Smith Marine, Inc. v. Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC

Plaintiff: Smith Marine, Inc.
Defendant: Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11809
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default, in light of this Court's Order on 9/27/2018 6 . (Beatty, Barbara)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default against Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC by Smith Marine, Inc..(Kantor, Julie)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered striking Defendants Answer #5 . L.R. 83.5.5(c) provides that a limited liability company may not appear pro se nor may an individual officer appear on behalf of any entity. It does not appear that Mr. Lake is a member of the bar authorized to file an answer or appear in this case. Accordingly, the time is extended until October 26, 2018, for the defendant to obtain counsel and file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. (Beatty, Barbara)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC.(Pleading not signed and filed manually) (Beatty, Barbara)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Kantor, Julie)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7288905 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Smith Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 JS45 Category form)(Kantor, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Marine, Inc. v. Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Land and Marine Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Julie L. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?