Higgins v. Verizon of New England, Inc.
Plaintiff: John T Higgins
Defendant: Verizon of New England, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12092
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Referring Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Verizon of New England, Inc..(Kippins, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Exhibit 1) (McDonagh, Christina). (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/31/2018) (McDonagh, Christina).
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Verizon of New England, Inc..(Kippins, Michael) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/31/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/31/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (McDonagh, Christina).
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Judge William G. Young no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Paine, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455, I hereby RECUSE from this case.(Montes, Mariliz)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verizon of New England, Inc., filed by John T Higgins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(McDonagh, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Verizon of New England, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon of New England, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Kippins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?