Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. v. Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc.
Defendant: Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp., Commodore Builders Corporation and Quality Air Metals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11501
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Quality Air Metals, Inc..(Hinrichsen, Christian)
September 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Bowler, Marianne)
September 7, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp., Quality Air Metals, Inc. by Commodore Builders Corporation.(Snell, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/07/2018 to File Answer and Cross-Claims by Commodore Builders Corporation.(Snell, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Quality Air Metals, Inc..(Hinrichsen, Christian)
August 31, 2018 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. NOTICE of Status Conference. Status Conference set for 9/25/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan)
August 31, 2018 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time (Garvin, Brendan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 19 Defendant in Cross-Claim, Pinnacle Piping and Service Corp.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Quality Air Metals, Inc.'s Cross-Claims by Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp..(Ahern, William)
August 28, 2018 Filing 18 Pinnacle Piping and Service Corp.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Quality Air Metals, Inc. by Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp..(Ahern, William)
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michael P. Giunta (Giunta, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Eric A. Martignetti (Martignetti, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Snell on behalf of Commodore Builders Corporation (Snell, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Quality Air Metals, Inc. served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (Fay, Andrew)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commodore Builders Corporation served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (Fay, Andrew)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp. served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (Fay, Andrew)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Heifetz on behalf of Quality Air Metals, Inc. (Heifetz, Richard)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian H. Hinrichsen on behalf of Quality Air Metals, Inc. (Hinrichsen, Christian)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 24, 2018 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Commodore Builders Corporation.(Martignetti, Eric)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Martignetti on behalf of Commodore Builders Corporation (Martignetti, Eric)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Giunta on behalf of Commodore Builders Corporation (Giunta, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Quality Air Metals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hinrichsen, Christian)
August 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Bowler, Marianne)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 20, 2018 to File Answer re #4 Summons Issued, Plaintiff's Complaint by Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp..(Barnes, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commodore Builders Corporation, Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp., Quality Air Metals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Fay on behalf of Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. (Fay, Andrew)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7236225 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Fay, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/19/2018) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/19/2018 due to documents still being in fillable format(Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. v. Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Piping and Service, Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Barnes
Represented By: William F. Ahern, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commodore Builders Corporation
Represented By: Robert P. Snell
Represented By: Michael P. Giunta
Represented By: Eric A. Martignetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Air Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Richard E. Heifetz
Represented By: Christian H. Hinrichsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?