In Re. Butler et al
Appellee: Peter Wojtkun
Appellant: Joseph G. Butler
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Case Number: 1:2018cv12026
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:18-cv-12026-PBS (Caruso, Stephanie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #11 Appendix/Exhibits.. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this documents to the Clerk's Office by 11/16/2018. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 11/14/2018 in all 3 cases. ORDERED: Court allows MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE in all 3 cases... ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE 15cv10342-PBS. Hearing set for 1/9/19 at 2:30pm; Bench Trial scheduled for 3/4/19 at 9:00am; Defense counsel will work on getting an appraisal done for the property located in Puerto Rico. Parties will confer and get back to the court on whether or not they agree to refer matter to ADR, letter to be filed on ecf by 11/23/18. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10342-PBS, 1:18-cv-12026-PBS, 1:18-cv-12032-PBS(Molloy, Maryellen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 Appellee's BRIEF by Peter Wojtkun. (Lawrence, Douglass)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Joseph G. Butler.(Hixon, Jonathan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT Part 1 of 2 by Joseph G. Butler. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(Hixon, Jonathan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Appellant's BRIEF by Joseph G. Butler. (Hixon, Jonathan)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Conference will go forward in all 3 Cases (see docket #'s below) All counsel shall appear in person in all the related cases for the Status Conference. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10342-PBS, 1:18-cv-12026-PBS, 1:18-cv-12032-PBS(Molloy, Maryellen)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 10/30/2018. Appellee Brief due by 11/13/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/27/2018. (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Peter Wojtkun of MOTION to Reopen Case and REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT OF BANKRUPTCY APPEALS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lawrence, Douglass)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglass C. Lawrence on behalf of Peter Wojtkun (Lawrence, Douglass)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-12719. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Peter Wojtkun
Represented By: John F. Sommerstein
Represented By: Douglass C. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joseph G. Butler
Represented By: Jonathan Hixon
Represented By: James M. Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?