United States of America v. Linskey
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: William M. Linskey
Case Number: 1:2018cv11494
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/14/2018 to File Answer by William M. Linskey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer)(McMahon, David)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by United States of America. William M. Linskey served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Wicks, Marie)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William M. Linskey. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William M. Linskey (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Summons)(Wicks, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Linskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Linskey
Represented By: David Sean McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Marie E. Wicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?