Fotohaus, LLC v. Tocci Building Corporation

Plaintiff: Fotohaus, LLC
Defendant: Tocci Building Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv11814
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Tocci Building Corporation.(DiNicola, John)
October 9, 2018 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fotohaus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit3)(Deal, David)
October 3, 2018 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tocci Building Corporation, filed by Fotohaus, LLC.(Deal, David)
September 25, 2018 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Tocci Building Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DiNicola, John)
August 29, 2018 8 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added DAVID C. DEAL. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
August 29, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Tocci Building Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 29, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 28, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David C. Deal Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7295326 by Fotohaus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificat Of Attorney David C. Deal In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Twohig, Michael)
August 28, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fotohaus, LLC. (Twohig, Michael)
August 28, 2018 3 REPORT on the filing of copyright case AO 121 Form by Fotohaus, LLC. (Twohig, Michael) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/29/2018) (Montes, Mariliz).
August 24, 2018 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination re: Copyright - AO 121. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of copyright case (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 23, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Tocci Building Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7289582 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fotohaus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Fotohaus Complaint, #2 USDC Mass Category Form Fotohaus Complaint)(Twohig, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fotohaus, LLC v. Tocci Building Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fotohaus, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Twohig
Represented By: David C Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tocci Building Corporation
Represented By: John W. DiNicola, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?