United States v. DeGregorio et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Town of Franklin and Janice M. DeGregorio
Case Number: 1:2018cv12103
Filed: October 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Dkt. No. 12 corrected because: Memorandum in Support of motion incorrectly filed as an attachment to the motion. See Docket Entry 13 for the Memorandum in Support. Counsel is reminded to review the local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court at our web page, at www.mad.uscourts.gov under CM/ECF E-Filing. (Caruso, Stephanie)
December 1, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Caruso, Stephanie)
December 1, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Lis Pendens by United States. (Schifano, L.) Modified on 12/3/2018 (Caruso, Stephanie).
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Order to Appear for Scheduling Conference by Telephone , Amended, filed by United States.(Schifano, L.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Order to Appear for Scheduling Conference by Telephone by United States.(Schifano, L.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting #7 ASSENTED TO Motion to Continue 16.b.... Scheduling Conference reset from 12/6/18 to 12/17/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Janice M. DeGregorio served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Schifano, L.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to December 10, 2018 with Certificate of Service by Town of Franklin.(Finnegan, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference..... Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 10:45 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Town of Franklin.(Finnegan, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Finnegan on behalf of Town of Franklin (Finnegan, John)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Janice M. DeGregorio, Town of Franklin. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
October 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Franklin, Janice M. DeGregorio (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Schifano, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. DeGregorio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: L. Steven Schifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Franklin
Represented By: John D. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice M. DeGregorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?