United States of America et al v. Universal Health Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Correa, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Julio Escobar and United States of America
Defendant: HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc. and Universal Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv11843
Filed: September 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Alexandra L. Brazier (Brazier, Alexandra)
September 13, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Evan D. Panich (Panich, Evan)
February 7, 2018 Filing 29 Clerk's Notes for Motion Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Argument heard on pending motions in conjunction with case no. 11cv11170. Court finds MOOT #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, the matter having been STAYED pending developments in 11cv11170. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Greene, Tabb, Brazier, Dollar, McLane, Panich) (Beatty, Barbara)
February 7, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra L. Brazier on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Brazier, Alexandra)
January 3, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING: Hearing on pending Motions to Dismiss #13 and #21 scheduled for 2/7/2018 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
January 2, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) filed by HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc.. (Panich, Evan)
January 2, 2018 Filing 25 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #24 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara)
December 21, 2017 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Panich, Evan)
December 6, 2017 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) filed by Carmen Correa, Julio Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CeltiCare Credentialing, #2 Exhibit Tufts Credentialing)(Fischer, Simon)
November 22, 2017 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) (Amended Complaint) filed by HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Panich, Evan)
November 22, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) by HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc..(Panich, Evan)
November 9, 2017 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Universal Health Services, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., HRI Clinics, Inc., filed by Carmen Correa, Julio Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Greene, Thomas) (Main Document 20 replaced on 11/9/2017) (Gioia, AnaMaria).
November 3, 2017 Filing 19 Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carmen Correa, Julio Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CeltiCare Manual, #2 Exhibit Tufts Manual)(Greene, Thomas)
November 2, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn P. Dollar on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Dollar, Robyn)
October 27, 2017 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Health Services, Inc.. (Panich, Evan)
October 27, 2017 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HRI Clinics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UHSL, LLC for HRI Clinics, Inc... (Panich, Evan)
October 27, 2017 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UHS of Delaware, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Universal Health Services, Inc. for UHS of Delaware, Inc... (Panich, Evan)
October 20, 2017 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Panich, Evan)
October 20, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc..(Panich, Evan)
October 3, 2017 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julio Escobar, Carmen Correa. HRI Clinics, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2017, answer due 12/1/2017; UHS of Delaware, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2017, answer due 12/1/2017; Universal Health Services, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2017, answer due 12/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Waivers of The Service of Summons)(Fischer, Simon)
October 3, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura McLane on behalf of HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc. (McLane, Laura)
October 3, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Pearlstein on behalf of HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc. (Pearlstein, Mark)
October 3, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan D. Panich on behalf of HRI Clinics, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., Universal Health Services, Inc. (Panich, Evan)
September 29, 2017 Filing 8 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #6 Motion to Partially Lift Seal. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 29, 2017 Filing 7 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to unseal. (Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 28, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION to Partially Lift Seal by Carmen Correa, Julio Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 28, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Election to Decline to Intervene, and MOTION to Unseal Complaint, Notice, and Proposed Order, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 28, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg D. Shapiro on behalf of United States of America (Gioia, AnaMaria)
September 26, 2017 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $ 400, receipt number 1BST064575 for #1 Complaint,, (Danieli, Chris)
September 25, 2017 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Health Services, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., HRI Clinics, Inc., filed by Carmen Correa, Julio Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part II, #2 Complaint Part III, #3 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18)(Danieli, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Universal Health Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRI Clinics, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W. Pearlstein
Represented By: Laura McLane
Represented By: Evan D. Panich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHS of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W. Pearlstein
Represented By: Laura McLane
Represented By: Evan D. Panich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W. Pearlstein
Represented By: Laura McLane
Represented By: Evan D. Panich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Correa
Represented By: Thomas M. Greene
Represented By: Michael Tabb
Represented By: Simon L. Fischer
Represented By: Ryan P. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Robyn P. Dollar
Represented By: Alexandra L. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Escobar
Represented By: Thomas M. Greene
Represented By: Michael Tabb
Represented By: Simon L. Fischer
Represented By: Ryan P. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregg D. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?