Sinkula v. Select Income REIT et al
Plaintiff: Frank Sinkula
Defendant: William A. Lamkin, Donna D. Fraiche, Select Income REIT, Adam D. Portnoy, Jeffrey P. Somers and David M. Blackman
Case Number: 1:2018cv12389
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frank Sinkula (Matorin, Mitchell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank Sinkula. David M. Blackman waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Matorin, Mitchell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank Sinkula. Select Income REIT waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Matorin, Mitchell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank Sinkula. William A. Lamkin waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Matorin, Mitchell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank Sinkula. Donna D. Fraiche waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Matorin, Mitchell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank Sinkula. Jeffrey P. Somers waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Matorin, Mitchell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank Sinkula. Adam D. Portnoy waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Matorin, Mitchell)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David M. Blackman, Donna D. Fraiche, William A. Lamkin, Adam D. Portnoy, Select Income REIT, Jeffrey P. Somers. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Siebert, Erik)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7413542 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Frank Sinkula. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Sheet)(Matorin, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinkula v. Select Income REIT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna D. Fraiche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Income REIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam D. Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P. Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Sinkula
Represented By: Mitchell J. Matorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?