Integr8 Fuels, Inc. v. R/V NEPTUNE et al

Plaintiff: Integr8 Fuels, Inc.
Defendant: R/V NEPTUNE, MG3 (SURVEY) UK LTD. and NEPTUNE EHF
Case Number: 1:2018cv11677
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Bristol
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 23 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered allowing #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Integr8 Fuels, Inc. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 11, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Integr8 Fuels, Inc. (O'Connell, Liam)
August 13, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: D.E. 1, ex. 13 corrected because: to remove and refile correctly under corporate disclosure event. (Franklin, Yvonne)
August 13, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Integr8 Fuels, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Integr8 Fuels Holdings Inc. for Integr8 Fuels, Inc... (Franklin, Yvonne)
August 10, 2018 Filing 19 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER Appointing Special Process Server and Supplemental Process in the Form of a Restraining Order entered. (Bono, Christine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 18 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Order (Bono, Christine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION for Order by Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Liam)
August 10, 2018 Filing 16 Judge Mark L. Wolf: "Denied without prejudice to allowance of a motion to authorize plaintiff to publish. See Rule C(4) of the Supplemental Rules of Civil Procedure." ENDORSED ORDER entered denying #5 Motion for Order. (Bono, Christine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 15 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN entered. (Bono, Christine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Order (Bono, Christine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 Summons and Process of Attachment and Garnishment Issued as to Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. (Bono, Christine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Order (Bono, Christine)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #3 MOTION for Order Rule B Attachment, #2 MOTION for Order to for Arrest , #4 MOTION for Order for Substitute Custodian, #1 Complaint, #5 MOTION for Order for Public Notice by Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. (O'Connell, Liam)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MG3 (SURVEY) UK LTD., NEPTUNE EHF, R/V NEPTUNE. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Order for Public Notice by Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Notice)(O'Connell, Liam)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Order for Substitute Custodian by Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Liam)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Order Rule B Attachment by Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Lennon, #2 Memorandum, #3 Summons)(O'Connell, Liam)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to for Arrest by Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Warrant)(O'Connell, Liam)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7267652 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Integr8 Fuels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Verification Page, #11 JS45, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 FRCP 7.1 Disc)(O'Connell, Liam) (Attachment 11 replaced on 8/9/2018) (Danieli, Chris).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integr8 Fuels, Inc. v. R/V NEPTUNE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R/V NEPTUNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG3 (SURVEY) UK LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEPTUNE EHF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integr8 Fuels, Inc.
Represented By: Liam O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?