Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc. v. Festa Radon Technologies, Co.
Plaintiff: Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Festa Radon Technologies, Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11828
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc..(Duffy, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kristin M. Knuuttila (Knuuttila, Kristin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Festa Radon Technologies, Co..(Steinfield, Joseph)
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award against Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc. by Festa Radon Technologies, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit B to Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit C to Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit D to Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit E to Counterclaim, #6 Exhibit F to Counterclaim, #7 Exhibit G to Counterclaim, #8 Exhibit H to Counterclaim, #9 Exhibit I to Counterclaim, #10 Exhibit J to Counterclaim)(Rosenberg, Aaron)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Evans on behalf of Festa Radon Technologies, Co. (Evans, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D. Rosenberg on behalf of Festa Radon Technologies, Co. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Festa Radon Technologies, Co. answer due 9/28/2018. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Elizabeth C. Kramer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth C. Kramer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7332941 by Festa Radon Technologies, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Knuuttila, Kristin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 28, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Confirm Arbitration Award by Festa Radon Technologies, Co..(Steinfield, Joseph)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Festa Radon Technologies, Co. answer due 9/24/2018. (Lima, Christine)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin M. Knuuttila on behalf of Festa Radon Technologies, Co. (Knuuttila, Kristin)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 24, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Confirm Arbitration Award by Festa Radon Technologies, Co..(Steinfield, Joseph)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc.. Festa Radon Technologies, Co. waiver sent on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Duffy, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #2 MOTION Confirmation of Arbitation Award re #1 Complaint, . Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Festa Radon Technologies, Co.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION Confirmation of Arbitation Award re #1 Complaint, by Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Duffy, Michael)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Festa Radon Technologies, Co. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7291893 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Duffy, Michael) Modified on 8/27/2018 (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc. v. Festa Radon Technologies, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spruce Environmental Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Festa Radon Technologies, Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Kramer
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: David L. Evans
Represented By: Aaron D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph D. Steinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?