Kenneh v. Tompkins
Petitioner: Mohamed Kenneh
Respondent: Steven W. Tompkins
Case Number: 1:2017cv10490
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 36 MOTION for Reconsideration and Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's 28 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28 is DISMISSED.(DaSilva, Carolina)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. For the reasons set forth in the attached MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Petitioners Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus andMotion to Expedite Adjudication of Petition 28 is GRANTED. Petitioner shall beRELEASED f rom ICE custody upon conditions to be set by the court at a hearing which shall be held on August 30, 2017, at 11:00 A.M. If Petitioner is removed to Liberia prior to August 30, 2017, the parties shall file a joint motion requesting that the hearing be cancelled. The court reminds the parties of their ongoing obligation to notify the court if any facts or circumstances change.(MacDonald, Gail)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ALLOWING 20 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. See Attached Order (DaSilva, Carolina)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneh v. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohamed Kenneh
Represented By: Lori H. Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven W. Tompkins
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?