Burr v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Robyn L Burr
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administation
Case Number: 1:2018cv12378
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nancy A. Berryhill served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Halley, Taylor)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gwendolyn N.J. Russell on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Russell, Gwendolyn)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Hohler, Daniel)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) is ALLOWED. The Clerk shall issue summons for service of the defendant. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshal Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, complaint, and this Order upon the defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service." (Hohler, Daniel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robyn L Burr.(Tierney, Gigi)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Robyn L Burr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Tierney, Gigi) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2018) (Jones, Sherry). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/14/2018) (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burr v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn L Burr
Represented By: Gigi D. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Gwendolyn N.J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administation
Represented By: Christopher Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?