Open Text Corporation et al v. SAS C6

Plaintiff: Open Text, Inc. and Open Text Corporation
Defendant: SAS C6
Case Number: 1:2018cv11697
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SAS C6. (Hurley, Matthew)
September 25, 2018 24 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court Responses due by 10/3/2018. (Bono, Christine)
September 24, 2018 23 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/03/2018 to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by SAS C6.(Hurley, Matthew)
September 19, 2018 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carter, Nicholas)
September 19, 2018 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Open Text Corporation, Open Text, Inc.. (Carter, Nicholas)
September 19, 2018 20 MOTION to Seal Document of Unredacted Exclusive License Agreement by Open Text Corporation.(Carter, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas B. Carter, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit (filed under seal)) (Montes, Mariliz).
September 17, 2018 19 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Bono, Christine)
September 17, 2018 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/19/2018 to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Open Text Corporation.(Carter, Nicholas)
September 13, 2018 17 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David H. Herrington, Arminda B. Bepko, Robert A. Lawner and Jessica Roll. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 12, 2018 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carter, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Open Text Corporation, Open Text, Inc.. (Carter, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Open Text Corporation, Open Text, Inc..(Carter, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David H. Herrington, Arminda B. Bepko, Robert A. Lawner, and Jessica Roll Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7315992 by Open Text Corporation, Open Text, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Carter, Nicholas)
August 31, 2018 12 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/17/2018 to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 9/17/2018 (Bono, Christine)
August 31, 2018 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/17/2018 to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Open Text Corporation.(Carter, Nicholas)
August 23, 2018 10 STATE COURT Record. (Franklin, Yvonne)
August 20, 2018 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SAS C6. (Hurley, Matthew)
August 20, 2018 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SAS C6.(Hurley, Matthew)
August 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Rizk on behalf of SAS C6 (Rizk, Adam)
August 14, 2018 6 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: D.E. #1-4 corrected because: to remove the (AO-121) Copyright Report and refile as a separate event. (Franklin, Yvonne)
August 14, 2018 5 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case. (Franklin, Yvonne)
August 13, 2018 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 13, 2018 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 13, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SAS C6 identifying Corporate Parent SAS MALENA HOLDING, Corporate Parent SAS RML HOLDING, Corporate Parent SAS BB HOLDING for SAS C6.. (Hurley, Matthew)
August 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAS C6 ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7270965 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form, # 4 AO 121 Form)(Hurley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Text Corporation et al v. SAS C6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAS C6
Represented By: Matthew C. Hurley
Represented By: Adam S. Rizk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Text, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Represented By: Arminda B Bepko
Represented By: Robert A. Lawner
Represented By: David H. Herrington
Represented By: Jessica Roll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Text Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Represented By: Arminda B Bepko
Represented By: Robert A. Lawner
Represented By: David H. Herrington
Represented By: Jessica Roll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?