Nelson Gomes da Silva v. Marcilene de Aredes

Plaintiff: Marcilene de Aredes and Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva
Case Number: 1:2018cv12353
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 19 Clerk's Notes for Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Defendant not present. Plaintiff's counsel reports the defendant has been difficult to locate and has not yet been served. Subpoenas for third parties have been issued. Counsel to notify the Clerk when the defendant has been served and a further hearing can be scheduled.(Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Dalton) (Beatty, Barbara)
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion Under the Hague Convention for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order. Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2018 at 11:30 a.m. (Beatty, Barbara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue Motion to December 13, 2018 at 11:30am by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva.(Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 Clerk's Notes for Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Further hearing on #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff's counsel provides update on service upon the defendant and requests a continuance of the hearing to a later date. Counsel to file motion to extend time requesting a date of 12/13/2018 at 11:30 a.m. for further hearing. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Dalton)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth G. Crowley on behalf of Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva (Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 Proposed Form of Order submitted by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: RESTRAINING AND SCHEDULING ORDER entered re #2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling of Expedited Hearing filed by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva.(Beatty, Barbara)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's Notes for ExParte Hearing held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Court addresses issues raised by the #2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling of Expedited Hearing. Court GRANTS an Expedited Hearing and sets Hearing for 11/29/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel to submit a proposed form of order to the Court today. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Crowley, Dalton) (Beatty, Barbara)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: At the request of plaintiff's counsel, the Ex Parte Hearing on Motion #2 for Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling of Expedited Hearing is RESCHEDULED until 11/21/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING: Ex Parte Hearing on Motion #2 for Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling of Expedited Hearing is SCHEDULED for 11/16/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint (Exhibit E) by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva. (Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint (Exhibit D) by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva. (Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint (Exhibit C) by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva. (Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint (Exhibit B) by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva. (Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint (Exhibit A) by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva. (Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling of Expedited Hearing filed by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva. (Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling of Expedited Hearing by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva.(Crowley, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Return of Minor Child against Marcilene de Aredes (Fee Status: Local Government), filed by Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva.(Crowley, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson Gomes da Silva v. Marcilene de Aredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcilene de Aredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelio Nelson Gomes da Silva
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?