Norman v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.

Plaintiff: Don Norman
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11951
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Howmedica Osteonics Corp. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Gardner, Andrew)
November 2, 2018 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER AIDING PRIVATE SETTLEMENT Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 17, 2018 8 ANSWER to #7 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 17, 2018 7 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 17, 2018 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1-12 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-5, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order)(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 17, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 17, 2018 4 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Norman v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. In Re: Stryker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2018 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint 1:18-cv-11951 by Don Norman. (Gardner, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Norman against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7320325 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Don Norman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gardner, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/17/2018) (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Norman
Represented By: Andrew K Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?