In Re. Small Business Term Loans, Inc
Appellee: ABC Disposal Service, Inc. and New Bedford Waste Services, LLC
Appellant: Small Business Term Loans, Inc
Case Number: 1:2017cv10249
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Bristol
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: PROTECTIVE ORDER entered granting 26 Motion for Protective Order (Halley, Taylor)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting 35 Motion for Stipulated Confidentiality Order (Halley, Taylor)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting 23 Motion for scheduling Order and Discovery Plan (Halley, Taylor)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered granting 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference (Halley, Taylor)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Small Business Term Loans, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABC Disposal Service, Inc.
Represented By: Charles R. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Bedford Waste Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Small Business Term Loans, Inc
Represented By: Keith J. Cunningham
Represented By: Ryan F. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?