Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC v. Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,
Plaintiff: Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC
Defendant: Harry Weikel, David F Alberti, Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals, and Kenneth A Thompson
Case Number: 1:2018cv11893
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:332(c) Federal Telecommunications Act of 1996
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by David F Alberti, Kenneth A Thompson, Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,, Harry Weikel.(Cowin, Jackie)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Kenneth A Thompson answer due 10/22/2018; Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals, answer due 10/22/2018; Harry Weikel answer due 10/22/2018. (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Angley on behalf of Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC (Angley, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2018 to File Answer by David F Alberti, Kenneth A Thompson, Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,, Harry Weikel.(Stein, Robin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Angley on behalf of Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC (Angley, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Stein on behalf of David F Alberti, Kenneth A Thompson, Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,, Harry Weikel (Stein, Robin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackie A. Cowin on behalf of David F Alberti, Kenneth A Thompson, Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,, Harry Weikel (Cowin, Jackie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kenneth A Thompson served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Angley, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Harry Weikel served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Angley, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed David F Alberti served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Angley, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David F Alberti, Kenneth A Thompson, Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,, Harry Weikel. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC against Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals, Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7304357 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Site Plans, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Decision)(Hopkins, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/5/2018) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/5/2018) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC v. Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Weikel
Represented By: Jackie A. Cowin
Represented By: Robin Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F Alberti
Represented By: Jackie A. Cowin
Represented By: Robin Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Plympton Zoning Board of Appeals,
Represented By: Jackie A. Cowin
Represented By: Robin Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A Thompson
Represented By: Jackie A. Cowin
Represented By: Robin Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Robert K. Hopkins
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Angley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?