Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lemelson et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Gregory Lemelson, Lemelson Capital Management, LLC and Amvona Fund, LP, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv11926
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Day, Alfred)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Day, Alfred)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM .... Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 11:15 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 Affidavit in Support. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Brooks, Douglas)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Amvona Fund, LP, The, Gregory Lemelson, Lemelson Capital Management, LLC. (Brooks, Douglas)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Amvona Fund, LP, The, Gregory Lemelson, Lemelson Capital Management, LLC.(Brooks, Douglas)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amvona Fund, LP, The, Lemelson Capital Management, LLC. (Brooks, Douglas)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S. Brooks on behalf of Amvona Fund, LP, The, Gregory Lemelson, Lemelson Capital Management, LLC (Brooks, Douglas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Amvona Fund, LP, The waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Day, Alfred)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Lemelson Capital Management, LLC waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Day, Alfred)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Gregory Lemelson waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Day, Alfred)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amvona Fund, LP, The, Gregory Lemelson, Lemelson Capital Management, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Jones on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Jones, Marc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amvona Fund, LP, The, Lemelson Capital Management, LLC, Gregory Lemelson (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Day, Alfred) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/12/2018) (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lemelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Lemelson
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemelson Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amvona Fund, LP, The
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Marc J. Jones
Represented By: Alfred A. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?