McDonald v. USPS et al
Plaintiff: Andrew R. McDonald
Defendant: Megan J Brennan and USPS
Case Number: 1:2018cv12144
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal Referred for: Full Pretrial and R&R on Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Andrew R. McDonald. (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Megan J Brennan, USPS(Boston Main Plant Manitance Supervisor ), USPS(Maintance Supervisor ), USPS(Supervisor). Summons mailed to plaintiff with copy of Order, notice for service by USMS, USM 285 forms, Local Rule 4.1, notice for service on United States and courtesy copy of the complaint. (Attachments: #1 notice to plaintiff and LR 4.1)(PSSA, 4) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/17/2018) (PSSA, 4).
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The plaintiff is responsible for serving the summonses, complaint, and this order on the defendants in compliance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 4.1. Because the plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have service completed by the United States Marshals Service. Service must be completed within 90 days of the date of this order.(PSSA, 4)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew R. McDonald.(Castilla, Francis)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew R. McDonald.(Castilla, Francis)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrew R. McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. USPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew R. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?