PREMIUM SPORTS INC. v. Barbosa et al

Plaintiff: PREMIUM SPORTS INC.
Defendant: Nelia Barbosa and Ilha Verde Cafe, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11502
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Bristol
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 10 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nelia Barbosa and Ilha Verde Cafe' Inc, see attachment for further details. (Molloy, Maryellen)
August 1, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ilha Verde Cafe, Inc. served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (Lonstein, Wayne)
August 1, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nelia Barbosa served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (Lonstein, Wayne)
July 19, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Nelia Barbosa, Ilha Verde Cafe, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 19, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (DaSilva, Carolina)
July 19, 2018 5 NOTICE by PREMIUM SPORTS INC. re #1 Complaint Request for Issuance of Summons as to defendant, Ilha Verde Cafe, Inc. (Lonstein, Wayne)
July 19, 2018 4 NOTICE by PREMIUM SPORTS INC. re #1 Complaint Request for Issuance of Summons as to defendant, Nelia Barbosa (Lonstein, Wayne)
July 19, 2018 3 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Lonstein, Wayne)
July 19, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PREMIUM SPORTS INC.. (Lonstein, Wayne)
July 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7236381 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by PREMIUM SPORTS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Lonstein, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PREMIUM SPORTS INC. v. Barbosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PREMIUM SPORTS INC.
Represented By: Wayne D Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelia Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilha Verde Cafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?