UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $49,400 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $49,400 in United States Currency
Claimant: CLK Global, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv12233
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by CLK Global, LLC.(Cormier, Philip)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip G. Cormier on behalf of CLK Global, LLC (Cormier, Philip)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Brooks on behalf of CLK Global, LLC (Brooks, Benjamin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 CLAIM by CLK Global, LLC. (Fried, Syrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $49,400 in United States Currency (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Head, Carol) Modified on 10/25/2018 to changed the name of document one to Category Form (Siebert, Erik).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $49,400 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $49,400 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Carol E. Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: CLK Global, LLC
Represented By: Philip G. Cormier
Represented By: Syrie D. Fried
Represented By: Benjamin Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?