LSI Design and Integration Corp. v. Tesaro Inc. et al

Plaintiff: LSI Design and Integration Corp.
Defendant: Tesaro Inc., Leon O. Moulder, Jr. and Timothy R. Pearson
Case Number: 1:2018cv12352
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The proposed dates are ADOPTED by the Court. re #9 Stipulation filed by Leon O. Moulder, Jr., Tesaro Inc., Timothy R. Pearson (Simeone, Maria)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Governing Deadlines by Leon O. Moulder, Jr, Timothy R. Pearson, Tesaro Inc.. (O'Brien, Justin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Scott R. Haiber. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steven F. Barley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott Haiber Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7440523 by Leon O. Moulder, Jr, Timothy R. Pearson, Tesaro Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(O'Brien, Justin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven F. Barley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7440514 by Leon O. Moulder, Jr, Timothy R. Pearson, Tesaro Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(O'Brien, Justin)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin P. O'Brien on behalf of Leon O. Moulder, Jr, Timothy R. Pearson, Tesaro Inc. (O'Brien, Justin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leon O. Moulder, Jr, Timothy R. Pearson, Tesaro Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Manolakis, Ashley)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7407047 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by LSI Design and Integration Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Andrews, Daryl) (Attachment 2 replaced and Attachment 3 added on 11/13/2018 in order to attach Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form separately) (Manolakis, Ashley).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LSI Design and Integration Corp. v. Tesaro Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesaro Inc.
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Steven F. Barley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon O. Moulder, Jr.
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Steven F. Barley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Pearson
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Steven F. Barley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSI Design and Integration Corp.
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?