Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kitts
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Kimberly Pine Kitts
Case Number: 1:2018cv11507
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Lundgren, Gretchen) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/11/2018) (Paine, Matthew).
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kimberly Pine Kitts served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Lundgren, Gretchen)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kimberly Pine Kitts. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Pine Kitts (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Lundgren, Gretchen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/19/2018) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/19/2018. Documents were still in fillable format (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Pine Kitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Gretchen A. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?