, Richard D. McKeon (Porter, William)
January 24, 2017 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 24, 2017 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 23, 2017 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Campbell, James)
January 23, 2017 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Campbell, James)
January 23, 2017 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Campbell, James)
January 23, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6463880 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Nicholas Andrew Feld, Gun Owner's Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer, David Seth Worman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Campbell, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/24/2017) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/24/2017) (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worman et al v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts State Police
Represented By: Gary E. Klein
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Julia E. Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. McKeon
Represented By: Gary E. Klein
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Julia E. Kobick
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Collins
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bennett
Represented By: Gary E. Klein
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Julia E. Kobick
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Collins
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura Healey
Represented By: Gary E. Klein
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Julia E. Kobick
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Collins
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Baker
Represented By: Gary E. Klein
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Julia E. Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owner's Action League, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Andrew Feld
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overwatch Outpost
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason William Sawyer
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Nelson Chamberlain
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Seth Worman
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: On Target Training, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Linden
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Richard P. Campbell
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?