Miller, Trustee v. City of Gloucester et al
Plaintiff: Keith L. Miller
Defendant: City of Gloucester, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC and SBA Towers V, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11666
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Miller, Keith)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Gloucester served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Miller, Keith)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Gloucester, New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC, SBA Towers V, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corrected Category Form by Keith L Miller, Trustee (Miller, Keith) Modified on 8/22/2018 to Correct Docket Text (Paine, Matthew).
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7264463 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Keith L Miller, Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement Category Form (Deleted duplicate file. See entry #2 for correct filing), #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex. B, #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D, #7 Exhibit Ex. E, #8 Exhibit Ex. F)(Miller, Keith) Modified on 8/7/2018 (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller, Trustee v. City of Gloucester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith L. Miller
Represented By: Keith L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gloucester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBA Towers V, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?