Marradi v. 271 Broadway, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raoul Marradi
Defendant: 271 Broadway, Inc., MacArthur Realty Trust and New Dragon Star, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11989
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 7 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: PROCEDURAL ORDER re Suggestion of Death entered. The plaintiff shall be responsible for serving a copy of this Order on the defendants. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
November 5, 2018 6 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Raoul Marradi by Raoul Marradi. (Shulby, Todd)
October 22, 2018 5 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Added Todd W. Shulby. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
October 19, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd W. Shulby, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7372617 by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Florida Bar Letter of Good Standing)(Garno, Edward)
September 21, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to 271 Broadway, Inc., MacArthur Realty Trust, New Dragon Star, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
September 21, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
September 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against MacArthur Realty Trust, New Dragon Star, Inc., 271 Broadway, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7329140 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Garno, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marradi v. 271 Broadway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raoul Marradi
Represented By: Edward N. Garno
Represented By: Todd W. Shulby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 271 Broadway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacArthur Realty Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Dragon Star, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?