Marradi v. Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Raoul Marradi
Defendant: Genbridge LLC and Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11795
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 Return receipt received for mail sent to Genbridge LLC Delivered on 10/15/18 (Lima, Christine)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 Copy re #8 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default, #9 Standing Order re motions for default judgment mailed to Genbridge LLC on 10/11/2018. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #8 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (McDonagh, Christina)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Genbridge LLC (McDonagh, Christina)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Notice of Entry of Default Against Defendant Genbridge, LLC Only by Raoul Marradi.(Shulby, Todd) Modified on 10/11/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Genbridge LLC served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Shulby, Todd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Todd W. Shulby, Esq.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd W. Shulby, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7320259 by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Florida Bar Letter of Good Standing)(Garno, Edward)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Genbridge LLC, Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genbridge LLC, Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7286699 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Garno, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marradi v. Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raoul Marradi
Represented By: Edward N. Garno
Represented By: Todd W. Shulby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genbridge LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?